Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/14/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | | |
12/14/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 10-32590
|
12/14/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 10-32591
|
12/16/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Patricia L. Vaccarino. Check No. 139. | | |
12/16/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice: Referral to Settlement Program. Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 10-32948
|
12/17/2010 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 133 returned to the Law Offices of Patricia L. Vaccarino. | | |
12/27/2010 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 144 returned toLaw Offices of Patricia Vaccarino. (Filing fee previously paid on 12/16 check no. 139.) | | |
12/27/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) | | 10-33732
|
12/27/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Radford J. Smith check no. 10208. (Cross-Appeal) | | |
12/27/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) | | 10-33734
|
12/28/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program - Settlement Judge: Robert E. Gaston. | | 10-33887
|
01/07/2011 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 1/19/11. | | 11-00806
|
01/11/2011 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/1/10. | | 11-01036
|
01/11/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. | | 11-01086
|
01/11/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Docketing Statement). | | 11-01087
|
01/18/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). | | 11-01572
|
01/18/2011 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibits (copies). Exhibits: Docketing Statement Exhibits H and I. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). | | 11-01573
|
01/24/2011 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 1/24/11 | | 11-02353
|
01/27/2011 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 11-02683
|
02/07/2011 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated Pursuant to NRAP3E. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s) and Cross-Appellant(s): 10 days transcript request; 40 days fast track statement and appendix. Appellant and Cross-Appellant: 20 days from service of fast track statement to file fast track response. Cross-Appellant: 10 days to file case appeal statement. | | 11-03926
|
02/17/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant.). | | 11-05140
|
02/17/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Cross-Appellant's Case Appeal Statement-Letter with Case Cross-Appeal Statement attached. | | 11-05212
|
02/18/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing respondent/cross-appellant: Mitchell D. Stipp, Esq. | | 11-05355
|
02/22/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Respondent/cross-appellant 30 days to file a response. The briefing schedule in the cross-appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Appellant-cross-respondent may file any reply within 10 days from the date that respondent/cross-appellant's response is served. | | 11-05522
|
03/17/2011 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's fast track statement due: March 28, 2011. | | 11-08114
|
03/23/2011 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 11-08943
|
03/31/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols 1-8. | | 11-09742
|
03/31/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement Child Custody. | | 11-09771
|
04/07/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extenstion to File Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply to Response to Order to Show. | | 11-10430
|
04/08/2011 | Motion | Filed Reply to Respondent's Response to Order to Show Regarding Dismissal of Cross-Appeal. | | 11-10572
|
04/18/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Allowing Cross-Appeal to Proceed and Setting Briefing Schedule. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Combined Response/Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 20 days. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Response and Appendix due: 20 days from service of cross-appellant's response. fn1[We deny as moot Christina's April 7, 2011, motion for an extension of time to file her reply, as the clerk of this court filed the reply on April 8, 2011.] | | 11-11508
|
05/09/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Direct Transmittal of Child Custody Evaluation Under Seal. | | 11-13714
|
05/09/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to File Combined Fast Track Statement and Response of Maximum of 25 Pages. | | 11-13715
|
05/18/2011 | Motion | Filed Combined Response to Respondent/Counterclaimant's Motion to File Combined Fast Track Statement and Response of Maximum of 25 Pages and Motion to Direct Transmittal of Child Custody Evaluation Under Seal, and Countermotion for New Order Setting Due Date for Appellant's Child Custody Fast Track Response and for Sanctions to Issue Against Respondent. | | 11-14725
|
05/20/2011 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply To Combined Response/Opposition To Motions To File Combined Fast Track Statement And Response of Maximum of 25 Pages and to Direct Transmittal of Child Custody Evaluation Under Seal. | | 11-14997
|
06/28/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to File Combined Fast Track Statement and Response of 25 Pages and Directing Transmittal of Child Custody Evaluation Under Seal. We direct the clerk of this court to file respondent/cross-appellant's combined fast track statement, response, and appendix, received on May 9, 2011. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Response to Mitchell's Fast Track Statement due: 20 days. We direct the district court to transmit to this court, under seal, Dr. Paglini's April 29, 2010, child custody evaluation. | | 11-19210
|
06/28/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Fast Track Statement and Response. | | 11-19216
|
06/28/2011 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement and Response. | | 11-19217
|
07/08/2011 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Child Custody Evaluation (SEALED). Response to 6/28/11 order. | | |
07/18/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Fast Track Response. | | 11-21472
|
08/01/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Reply to Fast Track Response. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 11-23170
|
08/03/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Reply to Fast Track Response (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). | | 11-23438
|
08/15/2011 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross Respondent's Fast Track Reply. | | 11-24738
|
04/09/2012 | Other | Justice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal. | | |
04/09/2012 | Other | Justice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal | | |
04/24/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Inviting Amicus Curiae Participation. The court requests that the Family Law Section of the State Bar of Nevada participate in this appeal as amicus curiae by filing a brief or briefs. The parties to this appeal shall have 11 days from the date of this order to serve the Family Law Section with copies of their respective notices of appeal, docketing statements, fast track filings, and appendices. Within that same time, the parties shall file in this court properly completed certificates of service. Should the Family Law Section consent to participate as amicus curiae, it shall have 45 days from the date of service of the parties' appellate documents to file and serve any amicus brief or briefs, or notify this court that it intends to decline the invitation to participate as amicus curiae in this matter. | | 12-13008
|
05/03/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of All Documents Ordered to be Receipted by Appellant. | | 12-13935
|
05/04/2012 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibits (copies). Exhibits: Docketing Statement Exhibits E, F and G (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). | | 12-14005
|
05/04/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of CD-ROM with Notice of Appeal; Docketing Statement; Exhibits E thru I for Docketing Statement; Fast Track Statement and Response; Appendix to Fast Track Statment and Response (Parts 1 & 2); Reply to Fast Track Response and Errate to Reply to Fast Track Response. | | 12-14111
|
06/29/2012 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter from Robert Cerceo, Esq. Chair, Family Law Section, State Bar of Nevada accepting Participation in submitting the requested Amicus Brief in this case. | | 12-20599
|
07/06/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Amicus Curiae Brief. The Family Law Section shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve its amicus curiae brief. | | 12-21299
|
07/31/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Amicus Curiae Brief. | | 12-24051
|
08/07/2012 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opposition to the Motion for Extension of Time to file Amicus Curiae Brief due: August 16, 2012. | | 12-24795
|
08/15/2012 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 8/29/12) | | |
08/15/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit of Appellant/Cross-Respondent in Support of Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 8/29/12). | | |
08/16/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Affidavit of Appellant/Cross-Respondent. | | 12-25874
|
08/23/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Request for Submission. | | 12-26594
|
08/23/2012 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion to Strike Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Affidavit of Appellant/Cross-Respondent and Countermotion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. | | 12-26741
|
08/28/2012 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response to Motion to Strike Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Affidavit of Appellant/Cross-Respondent. | | 12-27113
|
08/29/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time and Motion to Strike. Amicus brief from the State Bar of Nevada, Family Law Section (FLS) due: September 17, 2012. We decline to allow additional briefing, and we grant respondent's motion to strike appellant's response and affidavit. The clerk of this court shall strike the response and affidavit, both of which were filed in this court on August 15, 2012. Fn1[In light of this order, we deny as moot the FLS's motion for submission of its motion for extension of time.] Fn2[Appellant's countermotion for attorney fees and costs related to filing a response to respondent's motion to strike is denied.] | | 12-27453
|
09/18/2012 | Brief | Filed Family Law Section of Nevada State Bar's Amicus Brief. | | 12-29412
|
11/26/2012 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Darryl Thomas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/25/12. | | |
03/21/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. | | 13-08497
|
03/21/2013 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
05/24/2013 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court to make specific findings explaining how it arrived at the calculations used to assess the parties' timeshare agreement under Rivero." EN BANC | | 13-15375
|
06/18/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 13-17883
|
06/18/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
07/01/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 22, 2013. | | 13-17883
|
07/17/2013 | Motion | Filed Emergency Motion for Clarification. | | 13-20953
|
07/23/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Clarification. This court's May 24, 2013, order of reversal and remand constituted a final disposition of this appeal and cross-appeal, and thus the remittitur properly issued. The proper issuance of a remittitur divests an appellate court of jurisdiction over an appeal and returns jurisdiction to the district court. As a result, we no longer have jurisdiction to entertain respondent's request and we therefore deny respondent's motion for clarification. Fn1[The Honorable Kristina Pickering, Chief Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] | | 13-21496
|