Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/03/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
06/03/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-15913
|
06/03/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-15918
|
06/03/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | |
06/03/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-15920
|
06/03/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | 21-15922
|
06/04/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Russel J. Geist (Appellant/Cross-Respondents). (SC) | | |
06/07/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Solomon Dwiggins Freer & Steadman. Check no. 19369. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | |
06/07/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statements mailed to counsel for parties - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-16260
|
06/09/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eleissa C. Lavelle. (SC) | | 21-16489
|
06/28/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-18588
|
06/28/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents Amended Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement Civil Appeals). (SC) | | 21-18590
|
06/28/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-18601
|
07/28/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for September 27, 2021, at 9:30 AM. (SC) | | 21-21855
|
10/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (SC) | | 21-28306
|
10/07/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-28871
|
10/08/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants/cross-respondents and respondent cross-appellant each: 14 days transcript request. Appellants/cross-respondents: 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 21-28969
|
10/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Opposition to Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (SC) | | 21-28982
|
10/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Reply in Support of Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. (SC) | | 21-29746
|
10/22/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-30597
|
11/23/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Stay. Appellants/cross-respondents Michael Nedder and Douglas DeLuca (the Trustees) have filed a motion to stay the enforcement of the district court's April 23, 2021. We grant the Trustees' motion to stay pending the outcome of this appeal. (SC). | | 21-33726
|
01/05/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Attorney. (SC) | | 22-00474
|
01/05/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request). (SC) | | 22-00476
|
01/07/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pursuant to the notice of appearance filed January 5, 2022, the clerk of this court shall had attorney Todd W. Prall of Hutchison & Steffen, LLC as counsel of record for appellants/cross-respondents. The parties' stipulation to extend the time to file the opening brief on appeal is approved. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have until February 2, 2022, to file and serve the opening brief on appeal and an appendix. (SC) | | 22-00731
|
02/02/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-03596
|
02/02/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-03598
|
02/02/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 2. (SC) | | 22-03599
|
02/02/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol. 3. (SC) | | 22-03600
|
03/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Submit Certain Portions of the Court Record Under Seal. (SC) | | 22-07041
|
03/04/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Opening Brief. (Redacted) (SC) | | 22-07089
|
03/04/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Appendix (Volume 1). (SC) | | 22-07090
|
03/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Leave to: (A) File Under Seal (1) Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Opening Brief; and (2) Appendix Volume 2; and (b) Publicly File Redacted Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-07091
|
03/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Submit Certain Portions of the Court Record Under Seal. (SC) | | 22-07248
|
03/11/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the combined brief, respondent/cross-appellant's appendix Vol. 2, and appellant's portion of the court record, all received on March 7, 2022, under seal. (SC) | | 22-07818
|
03/11/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Opening Brief - SEALED. (SC) | | |
03/11/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellant's Appendix - Vol. 2 - SEALED. (SC) | | |
03/11/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant's Portion of the Court Record (Exhibit) - SEALED (SC) | | |
04/04/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Brief and Response (Answering) Brief. (SC) | | 22-10441
|
04/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to: (A) File Under Seal Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief; and (B) Publicly File Redacted Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-12199
|
04/18/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief (Redacted). (SC) | | 22-12200
|
05/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's motion for leave to file the reply brief on cross-appeal under seal is denied at this time because it is not accompanied by a copy of the proposed brief. The submitted brief will remain confidential pending this court's ruling on any renewed motion to file the brief under seal. fn1 [Respondent/cross-appellant's motion indicates that a copy of the reply brief was mailed to this court on April 18, 2022. However, to date, the court has not received the brief. ]. (SC) | | 22-14157
|
05/04/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
05/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Renewed Motion for Leave to: (A) File Under Seal Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief, and (B) Publicly File Redacted Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-14741
|
05/12/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's motion for leave to file the reply brief on cross-appeal under seal is granted. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on May 10, 2022, under seal. (SC) | | 22-15080
|
05/12/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief (SEALED). (SC) | | |
08/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for September 14, 2022, at 2:00 p.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-25092
|
08/31/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-27382
|
09/12/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Notice of Appearance for Alexander R. Velto. (SC) | | 22-28464
|
09/14/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/DH. (SC). | | |
12/22/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 84. fn1 [Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall amend the caption on this court's docket so that it is consistent with the caption appearing on this opinion.] SNP22-JH/LS/DH. (SC). | | 22-40140
|
12/27/2022 | Other | Justice Patricia Lee disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms | | |
01/05/2023 | Motion | Filed Motion for En Banc Reconsideration (REJECTED PER 01/06/22 NOTICE). (SC) | | |
01/06/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Petition for Reconsideration. Due date: 5 days. (SC). | | 23-00460
|
01/12/2023 | Motion | Filed Petition for Rehearing (REJECTED PER 01/12/23 NOTICE). (SC). | | |
01/12/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Petition for Rehearing. Due date: 5 days. (SC). | | 23-01081
|
01/13/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC). | | 23-01297
|
01/13/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Alexander R. Velto. (SC). | | |
01/30/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." fn1 [The Honorable Justice Hardesty having retired did not participate in the decision on rehearing.] NRAP 40(c). SNP22 - LS/DH. (SC) | | 23-02834
|
02/13/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 23-04412
|
02/27/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [The Honorable Patricia Lee, Justice, did not participate in the decision in this matter.] EN BANC. (SC) | | 23-05961
|
03/24/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/24/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-09128
|
04/03/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 27, 2023. (SC) | | 23-09128
|