Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 87681
Short Caption:NEVADANS FOR REPROD. FREEDOM VS. WASHINGTONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 23 OC 00115 1BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeeCase Status:Scheduled for Argument
Replacement:None for Justice LeePanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:03/06/2024 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/30/2023Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Bravo Schrager LLP. Check no. 1016. (SC)
11/30/2023Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.). (SC)23-38788
11/30/2023OtherJustice Patricia Lee disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms
11/30/2023Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)23-38790
12/07/2023Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC)23-39741
12/08/2023BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)23-39888
12/08/2023AppendixFiled Appellant's Joint Appendix to the Opening Brief. (SC)23-39891
12/08/2023MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Expedited Consideration of Appeal. (SC)23-39893
12/08/2023Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)23-39894
12/13/2023MotionFiled Respondents' (Donna Washington and Coalition for Parents and Children) Limited Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Expedited Consideration of Appeal. (SC)23-40441
12/14/2023MotionFiled Appellant's Reply Brief In Support of Motion for Expedited Consideration of Appeal. (SC)23-40603
12/15/2023Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC)23-40703
12/19/2023Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion to expedite the resolution of this appeal. Respondents Donna Washington and Coalition for Parents and Children have filed a conditional opposition, and appellant has filed a reply. Cause appearing, the motion is granted to the following extent. Respondents shall have until December 29, 2023, to file and serve the answering brief(s), and appellant shall have until January 8, 2024, to file and serve any reply brief. No extensions of time to file these briefs shall be granted. Thereafter, if the court determines that argument in this appeal is necessary, the court will both schedule this appeal for argument and thereafter resolve this appeal as expeditiously as this court's docket will permit. (SC)23-41117
12/19/2023MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Associate Counsel Pursuant to Nevada Supreme Court Rule 42. (SC)23-41172
12/22/2023BriefFiled Respondent's (Francisco Aguilar) Answering Brief. (SC)23-41635
12/22/2023Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Associate Counsel. Ms. Frost shall be permitted to appear on behalf of NRF in this matter. Nevada attorney Bradley Schrager of Bravo Schrager, LLP shall be responsible for all matters presented by Ms. Frost in this appeal. (SC)23-41693
12/22/2023MotionFiled Amicus Curiae (Ballot Initiative Strategy Center Foundation) Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (SC)23-41714
12/22/2023BriefFiled Amicus Curiae (Ballot Initiative Strategy Center Foundation) in Support of Appellant and of Reversal. (SC)23-41719
12/22/2023MotionFiled Amicus Curiae (Ballot Initiative Strategy Center) Motion to Associate counsel Joseph Sandler Pursuant to Supreme Court Rule 42. (SC)23-41725
12/27/2023MotionFiled Respondents' (Donna Washington and Coalition for Parents and Children) Opposition to the Ballot Initiative Strategy Center Foundation's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (SC)23-41946
12/29/2023BriefFiled Respondents' (Donna Washington and Coalition for Parents and Children) Answering Brief. (SC)23-42370
01/02/2024MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Associate Counsel Pursuant to Nevada Supreme Court Rule 42 for Attorney, Daniel Cohen. (SC)24-00081
01/02/2024MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Associate Counsel Pursuant to Nevada Supreme Court Rule 42 for Attorney, Jonathan Hawley. (SC)24-00083
01/05/2024Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Ballot Initiative Strategy Center Foundation (BISCF) has filed a motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae in support of appellant. Having considered the pertinent filings as well as the proposed amicus brief, the motion is granted. The amicus brief was filed on December 22, 2023. BISCF has filed a motion to associate attorney Joseph Sandler of Sandler Reiff Lamb Rosenstein & Birkenstock, P.C. pursuant to SCR 42. The motion to associate is granted. SCR 42(8). Mr. Sandler shall be permitted to appear on behalf of BISCF in this matter. Appellant Nevadans for Reproductive Freedom (NRF) has filed motions to associate attorneys Daniel J. Cohen and Jonathan P. Hawley of Elias Law Group, LLP pursuant to SCR 42. The motions to associate are granted. SCR 42(8). Mr. Cohen and Mr. Hawley shall be permitted to appear on behalf of NRF in this matter. (SC)24-00567
01/08/2024BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)24-00741
01/08/2024Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
01/30/2024Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument would be of assistance in resolving the issues presented in this matter. Accordingly, oral argument is scheduled for March 6, 2024, at 10:30 a.m., in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)24-03461
02/14/2024Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's (Nevadans for Reproductive Freedom) Notice of Appearance for David Fox. (SC)24-05440
02/20/2024Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)24-06062