Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/06/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for appeal. (SC) | | |
02/06/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 23-03604
|
02/06/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-03608
|
02/06/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-03611
|
02/07/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 23-03711
|
02/10/2023 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Nicolas R. Donath. (SC) | | |
02/15/2023 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC) | | 23-04602
|
02/16/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants' case appeal statement due: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-04895
|
02/21/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Lone Mountain Partners, LLC) Notice of Appearance for Jamie L. ZImmerman. (SC) | | 23-05202
|
02/21/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Lone Mountain Partners, LLC) Notice of Appearance for Eric D. Hone. (SC) | | 23-05205
|
02/22/2023 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge: Eleissa C. Lavelle. (SC) | | 23-05392
|
02/22/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | |
02/22/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 23-05434
|
02/22/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Cross-Appel Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-05437
|
02/22/2023 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Richard Williamson. (SC) | | |
02/24/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent THC Nevada LLC's Case Appeal Statement (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 2/24/23) (SC) | | |
02/24/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 5 days. (SC) | | 23-05709
|
03/01/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-06130
|
03/01/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 21 days. Docketing Statement mailed to Respondent/Cross-Appellant. (SC) | | 23-06133
|
03/01/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Motion to Extend Time to File Case Appeal Statement. (SC). | | 23-06181
|
03/02/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants'/Cross-respondents' motion for an extension of time to file the case appeal statement is granted. The clerk of this court shall detach the case appeal statement from the motion filed on March 1, 2023, and file it. (SC) | | 23-06282
|
03/02/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondents Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 23-06283
|
03/07/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents' (THC Nevada LLC) Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-06971
|
03/21/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's (Deep Roots Medical, LLC) Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-08632
|
06/06/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. Settlement Conference scheduled for June 21, 2023 between Green Leaf parties and Deep Roots Harvest only. Other parties, TBD. (SC) | | 23-17830
|
08/09/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter involving Case No. 86071 only. (SC) | | 23-25721
|
08/30/2023 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated For Appeal and Cross-Appeal. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s) and Respondent(s): 14 days transcript request; Appellant(s): 90 days opening brief and appendix. Respondent(s): 30 days from opening brief to file answering brief on appeal. Cross-appellant shall have 30 days from service of appellants' opening brief on appeal to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant(s): 30 days from that combined brief to file combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondent(s): 14 days from that combined brief to file reply brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 23-28431
|
09/13/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 23-30056
|
09/25/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 23-31416
|
11/02/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant THC Nevada, LLC's opening brief and appendix due: December 12, 2023. (SC) | | 23-35713
|
12/01/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Document. The opening brief from appellants/cross-respondents Green Leaf Farms Holdings, LLC; Green Therapeutics, LLC; NevCann, LLC; and Red Earth, LLC (collectively, Green Leaf) was due to be filed on or before November 28, 2023. To date, Green Leaf has failed to file these documents or to otherwise communicate with this court. Green Leaf shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 23-38983
|
12/06/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellants' (Green Leaf Farms Holdings, LLC, Green Therapeutics, LLC, NevCann LLC, and Red Earth, LLC) Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 23-39502
|
12/07/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Deep Roots Harvest, Inc.) Notice of Non-Opposition to Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-39794
|
12/12/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's (THC Nevada, LLC) Motion for Extension for the Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 23-40360
|
12/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellants/cross-respondents' (appellants) motions for an extension of time to file the opening briefs are granted to the following extent. Appellants shall have until December 22, 2023, to file and serve the opening briefs and appendix. (SC) | | 23-40464
|
12/19/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's (THC Nevada) Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 12/20/2023). (SC) | | |
12/19/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (THC Nevada) Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol 7-11 (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 12/20/2023). (SC) | | |
12/20/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 23-41254
|
12/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-41404
|
12/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 23-41405
|
12/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 23-41406
|
12/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 4. (SC) | | 23-41407
|
12/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 5. (SC) | | 23-41408
|
12/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 6. (SC) | | 23-41409
|
12/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 7. (SC) | | 23-41410
|
12/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 8 Part 1. (SC) | | 23-41411
|
12/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 8 Part 2. (SC) | | 23-41412
|
12/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 9. (SC) | | 23-41413
|
12/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 10. (SC) | | 23-41414
|
12/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 11. (SC) | | 23-41415
|
12/21/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellants' (Green Leaf Farm Holdings LLC, Green Therapeutics, LLC, NEVCANN, LLC, Red Earth, LLC, and THC Nevada, LLC) Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-41416
|
12/21/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-41471
|
12/26/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Proof of Service for the Appendix to the Opening Brief - Volumes 1-11. (SC) | | 23-41883
|
01/19/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's (Deep Roots Harvest) Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 24-02187
|
01/19/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's (Deep Roots Harvest) Appendix to Answering Brief
- Vol. 1. (SC) | | 24-02190
|
01/19/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's (Deep Roots Harvest) Appendix to Answering Brief
- Vol. 2. (SC) | | 24-02191
|
01/19/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's (Deep Roots Harvest) Appendix to Answering Brief
- Vol. 3. (SC) | | 24-02192
|
01/22/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Lone Mountain Partners) Answering Brief. (SC) | | 24-02441
|
01/22/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (Lone Mountain Partners) Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 24-02442
|
01/22/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (Lone Mountain Partners) Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 24-02444
|
01/22/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (Lone Mountain Partners) Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 24-02445
|
01/22/2024 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (Lone Mountain Partners) Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 4. (SC) | | 24-02448
|
02/09/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Document. The answering brief from respondent Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC (NOR) was due to be filed on or before January 22, 2024. To date, NOR has failed to file an answering brief or to otherwise communicate with this court. NOR shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief. (SC) | | 24-04927
|
02/20/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellants/Cross-Respondents' (THC Nevada LLC, Green Leaf Farm Holdings LLC, Green Therapeutics LLC, NEVCANN LLC, and Red Earth LLC) and Respondent's (Nevada Organic Remedies LLC) Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal As to Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC. (SC) | | 24-05972
|
02/27/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, this appeal is dismissed as to respondent Nevada Organic Remedies, LLC only. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. The caption shall be amended to conform with the caption on this order. (SC) | | 24-07000
|
03/14/2024 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants/cross-respondents' reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal due: April 1, 2024. (SC) | | 24-09135
|
04/01/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellants' (Green Leaf Farm Holdings LLC, Green Therapeutics LLC, NEVCANN LLC, Red Earth LLC, and THC Nevada LLC) Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. | | 24-11573
|
04/18/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's (Deep Roots Harvest) Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 24-13674
|
04/18/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross- Appellant's (Deep Roots Harvest) Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 24-13675
|
04/29/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Notwithstanding its untimeliness, respondent/cross-appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief on cross-appeal is granted. The reply brief was filed on April 18, 2024. (SC) | | 24-14887
|
04/29/2024 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |