Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/09/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
04/09/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-10244
|
04/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-10246
|
04/09/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Jamie S. Cogburn. (SC) | | |
04/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 21-10304
|
04/12/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. (SC) | | 21-10490
|
04/30/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-12476
|
05/03/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 21-12598
|
05/04/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-12780
|
05/13/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC) | | 21-13777
|
07/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (First Request) (SC) | | 21-20761
|
07/20/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Opening Brief and Appendix. Due date September 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-20796
|
08/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-25241
|
08/31/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief. The motion is not signed by counsel of record as required by NRAP 25(a)(5). Accordingly, this court will take no action on the motion. (SC) | | 21-25395
|
08/31/2021 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 21-25439
|
09/07/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: September 15, 2021. (SC) | | 21-25852
|
09/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-26767
|
09/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. (SC) | | 21-26768
|
09/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Addendum to the Appendix. Vol. 1 (REJECTED PER PHONE WITH COUNSEL) (SC) | | |
09/16/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellants' Addendum to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-26809
|
09/16/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellants' Addendum to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-26810
|
09/16/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellants' Addendum to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-26811
|
09/16/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Appellants' Addendum to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-26813
|
09/21/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Amicus Counsel (In Support of Appellant). (SC) | | 21-27313
|
09/21/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief of The Nevada Justice Association (First Request). (SC) | | 21-27314
|
10/11/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Counsel and Granting Motion. Attorneys Micah Echols and David Snyder of Claggett & Sykes Law Firm and Matthew Sharp of the Law Office of Matthew Sharp as counsel of record for proposed amicus curiae Nevada Justice Association. Nevada Justice Association shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve any motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae. (SC) | | 21-29136
|
10/20/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Daniel F. Polsenberg, Joel D. Henriod, and Abraham G. Smith. (SC) | | 21-30282
|
10/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief and Motion for Leave to Request Extension After the Deadline. (SC) | | 21-30283
|
11/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until November 15, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-31546
|
11/10/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of the Nevada Justice Association. (In Support of Appellant)(SC) | | 21-32418
|
11/10/2021 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief of the Nevada Justice Association. (In Support of Appellant)(SC) | | 21-32419
|
11/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-32818
|
12/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The unopposed motion of the Nevada Justice Association for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of appellants is granted. NRAP 29. The amicus brief was filed on November 10, 2021. Respondent's motion requesting a second extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. NRAP 31(b)(3)(B). Respondent shall have until December 15, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-34608
|
12/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-35782
|
12/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until January 14, 2022, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-36843
|
01/14/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-01570
|
02/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-04343
|
02/08/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Reply Brief due: March 16, 2022) | | 22-04348
|
03/15/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-08137
|
03/21/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until April 4, 2022, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 22-08800
|
04/04/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-10361
|
04/05/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
08/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on September 8, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-24757
|
08/25/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-26560
|
09/02/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument. (SC) | | 22-27664
|
09/06/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 22-27926
|
10/27/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, C.J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Stiglich/Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 70. fn3 [The Honorable Abbi Silver has retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] En Banc. (SC) | | 22-33783
|
11/02/2022 | Motion | Filed Verified Bill of Costs. (SC) | | 22-34387
|
11/29/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Bill of Costs. Appellant has timely filed an unopposed bill seeking costs for counsel's transportation to attend oral argument. Cause appearing, the bill of costs is approved. NRAP 39(c). The clerk of this court shall issue an itemized statement of costs in the amount of $448.05 for insertion in the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-37350
|
11/30/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $448.05. (SC) | | 22-37541
|
11/30/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements Allowed and Taxed in the Amount of $448.05 (SC). | | 22-37544
|
11/30/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
12/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 1, 2022. (SC) | | 22-37544
|