Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 84776
Short Caption:GRIMES (BENNETT) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):62835, 67598, 67741, 74419, 74419-COA, 81042, 81042-COA, 81335, 81531, 81697, 81697-COA, 83088, 83088-COA, 84023, 84023-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A815590, C276163Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing in Progress
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/26/2022Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
05/26/2022Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)22-16873
05/26/2022Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Second Notice of Appeal) (SC)22-16874
06/08/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC)22-18228
06/09/2022Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (A815590) Vol. 1. (SC)22-18353
06/09/2022Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. C276163 (Via FTP) Vols. 1-9. (SC)22-18392
06/16/2022Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 1-16 and 1935-1966. (SC)
06/16/2022Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 244-253. (SC)
08/16/2022BriefFiled Proper Person Informal Brief. (SC)22-25649