Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/06/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
10/06/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
10/06/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Second NOA) (SEALED) (SC) | | |
10/06/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-36686
|
10/07/2020 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Aaron Grigsby. (SC) | | |
10/07/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 20-36759
|
10/07/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC). | | 20-36802
|
10/09/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (Mitchell Stipp as co-counsel and representing himself as respondent) (SC) | | 20-37170
|
10/29/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's docketing statement due: November 4, 2020. (SC) | | 20-39589
|
11/04/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-40260
|
11/05/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-40388
|
11/10/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 8, 2020 at 9:00 AM via Zoom. (SC) | | 20-41166
|
11/12/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent's Response to Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-41406
|
12/24/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 14, 2021, at 9:00 AM via Zoom. (SC) | | 20-46509
|
02/17/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 23, 2021, at 9:00 AM via Zoom. (SC) | | 21-04654
|
02/25/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties are negotiating. The Settlement Judge recommends the settlement proceedings be continued until March 12, 2021. (SC) | | 21-05591
|
02/26/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to March 12, 2021. S(C) | | 21-05741
|
04/07/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement judge requests an additional 14 days to continue the settlement negotiations. (SC). | | 21-10013
|
04/14/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The settlement judge shall file the Final Settlement Conference Status Report within 2 weeks of the date of this order. (SC) | | 21-10825
|
05/06/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-13087
|
05/10/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated Pursuant to NRAP3E. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 40 days fast track statement and appendix. Respondent(s): 21 days from fast track statement to file fast track response. (SC) | | 21-13318
|
05/23/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/23/20, 3/5/20, and 8/27/20. To Court Reporter: Rachel Chaisson. (SC) | | 21-14727
|
06/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-17469
|
06/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: September 20, 2021. (SC) | | 21-18365
|
07/07/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Transcription Video Services - Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/23/20, 3/5/20, and 8/27/20. (SC) | | 21-19432
|
09/20/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Child Custody Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-27178
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume II. (SC) | | 21-27179
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume I. (SC) | | 21-27180
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume IV. (SC) | | 21-27181
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume III. (SC) | | 21-27182
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume V. (SC) | | 21-27183
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume VI. (SC) | | 21-27184
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume VII. (SC) | | 21-27185
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume VIII. (SC) | | 21-27186
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume IX. (SC) | | 21-27187
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume X. (SC) | | 21-27188
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XI. (SC) | | 21-27189
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol XII. (SC) | | 21-27190
|
10/08/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's fast track response due: October 18, 2021. (SC) | | 21-28920
|
10/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-29338
|
10/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion for a second extension of time to file the fast track response. The motion is denied. Respondent shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. (SC) | | 21-29717
|
10/29/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent's Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-31255
|
11/19/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Reply. (SC) | | 21-33493
|
11/22/2021 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
12/14/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-35497
|
12/14/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
12/14/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
04/11/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-11283
|
04/11/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
05/06/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
05/06/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
05/06/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
05/06/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-14506
|
05/06/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
05/20/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 9, 2022. (SC) | | 22-14506
|