Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 82294-COA
Short Caption:TOBIN VS. CHIESICourt:Court of Appeals
Related Case(s):82094, 82234, 82294, 84371
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A799890Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/30/2022Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
05/05/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's (Nationstar Mortgage LLC) Notice of Appearance for Vanessa Turley. (COA)22-14381
06/30/2022Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order dismissing the underlying case on grounds of claim preclusion, as well as its orders granting attorney fees and costs to the Jimijack and Chiesi parties." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)22-20634
07/21/2022MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should not be Imposed. (COA)22-22940
07/21/2022MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for an Order to Refer this Matter to the Nevada Attorney General or Other Legal Authority. (COA)22-22947
07/21/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. (COA)Y22-22950
07/21/2022Filing FeeRehearing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Nona Tobin. Check no. 617. (COA)
07/21/2022MotionFiled Proper Person Declaration in Support of Motion to Rehear Order of Affirmance and Motion for an Order to Show Cause why Sanctions should not be Imposed. (COA)22-22957
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 1 pages 1-19. (COA)22-22964
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 2 pages 20-31. (COA)22-22969
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 3 pages 32-80. (COA)22-22970
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 4 pages 81-113. (COA)22-22974
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 5 pages 114-143. (COA)22-22975
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 6 pages 144-182. (COA)22-22977
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 7 pages 183-222. (COA)22-22978
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 8 pages 223-242. (COA)22-22979
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 9 pages 243-272. (COA)22-22981
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 10 pages 261-289. (COA)22-22982
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 11pages 290-343. (COA)22-22984
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 12 pages 344-397. (COA)22-22986
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 13 pages 398-431. (COA)22-22987
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 14 pages 432-443. (COA)22-22988
07/21/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service on Motions', Petition for Rehearing, and all Exhibits. (COA)22-22989
08/10/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Having considered appellant's motion for an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for respondents for alleged violations of the rules of professional conduct, the "Motion for an Order to Refer this Matter to the Nevada Attorney General or Other Legal Authority," and appellant's "Proper Person Declaration in Support of Motion to Rehear Order of Affirmance and Motion for an Order to Show Cause why Sanctions should not be Imposed," this court denies the motions. (SC)22-25082