Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/27/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for appeal. (SC) | | |
03/27/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 23-09270
|
03/27/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC) | | 23-09274
|
03/27/2023 | Other | Justice Patricia Lee disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms. (SC) | | |
03/27/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-09278
|
03/27/2023 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Ariel C. Johnson. (SC) | | |
03/27/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 23-09367
|
03/31/2023 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (SC) | | 23-09869
|
03/31/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Kelly H. Dove. (SC) | | 23-09902
|
04/17/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/17/23) (SC) | | |
04/17/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 5 days. (SC) | | 23-11744
|
04/17/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-11821
|
05/31/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 23-16988
|
05/31/2023 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 23-17079
|
06/27/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Transcript Request Form and Amended Docketing Statement. Transcript request form due: 7 days. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended docketing statement. (SC) | | 23-20491
|
07/07/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Transcript Request Form (First Request). (SC) | | 23-21765
|
07/07/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 23-21767
|
07/10/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Scott F. Hessell. (SC) | | 23-22026
|
07/12/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request is granted. NRAP 26(b)(1)(A). The certificate of no transcript request was filed on July 7, 2023. (SC) | | 23-22328
|
07/13/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Amended Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 7/13/23) (SC) | | |
07/13/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Amended Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-22369
|
07/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-22468
|
07/13/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Amended Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-22470
|
07/25/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Second Amended Docketing Statement. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the amended docketing statement is granted. The amended docketing statement was filed on July 13, 2023. Review of appellant's amended docketing statement reveals that it too is deficient.Appellant still has not provided a complete response to Item 23 or provided this court with file-stamped copies of all orders resolving claims in the underlying matter. Item 23 requires appellant to describe all claims asserted in the district court and state the date of formal disposition of each claim. Appellant's original and amended docketing statements only describe the claims asserted against respondent. However, the amended complaint asserted claims against four other parties besides respondent. The original and amended docketing statements do not describe the claims against those other parties or state the date of formal disposition of those claims. And no copies of orders resolving the claims in the amended complaint against those other parties are attached to the docketing statement as required by Item 27. Accordingly, appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a second amended docketing statement. (SC) | | 23-23792
|
08/01/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Second Amended Docketing Statement. (SC). | | 23-24724
|
08/17/2023 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 23-26960
|
08/18/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief Approved. Due: 9/28/23. (SC) | | 23-26979
|
09/18/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 23-30495
|
09/22/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until November 27, 2023, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 23-31277
|
11/06/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 23-36057
|
12/01/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 23-39022
|
01/24/2024 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion to Consolidate Appeals (Case Nos. 86317/87375/87835). (SC) | | 24-02867
|
02/06/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing and Granting Motions to Consolidate. This court previously entered an order directing appellant to show cause why the appeal in Docket No. 86317 should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Having considered appellant's response, the appeal is allowed to proceed at this time. Accordingly, briefing is reinstated. The parties have filed joint motions to consolidate these appeals. Because the motions are not properly signed by counsel for respondent, they are treated as motions filed only by appellant. These appeals arise from the same district court case and involve the same parties and counsel. Accordingly, the motions are granted. These appeals are hereby consolidated for purposes of briefing and disposition. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single appendix and opening brief addressing all issues in these appeals. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 86317/87375/87835 (SC) | | 24-04286
|
03/21/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Emergency Motion to Stay Enforcement Pending Appeal Without Bond. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-10088
|
03/28/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to File Under Seal. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-11174
|
03/28/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Enlarge the Length of Opposition to Emergency Motion to Stay Enforcement Pending Appeal Without Bond. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-11179
|
03/28/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Emergency Motion to Stay Enforcement Pending Appeal Without Bond. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-11180
|
04/05/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Enlarge the Length of Reply In Support of Emergency Motion to Stay Enforcement Pending Appeal Without Bond. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-12133
|
04/05/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply In Support of Emergency Motion to Stay Enforcement Pending Appeal Without Bond Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-12170
|
04/08/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 1. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-12343
|
04/08/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 2. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-12344
|
04/08/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-12345
|
04/08/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 4. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-12346
|
04/08/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 5. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-12347
|
04/08/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 6. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-12348
|
04/08/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 7. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-12349
|
04/08/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 8. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-12350
|
04/08/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Seal Portions of Appendix to His Opening Brief. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | Y | 24-12351
|
04/08/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-12352
|
04/09/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Stay. Appellant has filed a motion to stay enforcement of the post-judgment attorney fees and costs award pending appeal, without bond. Respondent has filed an opposition to the stay motion, and appellant has filed a reply. We deny appellants' motion for a stay without bond pending appeal. fn1 [Respondent's motion for leave to file a response to the stay motion that is 4 pages over the page limit is granted. NRAP 27(d)(2). Its motion for leave to file a redacted response and to file under seal the unredacted response and exhibits containing a debtor exam transcript and asset disclosure forms, based on a district court protective order, is granted. SRCR 3(4)(b) & 7. Thus, the redacted response was properly filed on March 28, 2024, and the clerk of this court shall file under seal the unredacted response and exhibits provisionally received in this court on April 2, 2024...] fn2 [Appellant's motion for leave to file a reply that is 4 pages over the page limit is granted, NRAP 27(d)(2); thus, we have considered the reply filed on April 5, 2024.] Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-12484
|
04/09/2024 | Motion | Filed (SEALED) Confidential Respondent's Opposition to Emergency Motion to Stay Enforcement Pending Appeal Without Bond. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER 4/9/24 ORDER). Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | |
04/23/2024 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-14085
|
04/23/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Nos. 86317/87375/87835. (SC) | | 24-14121
|