Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/06/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
04/06/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
04/06/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-09898
|
04/06/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-09900
|
04/07/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Molly S. Rosenblum. (SC) | | |
04/08/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 21-10091
|
04/08/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | |
04/08/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (SEALED) (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | |
04/08/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | 21-10171
|
04/08/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | 21-10174
|
04/09/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC). | | 21-10219
|
04/13/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Fred Page. Check no. 1794 .(Respondent/Cross-Appellant) (SC) | | |
04/14/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-10760
|
04/15/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appeal Case Statement. (SC) | | 21-10899
|
04/21/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 11, 2021, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 21-11522
|
04/30/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.(SC) | | 21-12463
|
04/30/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-12465
|
05/09/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 05/10/21). (SC) | | |
05/10/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-13250
|
05/10/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-13280
|
05/10/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's/Cross Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-13358
|
06/09/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 22, 2021, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 21-16477
|
07/01/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-19044
|
07/02/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated Pursuant to NRAP3E. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant/cross-respondent and respondent/cross-appellant: 14 days transcript request; 40 days fast track statement and appendix. Respondent shall have 21 days from the service of appellant's fast track statement to file and serve a combined fast track response on appeal and fast track statement on cross-appeal. Appellant shall have 21 days from service of respondent's combined fast track response on appeal and fast track statement on cross-appeal to file and serve a fast track response on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 21-19110
|
07/13/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/10/20, 12/09/20, 12/10/20, 12/11/20 and 12/17/20. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services (Verbatim Reporting and Transcription) (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 07/14/21). (SC) | | |
07/14/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-20224
|
07/16/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/10/20, 12/09/20, 12/10/20, 12/11/20 and 12/17/20. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services (Verbatim Reporting and Transcription)(SC) | | 21-20548
|
08/09/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/cross-respondent's fast track statement and appendix due: August 18, 2021. (SC) | | 21-23094
|
08/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File a Late Brief. (SC) | | 21-24151
|
09/23/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/14/20, 12/09/20, 12/10/20, 12/11/20 and 12/17/20. (SC) | | 21-27566
|
10/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent's motion requesting an extension of time to file the fast track statement is denied. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have until October 22, 2021, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. (SC) | | 21-29718
|
10/20/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion Requesting the Supreme Court to Direct the District Court to Transmit Original Exhibits. Pursuant to NRAP 30(d). (SC) | | 21-30258
|
10/21/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Amended Motion Requesting the Supreme Court to Direct the District Court to Transmit Original Exhibits. Pursuant to NRAP 30(d). | | 21-30447
|
10/22/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 10/25/21). (SC) | | |
10/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Late Appellant's Appendix. (SC) | | 21-30615
|
10/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-30616
|
10/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 2. (SC) | | 21-30617
|
10/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 3. (SC) | | 21-30618
|
10/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 4. (SC) | | 21-30619
|
10/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 6. (SC) | | 21-30622
|
10/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 5. (SC) | | 21-30623
|
10/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 7. (SC) | | 21-30624
|
10/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 8. (SC) | | 21-30625
|
10/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 9. (SC) | | 21-30626
|
10/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 10. (SC) | | 21-30627
|
10/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 12. (SC) | | 21-30628
|
10/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 11. (SC) | | 21-30629
|
10/25/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Fast Track Statement/Child Custody. Corrected document due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-30671
|
10/25/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-30750
|
10/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a motion to transmit all the original exhibits admitted at trial. The motion is denied as to the entirety of the exhibits, without prejudice to appellant's right to file an amended motion that specifically identifies the exhibits he wishes to have transmitted, and that complies with the requirements of NRAP 30(d). Appellant also asks this court to order the transmission of a child custody evaluation on the ground that it is confidential and counsel is barred from releasing it. The motion is denied with respect to the evaluation, without prejudice. Appellant's motion for leave to file a late appendix is denied as moot. The appendix was timely filed on October 22, 2021, in accordance with the due date established in this court's October 15, 2021, order. (SC) | | 21-31137
|
11/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents Ex Parte Motion Requesting the Supreme Court to Direct the District Court to Transmit Original Exhibits. Pursuant to NRAP 30(d). (SC) | | 21-32247
|
11/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Repondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Extend Time in Which Submit the Fast Track Response, to Submit the Fast Track Statement on Cross-Appeal or in the Alternative to Accept a Late Filing. (SC) | | 21-32991
|
11/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. Appellant/cross-respondent has filed a second motion to transmit original exhibits admitted at trial. The motion is denied. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until November 29, 2021, to file and serve the combined fast track response on appeal and fast track statement on cross-appeal and an appendix. (SC) | | 21-33255
|
11/29/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Combined Respondent's Fast Track Response and Cross-Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-34017
|
11/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix To Fast Track Response/Fast Track Statement, Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-34018
|
11/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix To Fast Track Response/Fast Track Statement, Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-34019
|
11/30/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix To Fast Track Response/Fast Track Statement, Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-34020
|
12/21/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Appellant's Appendix. (SC) | | 21-36318
|
01/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental appendix containing exhibits admitted at trial. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the combined fast track reply on appeal and fast track response on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 22-00381
|
01/12/2022 | Appendix | Filed Updated Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix, Vols. 13-16 (with Supplemental Appendix). (SC) | | 22-01328
|
01/12/2022 | Appendix | Filed Updated Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix, Vols. 17-19 (with Supplemental Appendix). (SC) | | 22-01329
|
01/12/2022 | Appendix | Filed Updated Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix, Vols. 20-23 (with Supplemental Appendix). (SC) | | 22-01330
|
01/12/2022 | Appendix | Filed Updated Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix, Vols. 24-27 (with Supplemental Appendix). (SC) | | 22-01334
|
01/13/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply to Fast Track Response; and Fast Track Response to Cross-Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 1/13/22) (SC) | | |
01/13/2022 | Appendix | Filed Updated Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix, Vol. 28 (with Supplemental Appendix). (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 1/13/22) (SC) | | |
01/13/2022 | Appendix | Filed Updated Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix, Vols. 28 (cont...) - 29 (with Supplemental Appendix). (SC) | | |
01/13/2022 | Appendix | Filed Updated Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix, Vols. 29 (cont...) - 31 (with Supplemental Appendix). (SC) | | |
01/13/2022 | Appendix | Filed Updated Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix, Vol. 32 (with Supplemental Appendix). (SC) | | |
01/13/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Documents. (SC) | | 22-01364
|
01/13/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File a Late Reply and Appendices. (SC) | | 22-01420
|
01/17/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Reply to Fast Track Response; and Fast Track Response to Cross-Appellant's Fast Track Statement (Refile). (SC) | | 22-01576
|
01/17/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Statement Appendix Volume 28 (Supplemental-Refile). (SC) | | 22-01577
|
01/17/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Statement Appendix Volume 28 (cont..) - 29 (Supplemental-Refile). (SC) | | 22-01578
|
01/17/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Statement Appendix Volume 29 (cont..) - 31 (Supplemental-Refile). (SC) | | 22-01579
|
01/17/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Statement Appendix Volume 32 (Supplemental-Refile). (SC) | | 22-01580
|
01/18/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent's motion for an extension of time to file a reply to the fast track response and fast track response to cross-appellant's fast track statement and updated appendices, volumes 28-32, is granted. The documents were filed on January 17, 2022. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until February 1, 2022, to file and serve the fast track reply on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 22-01713
|
03/01/2022 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. To screening. (SC) | | |
03/22/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-08920
|
03/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
03/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
06/22/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 22-19789
|
06/22/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
07/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
07/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
07/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
07/18/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-22431
|
07/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
08/01/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 20, 2022. (SC) | | 22-22431
|