Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/08/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Marshal S. Willick. (SC) | | |
04/08/2022 | Petition/Writ | Filed Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition Per NRAP 21(a)(6) and NRAP 27(e). (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11000
|
04/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Petitioner's Motion to File "Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition per NRAP 21(a)(6) and NRAP 27(e)" in Excess of Fifteen Pages. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11001
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11002
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11003
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11004
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11005
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11006
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11007
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11008
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11009
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11010
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 10. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11012
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 11. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11026
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11013
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 13. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11014
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 14. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11015
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 15. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11016
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 16. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11017
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 17. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11018
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 18. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11019
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 19. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11020
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 20. (TRANSFERRED TO COA ON 4/8/22). (SC) | | 22-11021
|
04/08/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | 22-11106
|
04/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
04/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
04/08/2022 | Petition/Writ | Filed Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition Per NRAP 21(a)(6) and NRAP 27(e). (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11111
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11113
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11114
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11115
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11116
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11118
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11119
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11120
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 8. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11121
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 9. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11123
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 10. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11124
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 11. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11125
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11126
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 13. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11127
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 14. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11128
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 15. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11129
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 16. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11130
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 17. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11131
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 18. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11133
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 19. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11134
|
04/08/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 20. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11135
|
04/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Petitioner's Motion to File "Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition per NRAP 21(a)(6) and NRAP 27(e)" in Excess of Fifteen Pages. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 4/8/22). (COA) | | 22-11136
|
04/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Appendix and Directing Answer. Petitioner's supplemental appendix due: April 12, 2022. Real party in interest's answer due: 7 days. Petitioner may file and serve any reply within 3 days from the date that the answer is served. No extensions of time will be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances demonstrated by written motion. (COA) | | 22-11187
|
04/11/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Petitioner's Notice in Response to the "Order Directing Supplemental Appendix and Directing Answer". (COA) | | 22-11448
|
04/11/2022 | Appendix | Filed Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 21. (COA) | | 22-11449
|
04/15/2022 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition Per NRAP 21(a)(6) and NRAP 27(e). (SC) | | 22-12046
|
04/15/2022 | Motion | Filed Real Party in Interest, James W. Vahey's, Motion for Permission to File Answer Exceeding the Page Limit Set Forth in NRAP 21(d). (SC) | | 22-12047
|
04/15/2022 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix to Answer to Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition Per NRAP 21(a)(6) and NRAP 27(e). (SC) | | 22-12050
|
04/18/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Real Party in Interest's Notice of Appearance for Robert P. Dickerson, Sabrina M. Dolson and Josef M. Karacsonyi. (SC) | | 22-12092
|
04/18/2022 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petitioner's Reply to Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition per NRAP 21(a)(6) and NRAP 27(e). (COA) | | 22-12201
|
04/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplement to Answer. Real party in interest's supplemental answer due: April 20, 2022 by 2p.m. fn1 [Real party in interest's motion for leave to file an answer that exceeds the NRAP 21(d) page limit is granted; the answer was filed on April 15, 2022.] TAO, J., dissenting. (COA) | | 22-12441
|
04/20/2022 | Brief | Filed Real Party in Interest's Supplement to Answer to Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition Per NRAP 21(a)(6) and NRAP 27(e). (SC) | | 22-12517
|
04/25/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-12949
|
04/25/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
05/20/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
05/20/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
05/20/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
05/20/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-15989
|
05/20/2022 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |