Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 84023
Short Caption:GRIMES (BENNETT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):62835, 67598, 67741, 74419, 74419-COA, 81042, 81042-COA, 81335, 81531, 81697, 81697-COA, 83088, 83088-COA, 84023-COA, 84776
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C276163Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/22/2022How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/04/2022Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/04/2022Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)22-00281
01/18/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. District Court Order 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief or Informal Brief due: 120 days. (SC)22-01740
01/28/2022Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (A815590). (SC)22-02926
01/28/2022Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal, Vols. 1-9 (C276163) (FTP). (SC)22-02930
02/01/2022MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (SC)22-03309
02/02/2022Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Documents. Added to Record on Appeal as pages: 1-16 & 1935-1966. (Sealed) (SC)
02/02/2022Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Documents. Added to Record on Appeal as pages: 244-253. (Sealed) (SC)
02/03/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting the appointment of appellate counsel. The motion is denied. (SC)22-03650
05/04/2022BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC)22-14230
06/22/2022Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)
07/06/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).22-21167
07/06/2022Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
07/20/2022Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)