Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 84371
Short Caption:TOBIN VS. NEV. COMM'N ON JUDICIAL DISCIPLINECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):79295, 79295-COA, 82094, 82234, 82294, 82294-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A720032, A730078, A799890, A828840Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/15/2022Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Nona Tobin. Check no. 585. (SC)
03/15/2022Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writs of Mandamus for the Enforcement of the Nevada Judicial and Professional Codes of Conduct. (STRICKEN PER 4/26/22 ORDER). (SC)
03/15/2022MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Petition for Excess Pages in Writs of Mandamus for the Enforcement of the Nevada Judicial and Professional Codes of Conduct. (SC)22-08150
03/15/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice. Certificate of Service. (SC)22-08151
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Table of Contents of Petition for Writ Pro Se Appendix Volumes (Vols. 1-36) Tobin 0001-5282. (SC)22-08152
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 1. (CD Rom Included with Volumes 1-36) (SC)22-08156
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 2. (SC)22-08160
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 3. (SC)22-08162
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 4. (SC)22-08163
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 5. (SC)22-08164
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 6. (SC)22-08165
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 7. (SC)22-08167
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 8. (SC)22-08168
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 9. (SC)22-08169
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 10. (SC)22-08170
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 11. (SC)22-08171
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 12. (SC)22-08172
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 13. (SC)22-08173
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 14. (SC)22-08174
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 15. (SC)22-08175
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 16. (SC)22-08176
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 17. (SC)22-08178
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 18. (SC)22-08179
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 19. (SC)22-08180
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 20. (SC)22-08181
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 21. (SC)22-08182
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 22. (SC)22-08183
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 23. (SC)22-08184
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 24. (SC)22-08185
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 25. (SC)22-08186
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 26. (SC)22-08187
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 27. (SC)22-08189
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 28. (SC)22-08190
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 29. (SC)22-08191
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 30. (SC)22-08192
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 31. (SC)22-08194
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 32. (SC)22-08195
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 33. (Part 1) (SC)22-08196
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 33. (Part 2) (SC)22-08198
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 34. (SC)22-08199
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 35. (SC)22-08200
03/15/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Appendix - Volume 36. (SC)22-08218
04/12/2022Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document - Appendix Amended Volume 26 pages 3940-4044 (SC).22-11463
04/26/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The clerk shall strike the petition filed on March 15, 2022. Petitioner's compliant petition due: 21 days. (SC)22-13147
05/18/2022Petition/WritFiled Amended Petition for Writs of Mandamus for the Enforcement of the Nevada Judicial and Professional Codes of Conduct. (SC)22-15670
08/11/2022Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] RP/AS/MG. (SC)22-25205