Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 82294-COA & 82294
Short Caption:TOBIN VS. CHIESICourt:Court of Appeals & Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82094, 82234, 82294, 84371
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A799890Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
01/08/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)21-00536
01/08/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)21-00539
01/12/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC)21-00920
01/12/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (SC)21-00939
01/12/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from John Thomson. E-Payment conf. no. 21010822453467. (SC)
01/13/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' (Nationstar Mortgage LLC) Notice of Appearance for Melanie D. Morgan, Donna M. Wittig, and Scott R. Lachman. (SC)21-01083
01/29/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Modifying Caption. The clerk of this court shall add Nationstar Mortgage, LLC as a respondent to this matter, and modify the caption on the docket to be consistent with the caption on this order. The parties shall have 14 days in which to notify this court if this caption is not correct. (SC)21-02882
02/02/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC)21-03255
02/12/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notification of Proposed Amendment to Case Caption In Response To Order Modifying Caption. (SC)21-04253
02/12/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Other. The EAC was held on 2/5/21, and continued to 2/15/21 to give appellant's counsel time to confer with his client. Case Nos. 82094/82234/82294. (SC).21-04281
02/17/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. (SC)21-04630
02/18/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. Case Nos. 82094/82234/82294. (SC)21-04803
02/22/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)21-05143
03/11/2021Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)21-07175
04/28/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Notice of Change of Address for Law Firm Maurice Wood. (SC)21-12116
05/24/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)21-14823
06/07/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: June 28, 2021. (SC)21-16231
06/10/2021MotionFiled Stipulation to Consolidate Cases 82094/82234/82294. (SC)21-16782
06/22/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Appeals in Docket Nos. 82094 and 82234, and Disapproving Stipulation. As this court lacks jurisdiction over the appeals in Docket Nos. 82094 and 82234, they are dismissed. The parties shall proceed in Docket No. 82294. The stipulation to consolidate is disapproved as moot. The opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 82294 remain due to be filed by June 28, 2021. Nos. 82094/82234/82294. (SC)21-17865
06/25/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (Second Request)(SC)21-18437
07/06/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until July 28, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-19239
07/23/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's (Nationstar Mortgage, LLC) Notice of Appearance for Lilith V. Xara. (SC)21-21336
07/28/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (Third Request)(SC)21-21928
08/06/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: August 26, 2021. (SC)21-22879
08/26/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (Fourth Request)(SC)21-24866
09/03/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 29, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)21-25730
09/29/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 9/30/21) (SC)
09/29/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 9/30/21) (SC)
09/29/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 9/30/21) (SC)
09/29/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 9/30/21) (SC)
09/29/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 9/30/21) (SC)
09/29/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 9/30/21) (SC)
09/30/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. (SC)21-28066
09/30/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-28152
09/30/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (Duplicate) (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 9. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 10. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 11. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 12. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 13. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 14. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 15. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 16. (STRICKEN ITEMS 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 7, and 8, PER ORDER FILED 10/21/21). (SC)21-28220
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 17. (SC)21-28221
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 18. (SC)21-28223
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 19. (SC)21-28225
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 20. (SC)21-28226
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 21. (SC)21-28227
10/01/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 22. (SC)21-28228
10/04/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Joint Motion to Strike Appendix to Exclude Matters Outside the Record on Appeal. (SC)21-28448
10/12/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Strike. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/13/21) (SC)
10/13/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)21-29361
10/13/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant Nona Tobin's Opposition to Respondents' Joint Motion to Strike Appendix and Opposition. (DETACHED OPPOSITION AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER FILED 10/18/2021). (SC)21-29479
10/18/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Despite its untimeliness, appellant's motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to respondents' motion to strike portions of the appendix is granted. The clerk of this court shall detach the opposition from the motion and shall file it separately. Respondents shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply in support of the motion, if deemed necessary. (SC)21-29904
10/18/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Respondents' Joint Motion to Strike Appendix to Exclude Matters Outside the Record on Appeal. (SC)21-29905
10/18/2021MotionFiled Respondents' Reply in Support of Joint Motion to Strike Appendix to Exclude Matters Outside the Record on Appeal. (SC)21-29970
10/21/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall strike appendix volumes 1-15 and volume 16 items 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 7, and 8. Respondents may file a supplemental appendix with their answering brief, if deemed necessary. (SC)21-30326
10/25/2021BriefFiled Respondents' (Brian Chiesi, Debora Chiesi, and Quicken Loan Inc.) Answering Brief. (SC)21-30717
10/28/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Red Rock Financial Services shall have until November 15, 2021, to file and serve its answering brief. (SC)21-31070
11/01/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents Jimijack Irrevocable Trust, Joel A. Stokes, and Sandra F. Stokes' answering brief due: November 15, 2021. (SC)21-31316
11/01/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Nationstar Mortgage, LLC's answering brief ​due: November 15, 2021. (SC)21-31317
11/05/2021MotionFiled Respondent's (Nationstar) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. (SC)21-31968
11/09/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (SC)21-32217
11/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The motion to withdraw as counsel of record for respondent Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, filed by Akerman LLP, is granted. The clerk of this court shall remove attorneys Scott R. Lachman, Melanie D. Morgan, Donna M. Wittig, and Lilith V. Xara and the law firm of Akerman, LLP, from the docket of this appeal. Nationstar shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and cause counsel to enter an appearance. Briefing is suspended. fn1[As respondents' answering briefs have yet to be filed in this appeal and the briefing schedule is now suspended, appellant's reply brief is not yet due. Accordingly, this court takes no action in regard to appellant's November 9, 2021, motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief.] (SC)21-32635
11/15/2021BriefFiled Respondents' (Jimijack Irrevocable Trust, Joel A. Stokes And Sandra F. Stokes) Answering Brief. (SC)21-32776
11/15/2021BriefFiled Respondent's (Red Rock Financial Services) Answering Brief. (SC)21-32781
11/23/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's (Nationstar Mortgage LLC) Notice of Appearance for Gary E. Schnitzer. (SC)21-33641
12/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall add Gary E. Schnitzer and the law firm of Kravitz Schnitzer Johnson Watson & Zeppenfeld, Chtd., to the docket as counsel for respondent Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Nationstar shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve its answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (SC)21-34391
12/02/2021MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (SC)21-34450
12/13/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall remove John W. Thomson and Thomson Law PC from the docket in this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to obtain new counsel and cause counsel to file a notice of appearance or inform this court, in writing, that she intends to proceed pro se. Failure to comply with this order shall be construed as appellant's confirmation that she intends to proceed pro se. (SC)21-35363
12/29/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. (SC)21-36940
12/31/2021BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 1/3/22) (SC)
01/03/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection - No Notice of Appearance for Aaron D. Lancaster. (SC)22-00019
01/03/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's (Nationstar Mortgage LLC) Notice of Appearance Aaron D. Lancaster. (SC)22-00055
01/04/2022BriefFiled Respondent Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Answering Brief. (SC)22-00178
01/05/2022MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Set Aside 79295 Order of Affirmance. NRCP 12(B)(1) and/or NRCP 60(B)(3) and NRCP 60(D)(3) to Amend Opening Brief, and to Suspend Briefing Schedule Pending A-21-8288-40-C. (SC)22-00442
01/05/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to this court's December 13, 2021, order, appellant has filed a notice that she intends to proceed on appeal pro se. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall amend the service list to include appellant. Pursuant to the notice of appearance filed January 3, 2022, the clerk of this court shall add attorney Aaron D. Lancaster of Troutman Pepper LLP, as counsel for respondent Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Nationstar's answering brief was filed on January 4, 2022. Appellant shall have until February 3, 2022, to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC)22-00446
01/19/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motion. The request to set aside the order of affirmance in Docket No. 79295, entered on April 12, 2021, is denied. The request to suspend briefing in this appeal pending resolution of A-21-828840-C, a different district court matter, is denied. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental opening brief of no more than 10 pages that complies with NRAP 28 and 32, or an informal brief form for pro se parties provided by the clerk of this court. (SC)22-01848
02/03/2022BriefFiled Proper Person's Supplemental Opening Brief. (SC)22-03689
02/07/2022BriefFiled Proper Person Reply Brief. (SC)22-04111
02/07/2022Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/30/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC).22-09794
03/30/2022Case Status UpdateTransferred from Supreme Court. (COA).
03/30/2022Case Status UpdateTransferred to Court of Appeals. (SC).
05/02/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's (Nationstar Mortgage LLC) Notice of Appearance for Vanessa M. Turley. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 5/2/22) (SC)
05/02/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document.(SC)22-13901
05/05/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's (Nationstar Mortgage LLC) Notice of Appearance for Vanessa Turley. (COA)22-14381
06/30/2022Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order dismissing the underlying case on grounds of claim preclusion, as well as its orders granting attorney fees and costs to the Jimijack and Chiesi parties." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA)22-20634
06/30/2022Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order dismissing the underlying case on grounds of claim preclusion, as well as its orders granting attorney fees and costs to the Jimijack and Chiesi parties." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC)
07/21/2022MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should not be Imposed. (COA)22-22940
07/21/2022MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for an Order to Refer this Matter to the Nevada Attorney General or Other Legal Authority. (COA)22-22947
07/21/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. (COA)22-22950
07/21/2022Filing FeeRehearing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Nona Tobin. Check no. 617. (COA)
07/21/2022MotionFiled Proper Person Declaration in Support of Motion to Rehear Order of Affirmance and Motion for an Order to Show Cause why Sanctions should not be Imposed. (COA)22-22957
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 1 pages 1-19. (COA)22-22964
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 2 pages 20-31. (COA)22-22969
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 3 pages 32-80. (COA)22-22970
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 4 pages 81-113. (COA)22-22974
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 5 pages 114-143. (COA)22-22975
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 6 pages 144-182. (COA)22-22977
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 7 pages 183-222. (COA)22-22978
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 8 pages 223-242. (COA)22-22979
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 9 pages 243-272. (COA)22-22981
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 10 pages 261-289. (COA)22-22982
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 11pages 290-343. (COA)22-22984
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 12 pages 344-397. (COA)22-22986
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 13 pages 398-431. (COA)22-22987
07/21/2022ExhibitFiled Proper Person Exhibit 14 pages 432-443. (COA)22-22988
07/21/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service on Motions', Petition for Rehearing, and all Exhibits. (COA)22-22989
08/10/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Having considered appellant's motion for an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for respondents for alleged violations of the rules of professional conduct, the "Motion for an Order to Refer this Matter to the Nevada Attorney General or Other Legal Authority," and appellant's "Proper Person Declaration in Support of Motion to Rehear Order of Affirmance and Motion for an Order to Show Cause why Sanctions should not be Imposed," this court denies the motions. (SC)22-25082
09/22/2022Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA)22-29752