Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82991
Short Caption:IN RE: 23 PARTNERS TR. ICourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P104279Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeeCase Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/09/2021 / Lavelle, EleissaSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/14/2022 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Courtroom
Submission Date:09/14/2022How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/03/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
06/03/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-15913
06/03/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-15918
06/03/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (SC)
06/03/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (SC)21-15920
06/03/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) (SC)21-15922
06/04/2021Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Russel J. Geist (Appellant/Cross-Respondents). (SC)
06/07/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Solomon Dwiggins Freer & Steadman. Check no. 19369. (Cross-Appeal) (SC)
06/07/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statements mailed to counsel for parties - due: 21 days. (SC)21-16260
06/09/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eleissa C. Lavelle. (SC)21-16489
06/28/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellants/Cross-Respondents Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-18588
06/28/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants/Cross-Respondents Amended Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement Civil Appeals). (SC)21-18590
06/28/2021Docketing StatementFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-18601
07/28/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for September 27, 2021, at 9:30 AM. (SC)21-21855
10/01/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (SC)21-28306
10/07/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)21-28871
10/08/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants/cross-respondents and respondent cross-appellant each: 14 days transcript request. Appellants/cross-respondents: 90 days opening brief and appendix.21-28969
10/08/2021MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Opposition to Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (SC)21-28982
10/15/2021MotionFiled Appellants' Reply in Support of Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (SC)21-29746
10/22/2021Transcript RequestFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)21-30597
11/23/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stay. Appellants/cross-respondents Michael Nedder and Douglas DeLuca (the Trustees) have filed a motion to stay the enforcement of the district court's April 23, 2021. We grant the Trustees' motion to stay pending the outcome of this appeal. (SC).21-33726
01/05/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Attorney. (SC)22-00474
01/05/2022MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request). (SC)22-00476
01/07/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to the notice of appearance filed January 5, 2022, the clerk of this court shall had attorney Todd W. Prall of Hutchison & Steffen, LLC as counsel of record for appellants/cross-respondents. The parties' stipulation to extend the time to file the opening brief on appeal is approved. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have until February 2, 2022, to file and serve the opening brief on appeal and an appendix. (SC)22-00731
02/02/2022BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. (SC)22-03596
02/02/2022AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 1. (SC)22-03598
02/02/2022AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 2. (SC)22-03599
02/02/2022AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 3. (SC)22-03600
03/04/2022MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Submit Certain Portions of the Court Record Under Seal. (SC)22-07041
03/04/2022BriefFiled Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Opening Brief. (Redacted) (SC)22-07089
03/04/2022AppendixFiled Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Appendix (Volume 1). (SC)22-07090
03/04/2022MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Leave to: (A) File Under Seal (1) Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Opening Brief; and (2) Appendix Volume 2; and (b) Publicly File Redacted Opening Brief. (SC)22-07091
03/07/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Submit Certain Portions of the Court Record Under Seal. (SC)22-07248
03/11/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the combined brief, respondent/cross-appellant's appendix Vol. 2, and appellant's portion of the court record, all received on March 7, 2022, under seal. (SC)22-07818
03/11/2022BriefFiled Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Opening Brief - SEALED. (SC)
03/11/2022AppendixFiled Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Appendix - Vol. 2 - SEALED. (SC)
03/11/2022Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Appellant's Portion of the Court Record (Exhibit) - SEALED (SC)
04/04/2022BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Brief and Response (Answering) Brief. (SC)22-10441
04/18/2022MotionFiled Motion for Leave to: (A) File Under Seal Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief; and (B) Publicly File Redacted Reply Brief. (SC)22-12199
04/18/2022BriefFiled Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief (Redacted). (SC)22-12200
05/04/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's motion for leave to file the reply brief on cross-appeal under seal is denied at this time because it is not accompanied by a copy of the proposed brief. The submitted brief will remain confidential pending this court's ruling on any renewed motion to file the brief under seal. fn1 [Respondent/cross-appellant's motion indicates that a copy of the reply brief was mailed to this court on April 18, 2022. However, to date, the court has not received the brief. ]. (SC)22-14157
05/04/2022Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/09/2022MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Renewed Motion for Leave to: (A) File Under Seal Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief, and (B) Publicly File Redacted Opening Brief. (SC)22-14741
05/12/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's motion for leave to file the reply brief on cross-appeal under seal is granted. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on May 10, 2022, under seal. (SC)22-15080
05/12/2022BriefFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief (SEALED). (SC)
08/10/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for September 14, 2022, at 2:00 p.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)22-25092
08/31/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)22-27382
09/12/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Notice of Appearance for Alexander R. Velto. (SC)22-28464
09/14/2022Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/DH. (SC).
12/22/2022Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 84. fn1 [Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall amend the caption on this court's docket so that it is consistent with the caption appearing on this opinion.] SNP22-JH/LS/DH. (SC).22-40140
12/27/2022OtherJustice Patricia Lee disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms
01/05/2023MotionFiled Motion for En Banc Reconsideration (REJECTED PER 01/06/22 NOTICE). (SC)
01/06/2023Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Petition for Reconsideration. Due date: 5 days. (SC).23-00460
01/12/2023MotionFiled Petition for Rehearing (REJECTED PER 01/12/23 NOTICE). (SC).
01/12/2023Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Petition for Rehearing. Due date: 5 days. (SC).23-01081
01/13/2023Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC).Y23-01297
01/13/2023Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Alexander R. Velto. (SC).