Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/08/2023 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | |
03/08/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 23-07110
|
03/08/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC) | | 23-07112
|
03/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. (SC) | | 23-07592
|
03/16/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal for Case #A-20-823142-C. Vol. 1 (SC) | | 23-08122
|
03/16/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal for Case #A-20-823142-C. Vol. 2 (SC) | | 23-08123
|
03/16/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal for Case #A-20-823142-C. Vol. 3 (SC) | | 23-08125
|
03/16/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed District Court's Record on Appeal for Case #A-20-823142-C. Vol. 4 (SC) | | 23-08126
|
03/22/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed SEALED Record on Appeal Documents. Pages: 7-11, 12-13, 49-50, 52-55, and 57-72. (SC) | | |
03/23/2023 | Filing Fee | Cross-Appeal Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality. (SC) | | |
03/23/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (SC) | | 23-08959
|
03/23/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil (Cross-Appeal). Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-08963
|
03/28/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Judicial Notice. (SC). | | 23-09445
|
03/28/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days. (Judicial Notice). (SC). | | 23-09447
|
03/29/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a notice informing this court that he mistakenly filed the brief meant for this case in Docket No. 86114. Accordingly, the clerk shall file in this case, the pro se informal brief filed on March 7, 2023, in Docket No. 86114. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have until July 6, 2023, to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. fn1[ This court waives the requirement for appellant to provide proof of service of the notice.] (SC) | | 23-09583
|
03/29/2023 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Informal Brief. (TRANSFERRED FROM CASE NO. 86114 PER 3/29/23 ORDER) (SC) | | 23-09585
|
03/30/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 23-09791
|
04/19/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Docketing Statements. Appellant and respondents shall each have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve their docketing statement. (SC) | | 23-12151
|
04/25/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/25/23) (SC) | | |
04/25/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 5 days. (SC) | | 23-12922
|
04/26/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-13010
|
05/01/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Second NOA. (SC) | | 23-13601
|
05/08/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross Respondent's Motion to Extend Copywork Limit. (SC) | | 23-14533
|
05/08/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-14534
|
05/22/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant/cross-respondent has filed a pro se motion to extend his prison copy-work limit so that he may provide this court with copies of the documents required by Docketing Statement Item 27. The motion is denied. However, this court waives the requirement for appellant/cross-respondent to attach supporting documents to his docketing statement. (SC) | | 23-16148
|
07/06/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Combined Answering Brief on Appeal/Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. [First Request] (SC) | | 23-21594
|
07/12/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have until August 10, 2023, to file and serve the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 23-22311
|
08/10/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross Appeal. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 8/10/23) (SC) | | |
08/10/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Answering Brief on Appeal/Opening Brief on Cross Appeal - No Notice of Appearance. Due in 5 days. (SC) | | 23-25965
|
08/11/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Notice of Appearance for Chris Davis. (SC) | | 23-26129
|
08/11/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross Appeal. (SC) | | 23-26134
|
08/16/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Attorney Chris Davis has filed a notice of appearance on behalf of all respondents/cross-appellants except James Dzurenda. The clerk shall add Mr. Davis as counsel of record for all respondents/cross-appellants except Dzurenda. Davis also purports to notice an appearance on behalf of Charles Daniels. However, Charles Daniels is not listed as a respondent/cross-appellant in this court's caption. If any party wishes to change the caption of this appeal, they shall file an appropriate motion in this court within 7 days of the date of this order. (SC) | | 23-26740
|
08/23/2023 | Motion | Filed Motion to Correct Caption. (SC). | | 23-27529
|
09/01/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Caption. Certain respondents/cross-appellants have filed a motion to correct the caption of this matter. The clerk shall modify the caption consistent with the caption on this order. Should any party object to the modification, they shall so notify this court, in writing, within 7 days of the date of this order. (SC) | | 23-28815
|
09/06/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Appellant/Cross-Respondents Supplemental Pleading in Support of Reply to Answering Brief and Opening Cross Appeal by Respondent/Cross-Appellants. (SC). | | 23-29054
|
09/06/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents Reply to Respondent/Cross-Appellants Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross Appeal. (SC). | | 23-29649
|
10/11/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondents'/Cross-Appellants' Motion to Extend the Time to File A Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC). | | 23-33251
|
10/23/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents/cross-appellants' reply brief on cross-appeal due: November 27, 2023. (SC) | | 23-34441
|
11/27/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Reply Brief In Support Of Cross Appeal. (SC) | | 23-38202
|
11/27/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
12/14/2023 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. (SC) | | 23-40602
|
02/06/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 24-04338
|
02/06/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |