Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83458-COA
Short Caption:BONHAM VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):82800, 83033, 83458
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A823142Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/06/2021Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
03/07/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice to the Court. (COA)22-07217
03/17/2022Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "We must reverse this matter in part and remand this case for the district court to address this issue in the first instance." fn3 [In light of our disposition of this appeal, we take no action with respect to the "notice to the court," which was filed on March 7, 2022. Nevertheless, nothing in our disposition of this appeal prevents Bonham from raising the issues presented in the notice on remand.] Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA)22-08478
04/11/2022Case Status UpdateTransferred to Supreme Court. (COA)
04/11/2022Case Status UpdateCase Closed. (COA)