Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/24/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for appeal. (SC) | | |
02/24/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 23-05695
|
02/24/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-05698
|
03/01/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (State of Nevada Department of Taxation and the Cannabis Compliance Board) Substitution of Attorneys from Steven Shevorski and Akke Levin to Heidi Parry Stern and Kiel B. Ireland. (SC) | | 23-06070
|
03/01/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (State of Nevada Department of Taxation and the Cannabis Compliance Board) Substitution of Attorneys from Steven Shevorski and Akke Levin to Heidi Parry Stern and Kiel B. Ireland. (SC) | | 23-06086
|
03/02/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for appeal (Rural Remedies, LLC). (SC) | | |
03/02/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day (Rural Remedies, LLC). (SC) | | 23-06212
|
03/02/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-06214
|
03/03/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Luh & Associates. Check No. 5432. (SC) | | |
03/10/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross- Appeal (Deep Roots Harvest). (SC) | | |
03/10/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal (Deep Roots Harvest). (SC) | | 23-07413
|
03/10/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Cross-Appeal Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-07415
|
03/10/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 7 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. (SC) | | 23-07423
|
03/10/2023 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Richard Williamson (Cross-Appeal). (SC) | | |
03/14/2023 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Clarence E. Gamble (Rural Remedies, LLC). (SC) | | |
03/15/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. | | 23-07982
|
03/16/2023 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eleissa Lavelle. (SC) | | 23-08091
|
03/21/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's (Deep Roots Medical, LLC) Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-08634
|
03/22/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's (Rural Remedies LLC) Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-08822
|
03/24/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Deep Roots Harvest, Inc.'s Response to Notice of Modification of Caption. (SC) | | 23-09219
|
03/31/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' (Clark Natural Medicinal Solutions LLC, Clark NMSD LLC, Inyo Fine Cannabis Dispensary LLC, Nye Natural Medicinal Solutions LLC) Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-09889
|
06/06/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. Settlement issues involving Deep Roots Harvest are being considered in scheduled mediations on June 21, 2023. Mediations involving other parties, TBD. (SC) | | 23-17829
|
10/01/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Deep Roots Harvest Inc. resolved in mediation - all others - no settlement. (SC) | | 23-32095
|
10/11/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's (Deep Roots Harvest) Clarification to Settlement Program Status Report. (SC) | | 23-33139
|
10/16/2023 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated For Appeal and Cross-Appeal. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s) and Respondent(s): 14 days transcript request; Appellant(s): 90 days opening brief and appendix. Respondent(s): 30 days from opening brief to file combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant(s): 30 days from that combined brief to file combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondent(s): 14 days from that combined brief to file reply brief on cross-appeal. Pursuant to NRAP 16, the settlement judge has filed a report with this court informing this court that respondent/cross-appellant Deep Roots Harvest, Inc., has reached a partial settlement in this appeal and the remaining parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Deep Roots Harvest and Rural Remedies shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a stipulation to dismiss their appeals as to each other or to file a motion for an extension of time to file the stipulation. (SC) | | 23-33635
|
10/23/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's (Deep Roots Harvest) Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 23-34536
|
10/26/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/16/2022, 10/21/2022, 11/16/2022, and 12/19/2022. To Court Reporter:
Lora Corcoran. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC) | | 23-35033
|
11/21/2023 | Motion | Filed Deep Roots Harvest and Rural Remedies Stipulation for Partial Dismissal. (SC) | | 23-37863
|
12/12/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Partially Dismissing Appeal and Cross-Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation between appellant/cross-respondent Rural Remedies, LLC, and respondent/cross-appellant Deep Roots Harvest, Inc., their appeal and cross-appeal against each other only are dismissed. The clerk shall amend the caption in this appeal to conform to the caption on this order. (SC) | | 23-40290
|
12/28/2023 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Partial Dismissal. (SC) | | 23-42109
|
01/02/2024 | Motion | Filed Clark Natural Medicinal Solutions, LLC, Nye Natural Medicinal Solutions LLC, Clarke NMSD, LLC, INYO Fine Cannabis Dispensary LLC (Appellants-Cross-Respondents') and Nevada Organic Remedies LLC (Respondent) Stipulation for Partial Dismissal. (SC) | | 24-00056
|
01/08/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Partially Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, appellant's and appellants/cross-respondents' stipulation to dismiss their appeals as to respondents The State of Nevada Department of Taxation and Cannabis Compliance Board is approved (collectively, the state respondents). The stipulation of appellants/cross-respondents to dismiss their appeal against respondent Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC is also approved. This appeal is dismissed as to the state respondents and appellants/cross-respondents appeal is dismissed as to Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). The clerk shall amend the caption in this appeal to conform with the caption on this order. (SC) | | 24-00793
|
01/10/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 1/10/2024). (SC) | | |
01/10/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 24-01068
|
01/10/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 24-01069
|
01/10/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 24-01071
|
01/10/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 4. (SC) | | 24-01072
|
01/10/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 5. (SC) | | 24-01073
|
01/10/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 6. (SC) | | 24-01074
|
01/10/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Proof of Service of Appendices to the Opening Brief - Vols. 1 - 6. (SC) | | 24-01076
|
01/10/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Opening Brief. (SC) | | 24-01078
|
01/11/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 24-01202
|
01/17/2024 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent/cross-appellant's answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal due: February 26, 2024. (SC) | | 24-01760
|
02/08/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Wellness Connection of Nevada, LLC) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 24-04741
|
02/08/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (SC) | | 24-04779
|
02/13/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Wellness Connection) Notice of Disassociation of Counsel of Record for Karson Bright, to be replaced by Connor Bodin. (SC) | | 24-05325
|
02/23/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's (Deep Roots Harvest) Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 24-06625
|
02/23/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief/Opening Brief - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 24-06627
|
02/23/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief/Opening Brief - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 24-06628
|
02/23/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief/Opening Brief - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 24-06629
|
02/23/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief/Opening Brief - Vol. 4. (SC) | | 24-06631
|
02/23/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief/Opening Brief - Vol. 5. (SC) | | 24-06632
|
02/23/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief/Opening Brief - Vol. 6. (SC) | | 24-06635
|
03/13/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Wellness Connection of Nevada) Joinder to Deep Roots Harvest Answering Brief and Appendices. (SC) | | 24-08989
|
03/22/2024 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants/cross-respondents reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal due: April 26, 2024. (SC) | | 24-10159
|
03/25/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Amending Caption and to File Opening Brief. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption in this appeal to conform to the caption on this order. Appellant Rural Remedies, LLC's opening brief is overdue. Rural Remedies shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief and an appendix. Respondents Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC and Wellness Connection of Nevada, LLC shall each have 44 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief in response to Rural Remedies' opening brief. Rural Remedies shall have 30 days from service of the last-filed answering brief to file and serve any reply brief. Appellants/cross-respondents Clark Natural Medicinal Solutions, LLC; Nye Natural Medicinal Solutions, LLC; Clark NMSD, LLC; and Inyo Fine Cannabis Dispensary, LLC's combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal remains due to be filed on or before April 26, 2024. (SC) | | 24-10536
|
03/27/2024 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal as to Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC. (SC) | | 24-10890
|
03/28/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. Appellant Rural Remedies, LLC's appeal is dismissed as to respondent Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC only. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. The caption shall be amended to conform with the caption on this order. (SC) | | 24-11162
|
04/05/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's (Rural Remedies LLC) Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 24-12037
|
04/15/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's (Deep Roots Harvest, Inc.) Notice of Non-Opposition to Rural Remedies, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 24-13032
|
04/17/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Rural Remedies, LLC's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. Rural Remedies shall have until May 23, 2024, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Appellants/cross-respondents Clark Natural Medicinal Solutions, LLC; Nye Natural Medicinal Solutions, LLC; Clark NMSD, LLC; and Inyo Fine Cannabis Dispensary, LLC's combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal remains due to be filed on or before April 26, 2024. (SC) | | 24-13364
|
04/19/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents' Combined Reply Brief and Answering Brief. (SC) | | 24-13715
|