Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 84023-COA
Short Caption:GRIMES (BENNETT) VS. STATECourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):62835, 67598, 67741, 74419, 74419-COA, 81042, 81042-COA, 81335, 81531, 81697, 81697-COA, 83088, 83088-COA, 84023, 84776
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C276163Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/06/2022Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
07/20/2022Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)22-22816
07/28/2022Filing FeeRehearing Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (COA)
07/28/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Rehearing/reconsideration of Motion to Correct Sentence. (COA)22-23801
08/10/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Amended Rehearing/Reconsideration of Motion to Correct Sentence. (COA)22-25028
09/22/2022Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA)22-29748