Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
08/02/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Stay Payment of Attorney's Fees and Costs. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 8/2/22). (COA) | | 22-24166
|
08/02/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Stay Payments of Attorney's Fees. (TRANSFERRED FROM SC ON 8/2/22). (COA) | | 22-24167
|
09/01/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Stay and Reinstating Briefing. Having reviewed the arguments of the parties, this court grants the motion for a stay to the following extent. The portion of the divorce decree requiring appellant to pay respondent's attorney fees and costs is stayed, and the funds shall remain in counsel's trust account pending further order of this court. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 7 days; Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 40 days. (COA) | | 22-27511
|
09/27/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-30306
|
10/04/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 18, 2022. (COA) | | 22-31220
|
10/04/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/10/21, 1/21/22, 3/1/22, 3/2/22, 3/3/22, and 4/14/22 Court Reporter: Verbatim Reporting and Transcript of Proceedings. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 10/5/22) (COA) | | |
10/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Expanded Child Custody Fast Track Statement Pursuant to NRAP 3E(d)(4). (COA) | | 22-31377
|
10/05/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (COA) | | 22-31411
|
10/05/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/10/21, 1/21/22, 3/1/22, 3/2/22, 3/3/22, and 4/14/22 Court Reporter: Verbatim Reporting and Transcript of Proceedings. (COA) | | 22-31415
|
10/12/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Statement and Appendix. (COA) | | 22-32138
|
10/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Fast track statement due: November 16, 2022. Appellant may file a fast track statement that does not exceed 30 pages or 14,000 words. (COA) | | 22-32911
|
11/07/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:1/21/22, 3/1/22, 3/2/22, 3/3/22 and 4/14/22. (COA) | | 22-35016
|
11/16/2022 | Motion | Filed File Appellant's Second Motion for an Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement. (COA) | | 22-36115
|
11/18/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for a third extension of time to file the fast track statement. The motion is granted. Appellant shall have until November 21, 2022, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. (COA) | | 22-36404
|
11/21/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Child Custody Fast Track Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED 11/22/2022) (SC) | | |
11/21/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-36644
|
11/21/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 2. (SC) | | 22-36645
|
11/21/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 4. (SC) | | 22-36646
|
11/21/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 3. (SC) | | 22-36647
|
11/21/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 5. (SC) | | 22-36648
|
11/21/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 6. (SC) | | 22-36649
|
11/21/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 7. (SC) | | 22-36650
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 8. (SC) | | 22-36653
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 9. (SC) | | 22-36654
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 10. (SC) | | 22-36657
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 11. (SC) | | 22-36659
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 12. (SC) | | 22-36661
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 13. (SC) | | 22-36662
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 14. (SC) | | 22-36663
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 15. (SC) | | 22-36664
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 16. (SC) | | 22-36667
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 17. (SC) | | 22-36668
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 18. (SC) | | 22-36670
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 19. (SC) | | 22-36672
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 20. (SC) | | 22-36673
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 21. (SC) | | 22-36674
|
11/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement Vol. 22. (SC) | | 22-36676
|
11/22/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Fast Track Document/Child Custody. Corrected document due: 5 days. | | 22-36692
|
11/22/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Child Custody Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 22-36755
|
12/13/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents fast track response due: December 20, 2022. (COA) | | 22-39001
|
12/20/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Fast Track Response. (COA) | | 22-39993
|
12/23/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until January 6, 2023, to file and serve the fast track response. (COA) | | 22-40316
|
01/09/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Second Motion to Extend Time to File Her Fast Track Response. (COA). | | 23-00573
|
01/12/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until January 13, 2023, to file and serve fast track response. (COA) | | 23-01183
|
01/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Third Motion to Extend Time To File Fast Track Response and For Permission to Extend the Page and Word Count Limit In NRAP 3E(e)(2). (COA). | | 23-01407
|
01/16/2023 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Child Custody Fast Track Response (COA). | | 23-01415
|
01/30/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Expanded Child Custody Reply to Fast-Track Response Pursuant to NRAP 3E(d)(4), and Motion for an Extension of Time to File Reply to Fast-Track Response. (COA) | | 23-02894
|
01/31/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Respondent's motion for a third extension of time to file the fast track response and for leave to file a fast track response in excess of the type volume limit of NRAP 3E(d)(4) is granted. The fast track response was filed on January 16, 2023. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the fast track reply and for leave to file a fast track reply in excess of the page or type volume limits is granted to the following extent. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a fast track reply that does not exceed 15 pages. (COA) | | 23-02972
|
02/14/2023 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply to Fast Track Response. (COA) | | 23-04581
|
02/15/2023 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. (COA) | | |
04/20/2023 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part, Vacating in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART, VACATED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." COA-MG/BB/DW (COA) | | 23-12320
|
05/15/2023 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court.(COA) | | |
05/15/2023 | Case Status Update | Case Closed | | |