Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82895
Short Caption:AEROGROW INT'L, INC. VS. DIST. CT. (RADOFF)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):83835
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A827665Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/15/2021How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/13/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Maximilien D. Fetaz. (SC)
05/13/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus to Reverse District Court's Order Granting Joint Motion to Compel. (SC)21-13771
05/13/2021MotionFiled Aerogrow International, Inc.'s Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Expedited Review and Stay of Order Granting Joint Motion to Compel. (SC)21-13774
05/13/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance for Pro Hac Vice's. (SC)21-13776
05/13/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)21-13778
05/13/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)21-13779
05/13/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC)21-13780
05/13/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC)21-13781
05/13/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC)21-13782
05/13/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (SC)21-13783
05/13/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. (SC)21-13784
05/13/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8. (SC)21-13786
05/13/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9. (SC)21-13787
05/13/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 10. (SC)21-13788
05/13/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 11. (SC)21-13789
05/13/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12. (SC)21-13790
05/14/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer and Granting Temporary Stay. Answer due: 7 days. We temporarily stay the subject district court order pending our receipt and consideration of any timely opposition to the stay motion and further order of this court. (SC)21-14031
05/20/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest (Bradley Louis Radoff) Notice of Appearance for Alexander K. Calaway. (SC)21-14568
05/21/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Real Parties in Interests' Notice of Appearance for J. Robert Smith and Kendra J. Jepsen. (SC)21-14664
05/21/2021Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interest's Joint Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus to Reverse District Court's Order Granting Joint Motion to Compel. (SC)21-14714
05/27/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Address (Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP). (SC)21-15185
05/28/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stay. On May 14, this court ordered an answer and granted a temporary stay pending our receipt and consideration of any opposition to petitioner's emergency stay motion. Although real parties in interest timely filed their answer, they have not opposed the stay motion. Therefore and based on the NRAP 8(c) factors, the motion is granted and the district court's order will remain stayed pending our consideration of this writ petition and further order of this court. (SC).21-15350
09/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC)21-26696
12/09/2021Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Before: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 76. SNP21-RP/LS/AS. (SC).21-35060
12/09/2021WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and two copies of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Maximilien D. Fetaz for service upon Chief Judge and Department 11 of the 8th Judicial District Court. (SC)21-35078
12/13/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service of Writ of Mandamus and Opinion. (SC)21-35373
12/20/2021WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Linda Marie Bell, Presiding Judge Eighth Dist. Ct. and Judge Mark Denton on December 13, 2021. (SC)21-36235
12/20/2021MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest's Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-36268
01/07/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real parties shall have until January 26, 2022, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. If no petition for rehearing is filed within this time period, the clerk shall issue the notice in lieu of remittitur. (SC)22-00767
01/10/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Real Parties in Interest's Notice of Appearance and Change of Counsel. (SC)22-00914
01/26/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-02674
01/26/2022Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from J. Robert Smith. (SC)
02/07/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Petitioner's Answer due: 14 days. (SC)22-04074
02/22/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petitioner's Answer to Real Parties in Interest's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-05737
03/15/2022Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)22-08213
03/25/2022MotionFiled Real Parties in Interests' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)22-09427
03/30/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Real parties shall have until April 28, 2022, to file and serve a petition for en banc reconsideration. If no petition for en banc reconsideration is timely filed, the clerk of this court shall issue the notice in lieu of remittitur. (SC)22-09823
04/28/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Real Parties in Interest Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)22-13575
05/13/2022Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC (SC)22-15241
06/07/2022RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur/Reconsideration. (SC)22-18020
06/07/2022Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)