Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/21/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
01/21/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-01775
|
01/21/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-01780
|
01/21/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-01782
|
01/26/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ross Law Group. Check no. 3587. (SC) | | |
01/27/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-02511
|
01/27/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC) | | 21-02553
|
01/29/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 2, 2021, at 9:00 AM via Zoom. (SC) | | 21-02912
|
02/03/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Association of Counsel, R. Christopher Reade, Esq. (SC) | | 21-03358
|
02/03/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 2/4/21. (SC) | | |
02/04/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-03393
|
02/04/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-03429
|
02/05/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 2, 2021, at 9:00 AM via Zoom. (SC) | | 21-03548
|
02/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Attorney R. Christopher Reade, Esq., of the law firm Cory, Reade, Dows and Shafer, has filed a notice of appearance as co-counsel on behalf of appellants. The clerk of this court shall add Mr. Reade as counsel for appellants. Appellants' motion for an extension of time to file the case appeal statement is granted. Appellants shall file the case appeal statement on or before February 16, 2021. (SC) | | 21-03961
|
02/10/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 23, 2021, at 9:00 AM via Zoom. (SC) | | 21-04006
|
02/12/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellants' Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-04352
|
02/16/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: March 3, 2021. (SC) | | 21-04470
|
02/17/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Substitution of Attorneys. (SC) | | 21-04682
|
02/18/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 23, 2021, at 9:00 AM via Zoom. (SC) | | 21-04865
|
02/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants have filed a substitution of counsel informing this court that the law firm Cory Reade Dows & Shafer is substituted in place of the Law Offices of Karen H. Ross as the only counsel for appellants. The clerk of this court shall remove the Law Offices of Karen H. Ross as counsel for appellants. (SC) | | 21-05061
|
03/03/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-06296
|
03/10/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondents' (Shafik Hirju, Shafik Brown, and Furniture Boutique, LLC) Response to Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-07044
|
03/23/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-08360
|
03/25/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-08490
|
03/29/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-08928
|
06/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and/or Consolidation of Appeals. (SC) | | 21-18152
|
07/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants have filed a motion to consolidate the appeal in Docket No. 82360 with the appeal in Docket No. 83131. The motion to consolidate these appeals is denied at this time. Additionally, appellants have moved for an extension of time to file the opening brief in Docket No. 82360. The motion is granted to the following extent. Opening brief and appendix due: 14 days. Nos 82360/83131. (SC) | | 21-20693
|
08/02/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-22438
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-22440
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-22441
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 3 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-22442
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 3 Part 2. (SC) | | 21-22444
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 4 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-22445
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 4 Part 2. (SC) | | 21-22446
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 5 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-22447
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 5 Part 2. (SC) | | 21-22448
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-22449
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 21-22450
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 8 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-22451
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 8 Part 2. (SC) | | 21-22452
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 9. (SC) | | 21-22453
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol.10 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-22454
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 10 Part 2. (SC) | | 21-22455
|
08/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix. Vol. 11. (SC) | | 21-22456
|
08/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-24814
|
08/26/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date October 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-24832
|
09/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a supplemental opening brief and appendix to address any issues raised in docket no. 83131, if deemed necessary. If no supplemental opening brief is necessary, appellants shall inform this court in writing within the same time period. Nos. 82360/83131. (SC) | | 21-25603
|
09/07/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice Informing the Court they will not be filing a Supplemental Brief. Nos. 82360/83131 (SC) | | 21-25878
|
09/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pursuant to this court's September 2, 2021, order, appellants have filed a notice informing this court that they will not be filing a supplemental opening brief. Respondents' answering brief remains due to be filed on or before October 1, 2021. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1) Nos. 82360/83131. (SC) | | 21-26280
|
10/01/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent Steven Barket's Joinder to Appellants Naveneet Sharda and Trata Inc.'s Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/28/2021.) (SC) | | |
10/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion for Excess Pages Answering Brief. Nos. 82360/83131 (SC) | | 21-28270
|
10/01/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Shafik Hirji, Shafik Brown, and Furniture Boutique, LLC's Answering Brief. Nos. 82360/83131(SC) | | 21-28271
|
10/04/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Strike Steven Barket's Joinder to Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 82360/83131 (SC) | | 21-28438
|
10/12/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents Steven Barket and G65 Ventures, LLC shall have until October 25, 2021, to file and serve the response to respondents motion to strike filed on October 4, 2021. Nos. 82360/83131. (SC) | | 21-29206
|
10/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Navneet Sharda & Trata, Inc's Limited Opposition to Motion to Strike Steven Barket's Joinder to Appellants Navneet Sharda & Trata Inc's Opening Brief. Nos. 82360/83131 (SC) | | 21-29226
|
10/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Opposition to Motion to Strike Joinder to Appellants Naveneet Sharda and Trata Inc.'s Opening Brief. Nos. 82360/83131 (SC) | | 21-29230
|
10/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply to Motion to Strike Joinder to Appellant's Navneet Sharda and Trata Inc.'s Opening Brief. Nos 83131/82630. (SC) | | 21-29879
|
10/28/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' (Navneet Sharda & Trata Inc.) Reply Brief. Nos 82360/83131 (SC) | | 21-31116
|
10/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondents Shafik Hirji, Shafik Brown, and Furniture Boutique, LLC's motion for leave to file an answering brief in excess of the type-volume limitation is granted. The answering brief was filed on October 1, 2021. Respondent Steven Barket filed a limited joinder to appellants' opening brief on October 1, 2021. The Hirji respondents have filed a motion to strike the joinder. Because Barket is not an appellant in this appeal, he may not join appellants' opening brief. The joinder is disapproved and the motion to strike it is granted. The clerk shall strike the joinder filed on October 1, 2021. Barket and G65 Ventures, LLC shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief. Nos. 82360/83131. (SC) | | 21-31132
|
01/05/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
03/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "We reverse the district court's December 14, 2020, order and remand this matter for further proceedings." fn1 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] RP/LS/MG. (SC) | | 22-08514
|
04/11/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 82360/83131. (SC) | | 22-11254
|
04/11/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 82360/83131. (SC) | | |
04/29/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 12, 2022. Nos. 82360/83131. (SC) | | 22-11254
|