Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/06/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
05/06/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-13058
|
05/06/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-13060
|
05/07/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Jason D. Guinasso. (SC) | | |
05/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-13428
|
05/17/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Laurie A. Yott. (SC) | | 21-14195
|
05/28/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICED FILED ON 6/1/21) (SC) | | |
06/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-15456
|
06/01/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-15495
|
06/03/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. Both parties want a ruling from the Court on the pure issue of law for certainty in future cases. (SC) | | 21-15940
|
06/09/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-16512
|
06/22/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/11/21. To Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 6/23/21) (SC) | | |
06/23/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-18041
|
06/23/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/11/21. To Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. (SC) | | 21-18140
|
06/29/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Isolde Zihn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/11/21. (SC) | | 21-18677
|
08/31/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 21, 2021. (SC) | | 21-25325
|
09/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 21-26983
|
09/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Disapproving Stipulation. The parties have filed a stipulation for a second extension of time for appellant to file the opening brief. The stipulation is disapproved. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-27853
|
10/05/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-28615
|
10/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-28616
|
10/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-28617
|
10/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-28618
|
10/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-28619
|
10/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-28620
|
10/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-28621
|
10/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 7 (SC) | | 21-28622
|
10/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 8 (SC) | | 21-28623
|
10/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 9 (SC) | | 21-28624
|
10/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 10 (SC) | | 21-28625
|
10/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 11. (SC) | | 21-28626
|
11/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Firm Address Change. (SC) | | 21-31496
|
11/05/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 18, 2021. (SC) | | 21-31793
|
11/17/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 11/17/21) (SC) | | |
11/17/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection - No Notice of Appearance for Jennifer J. Leonescu. (SC) | | 21-33037
|
11/17/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Christopher A. Eccles, Jennifer Leonescu and Justin R. Taruc appearing as counsel for respondent. (SC) | | 21-33113
|
11/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-33266
|
01/10/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC) | | |
03/04/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-07009
|
03/04/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
03/04/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
05/18/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-15723
|
05/18/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
05/31/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Reissue May 18, 2022 Order of Affirmance as an Opinion. (COA) | | 22-17104
|
06/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Notice of Non-Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Reissue May 18, 2022 Order of Affirmance as an Opinion. (COA) | | 22-18107
|
07/21/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. This court entered an order resolving this appeal on May 18, 2022. Respondent subsequently filed a motion to reissue the order as a published opinion. Having considered the motion, we conclude that publication is not warranted. Accordingly, we deny the motion. (COA) | | 22-22939
|
07/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
07/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
07/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
07/21/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-22942
|
07/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
08/16/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 25, 2022. (SC) | | 22-22942
|