Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83621
Short Caption:IN RE: B.J.W.-A. C/W 84276Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:83621*, 84276Related Case(s):84276
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - J353445Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Juvenile
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:11/08/2022 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:11/08/2022How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/13/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Juvenile Matter. (SC)
10/13/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SEALED) (SC)
10/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)21-29478
10/19/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/16/21 and 9/23/21. To Court Reporter: Kim Gurule. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/20/21) (SC)
10/20/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)21-30137
10/21/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC)21-30336
10/21/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/16/21 and 9/23/21. To Court Reporter: Kim Gurule. (SC)21-30337
10/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion requesting an extension of time to file a transcript request form is granted. The transcript request form was filed on October 21, 2021. (SC)21-30576
10/27/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (SC)21-31013
11/02/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Appellant. (SC)21-31486
11/02/2021Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)21-31488
11/05/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall remove Kristy S. Holiday and the Clark County Public Defender as counsel of record for appellant. The clerk shall add attorney W. Jeremey Storms as counsel for appellant in this appeal. Mr. Storms is reminded that the opening brief and appendix are due to be filed on or before February 10, 2022. (SC)21-31866
11/15/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/16/21 and 9/23/21. (SC)21-32710
01/18/2022TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/16/21. (SC)22-01730
02/09/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request). (SC)22-04415
02/11/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 14, 2022, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)22-04700
02/28/2022TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/3/22. (SC)
03/01/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Cases for Direct Appeal and Request for Expedited Decision. (Consolidate with docket no. 84276) (SC)22-06511
03/01/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Jonathan Vanboskerck. (SC)
03/03/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Consolidate Appeals. These appeals shall be consolidated for all appellate purposes. Appellant shall have until March 14, 2022, to file and serve a single opening brief and an appendix. Nos 83621/84276 (SC)22-06848
03/14/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Seal the Briefs and the Appendix, Notice Appeal will be filed as an Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e). Nos. 83621/84276 (SC)22-07977
03/14/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e). Nos. 83621/84276 (SC)22-07982
03/15/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e). Nos. 83621/84276 (SC)22-08113
03/21/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to file his opening brief and appendix under seal pursuant to SRCR 3(4)(h) and SRCR 7. The motion to seal is denied without prejudice. Appellant submitted his opening brief and appendix for filing on March 14, 2022. The clerk of this court shall return those documents unfiled. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix, along with any renewed motion to seal or motion to file certain documents subject to redaction. Appellant has filed a motion to expedite the resolution of these consolidated appeals, wherein he seeks to have the appeals "reviewed on an emergency basis pursuant to NRAP 27(e)." This court grants the motion to the following extent. The resolution of this appeal shall be expedited to the extent that this court's docket permits. Nos. 83621/84276 (SC)22-08792
03/31/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Redacted Briefs as well as Redacted Appellant's Appendix and Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 83621/84276 (SC)22-10089
04/19/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and redacted appendix received on March 31, 2022. The clerk shall file the unredacted appendix received on March 31, 2022, under seal. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief. Nos 83621/84276. (SC)22-12331
04/19/2022BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 83621/84276 (FILED PER ORDER 4/19/22). (SC)22-12332
04/19/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vols. 1-2 (Redacted). Nos. 83621/84276. (FILED PER ORDER 4/19/22). (SC)22-12334
04/19/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vols. 1-2 (Un-Redacted). Nos. 83621/84276. (FILED PER ORDER 4/19/22). (SC)
05/04/2022BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 83621/84276. (SC)22-14150
05/09/2022BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 83621/84276 (SC)22-14728
05/09/2022Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 83621/84276 (SC)
10/06/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. this matter is scheduled for oral argument on November 8, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 83621/84276 (SC)22-31517
10/17/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Julian Gregory. Nos. 83621/84276 (SC)22-32623
10/19/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The Special Public Defender has filed a notice that Chief Deputy Special Public Defender Julian Gregory is appearing as counsel for appellant. The clerk of this court shall add Mr. Gregory as counsel of record for appellant. The Special Public Defender also informs this court that W. Jeremy Storms is no longer employed with the Special Public Defender's office. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall remove Mr. Storms as counsel of record for appellant. Nos. 83621/84276 (SC)22-32906
10/24/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 83621/84276 (SC)22-33336
11/08/2022Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court En Banc. Nos. 83621/84276. (SC).
01/12/2023Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Herndon, J. Majority: Stiglich/Cadish/Herndon/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., dissenting. 139 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 1 fn1 [The Honorable Patricia Lee and the Honorable Linda Bell did not participate in the decision of this matter]. En Banc. Nos. 83621/84276 (SC)23-01117