Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83458
Short Caption:BONHAM VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82800, 83033, 83458-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A823142Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/02/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
09/02/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-25606
09/02/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)21-25608
09/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days. (SC)21-26347
09/14/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 1 - Part 1. (SC)21-26601
09/14/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 2 - Part 1. (SC)21-26603
09/14/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Volume 3. (SC)21-26605
09/20/2021Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal pages 7 to 11, 12 to 13, 49 to 50, 51 to 54 and 57 to 72 (SEALED). (SC)
09/20/2021BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)21-27143
09/20/2021OtherReturned Unfiled Document - Proper Person Appendix with Brief. (SC)21-27146
11/12/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
12/06/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).21-34677
12/06/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
03/17/2022Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "We must reverse this matter in part and remand this case for the district court to address this issue in the first instance." fn3 [In light of our disposition of this appeal, we take no action with respect to the "notice to the court," which was filed on March 7, 2022. Nevertheless, nothing in our disposition of this appeal prevents Bonham from raising the issues presented in the notice on remand.] Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC)
04/11/2022Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals
04/11/2022RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)22-11282
04/11/2022Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
04/29/2022RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 12, 2022. (SC)22-11282