Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/02/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
07/02/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 21-19116
|
07/02/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-19118
|
07/02/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-19120
|
07/06/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Tyler J. Ingram and Jeffrey C. Slade of the District Attorneys Office for the County of Elko Appearing as Counsel for Respondent. (SC) | | 21-19280
|
07/06/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/1/20. To Court Reporter: Tonja Lemich. (SC) | | 21-19354
|
07/12/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (SC) | | 21-19963
|
07/13/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 07/13/21). (SC) | | |
07/13/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-20126
|
07/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-20167
|
07/14/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 21-20369
|
07/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the case appeal statement. (SC) | | 21-20435
|
07/16/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-20647
|
07/22/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Michel Loomis/Capitol Reporters stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/1/20. (SC) | | 21-21188
|
07/26/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Tonja Lemich stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: July 1, 2020. (SC) | | 21-21616
|
08/03/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys (Benjamin C. Gaumond of the Ben Gaumond Law Firm, PLLC and David D. Loreman, Esq. of David D. Loreman, Chtd., herby agree that Benjamin C. Gaumond, Esq. shall substitute in as counsel for Appellant in the stead of David D. Loreman, Esq. of David D. Loreman, Chtd.). (SC) | | 21-22555
|
08/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Substitution. The clerk of this court shall substitute attorney Benjamin C. Gaumond in place of attorney David D. Loreman as counsel for appellant. If Mr. Gaumond requires the production of any other transcripts, he shall serve and file, in this court, a file-stamped supplemental transcript request form within 7 days of the date of this order. The opening brief and appendix remain due to be filed on or before November 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-23215
|
10/27/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: November 15, 2021. (SC) | | 21-30958
|
11/13/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Transmit Under Seal Presentence Investigation Report. (SC) | | 21-32581
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 1) (Part 1). (SC) | | 21-32702
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 1) (Part 2). (SC) | | 21-32689
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 1) (Part 3). (SC) | | 21-32732
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 1) (Part 4). (SC) | | 21-32707
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 1) (Part 5). (SC) | | 21-32708
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 1) (Part 6). (SC) | | 21-32690
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 2) (Part 1). (SC) | | 21-32700
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 2) (Part 2). (SC) | | 21-32800
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 2) (Part 3). (SC) | | 21-32801
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 2) (Part 4). (SC) | | 21-32802
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 3) (Part 1). (SC) | | 21-32804
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 3) (Part 2). (SC) | | 21-32806
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 3) (Part 3). (SC) | | 21-32809
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 3) (Part 4). (SC) | | 21-32812
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 3) (Part 5). (SC) | | 21-32813
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 4) (Part 1). (SC) | | 21-32814
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 4) (Part 2). (SC) | | 21-32815
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 4) (Part 3). (SC) | | 21-32816
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix (Volume 4) (Part 4). (SC) | | 21-32817
|
11/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-32822
|
11/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. Due: 14 days. (SC) | | 21-32848
|
11/29/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. PSI Report (Sealed). (SC) | | |
12/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time for Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-34912
|
12/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Respondent's answering brief due: January 18, 2022. (SC) | | 21-35228
|
01/18/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-01658
|
01/18/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondent's Brief. (SC) | | 22-01659
|
02/18/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: March 3, 2022. (SC) | | 22-05436
|
03/02/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-06737
|
03/03/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC) | | |
03/30/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-09799
|
03/30/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
03/30/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
05/05/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 22-14435
|
05/05/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
05/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
05/21/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-16174
|
05/23/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
05/23/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
06/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-17651
|
06/09/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Answer to Petition for Review. (Respondent's Answering Brief) (SC) | | 22-18354
|
08/04/2022 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." EN BANC (SC) | | 22-24414
|
08/04/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-24416
|
08/04/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
09/06/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 8, 2022. (SC) | | 22-24416
|