Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/16/2020 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
07/16/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-26182
|
07/20/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Peggy Hoogs stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/15/20. (SC) | | 20-26385
|
08/07/2020 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-29087
|
08/19/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. District court's order appointing counsel due: 35 days. (SC) | | 20-30574
|
08/27/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on appointing counsel for appellant/order appointing counsel. (SC) | | 20-31741
|
09/01/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Notice of Appearance of Counsel. (Tracie Linderman) (SC) | | 20-32145
|
09/02/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Withdrawal of Court Appointed Appellate Counsel. (SC) | | 20-32401
|
09/09/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Recall Order of Limited Remand. (SC) | | 20-33164
|
09/11/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions and Setting Briefing Schedule. The clerk of this court shall add Tracie Lindeman to the docket in this appeal as counsel for appellant. Appellant has filed a motion to discharge Ms. Lindeman and for leave to proceed pro se and a motion to recall the order of remand. The motions are denied. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-33632
|
10/26/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-39164
|
11/11/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time Motion to File Transcript Requests and Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-41226
|
11/13/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: November 16, 2020. (SC). | | 20-41457
|
11/16/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC). | | 20-41740
|
11/16/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (REJECTED PER 11/17/20 NOTICE). (SC). | | |
11/17/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC). | | 20-41860
|
11/29/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/7/20 To Court Reporter: T. Amundson. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 11/30/20) (SC) | | |
11/30/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 20-43195
|
12/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Transcript Request. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 12/3/20) (SC) | | |
12/03/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 20-43888
|
12/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Transcript Request. (SC) | | 20-43896
|
12/03/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/7/20 To Court Reporter: T. Amundson. (SC) | | 20-43897
|
12/07/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time to file the transcript request form is granted. The transcript request form was filed on December 3, 2020. (SC) | | 20-44384
|
01/11/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: January 25, 2021. (SC) | | 21-00806
|
01/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-01992
|
01/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: February 24, 2021. (SC) | | 21-02391
|
02/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Emergency Motion for Withdrawal of Court Appointed Counsel and to Proceed in Proper Person. (SC) | | 21-03882
|
02/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a second motion to discharge his appointed counsel and to proceed pro se. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 21-04792
|
02/23/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-05385
|
02/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-05387
|
02/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-05386
|
03/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion Petition for En Banc Review. (Motion Denied on February 18th, 2021). (SC) | | 21-06127
|
03/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a petition for en banc reconsideration of this court's rulings. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 21-06338
|
03/25/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Marilee Cate. (SC) | | 21-08573
|
03/25/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-08574
|
03/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Transmit PSI. (SC) | | 21-08575
|
04/07/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. The motion to direct the district court clerk to transmit a copy of the presentence investigation report in this matter (district court case number CR96-1581) is granted. Presentence investigation report due: 14 days. (SC) | | 21-09969
|
04/13/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Victoria T. Oldenburg. (SC) | | 21-10605
|
04/13/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Attorney Victoria T. Oldenburg has filed a notice of appearance as counsel for appellant. The clerk of this court shall add Ms. Oldenburg and Oldenburg Law Office to the docket as counsel for appellant. (SC) | | 21-10676
|
04/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Discharge Court Appointed Counsel and Leave to Proceed on Appeal Proper Person. (SC) | | 21-11097
|
04/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-11150
|
04/19/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief. Due date May 26, 2021. (SC) | | 21-11163
|
04/19/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. (SEALED) Presentence Investigation Report. (SC) | | |
04/22/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a third motion to discharge his appointed counsel and to proceed pro se. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 21-11657
|
05/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Permission to File Amended Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-12961
|
05/13/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended opening brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (SC) | | 21-13736
|
08/10/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-23254
|
08/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-23255
|
09/09/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: September 23, 2021. (SC) | | 21-26154
|
09/23/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-27578
|
10/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Emergency Motion to Proceed in Proper Person. (SC) | | 21-28720
|
10/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a fourth motion to discharge his appointed counsel and to proceed pro se. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 21-29825
|
11/09/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC) | | |
12/14/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-35495
|
12/14/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
12/14/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
02/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-05286
|
02/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
03/14/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
03/14/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
03/14/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
03/14/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-07974
|
03/14/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/11/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 16, 2022. (SC) | | 22-07974
|