Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/24/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
08/24/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
08/24/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-24668
|
08/25/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Michael J. Mcavoyamaya. (SC) | | |
08/25/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-24798
|
08/30/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-25217
|
08/30/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil. (SC) | | 21-25271
|
09/15/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: All of May. To Court Reporter: Unknown. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 9/15/21) (SC) | | |
09/15/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-26750
|
09/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Request for Transcripts. (SC) | | 21-26771
|
09/20/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Addendum to NOA Packet Submitted 08/18/2021 (SEALED). (SC) | | |
09/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motion. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request. Appellant may also provide this court with a certified copy of the sound recording as part of the appendix. (SC). | | 21-27286
|
09/28/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-27946
|
10/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Amending Briefing Schedule. Appellant shall have 40 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with the provisions in NRAP 3E(d). (SC) | | 21-28716
|
11/15/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-32803
|
11/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1-3. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 11/16/21) (SC) | | |
11/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-32830
|
11/17/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Child Custody. (SC) | | 21-33063
|
11/17/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice in Response. (SC) | | 21-33071
|
11/19/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The parties have informed this court that, in fact, they are only litigating financial issues and the appeal does not involve child custody. Because the fast track statement and appendix have already been filed, and because there is a challenge to the original divorce decree, which does involve custody, the parties are directed to continue with briefing in accordance with NRAP 3E. Respondent shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. (SC) | | 21-33401
|
11/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track. Vol. 1 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-34006
|
11/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol.1 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-34007
|
11/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol.2. Part 1. (SC) | | 21-34008
|
11/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol.2 Part. 2 (SC) | | 21-34009
|
11/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-34010
|
12/08/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's fast track response due: December 17, 2021. (SC) | | 21-34970
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Fast Track Response. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-36110
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Fast Track Response. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-36112
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Fast Track Response. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-36113
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Fast Track Response. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-36115
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Fast Track Response. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-36114
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Fast Track Response. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-36116
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Fast Track Response. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 21-36118
|
12/17/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Fast Track Response. Vol. 8. (SC) | | 21-36117
|
12/17/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent's Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-36119
|
01/21/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to Remove Case From Child Custody Fast Track Program. (SC) | | 22-02213
|
01/21/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Non-Opposition to Consolidation; Opposition to Further Briefing of First Appeal. (SC) | | 22-02261
|
01/24/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to Remove from Fast Track Program and Consolidate. (SC) | | 22-02363
|
01/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The motion to remove the appeal in Docket No. 83412 from the fast track is granted. Appellant shall have 45 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief that complies with NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32. Appellant need not file a new appendix or supplemental request for transcripts unless deemed necessary. Because the appeal in Docket No. 84077 has been referred to this court's settlement program, Mueller's request to consolidate these appeals is denied without prejudice. Nos. 83412/84077. (SC) | | 22-03000
|
02/02/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Related Appeals. Case No. 83412 and 84077. (SC) | | 22-03467
|
02/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Non-Opposition to Motion to Consolidate With Related Appeal and Request for Briefing Schedule. (SC) | | 22-04468
|
02/16/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals. These appeals shall be consolidated for all appellate purposes. Appellant shall have until March 14, 2022, to file and serve a combined opening brief that addresses all issues. Nos. 83412/84077. (SC) | | 22-05178
|
02/24/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Amending Briefing Schedule. These appeals shall proceed on a parallel briefing schedule. Each appellant shall have until March 14, 2022, to file and serve an opening brief. fn1[Appellant in 83412 has filed an appendix in that appeal. If deemed necessary, within the same time period, appellant may file a supplemental appendix. Within the same time period, appellant in 84077 shall file an appendix containing any necessary documents not already included in the appendix filed in 83412.] Nos. 83412/84077. (SC) | | 22-06094
|
03/14/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief (84077). Nos. 83412/84077 (SC) | | 22-08075
|
03/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix - Volume IX (84077). Nos. 83412/84077(SC) | | 22-08078
|
03/14/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (83412) Nos. 83412/84077. (SC) | | 22-08087
|
03/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. (83412) Nos. 83412/84077. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/15/22) (SC) | | |
03/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Certificate of Service Hearing Videos. (83412) Nos. 83412/84077. (SC) | | 22-08092
|
03/15/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 22-08116
|
03/15/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. (83412) Nos. 83412/84077. (SC) | | 22-08220
|
04/04/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (83412) Nos. 83412/84077. (SC) | | 22-10421
|
04/12/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief (84077). Nos. 83412/84077 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/12/22) (SC) | | |
04/12/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Answering Brief - 84077). Nos. 83412/84077 (SC) | | 22-11566
|
04/12/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief (84077). Nos. 83412/84077 (SC) | | 22-11588
|
05/04/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief (83412) Nos. 83412/84077. (SC) | | 22-14163
|
05/05/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Reply Brief. (84077) Nos. 83412/84077 (SC) | | 22-14446
|
05/06/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 83412/84077 (SC) | | |
09/15/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn7[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] Nos. 83412/84077. (SC) | | 22-28925
|
09/19/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Publish as an Opinion the Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding Filed September 15, 2022. Nos. 83412/84077. (SC) | | 22-29269
|
10/03/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Michael McAvoyAmaya. E-Payment Ref. no. 22100339379971. Nos. 83412/84077. (SC) | | |
10/03/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 83412/84077. (SC) | | 22-31186
|
11/03/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting Rehearing. Having Considered the petition for rehearing, we have determined that rehearing of this matter is warranted. Accordingly, we grant the petition for rehearing. An amended order will be issued forthwith. Nos. 83412/84077 (SC) | | 22-34515
|
11/03/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn7 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] RP/EC/MG. Nos. 83412/84077 (SC) | | 22-34523
|
11/28/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 83412/84007 (SC) | | 22-36979
|
11/28/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
12/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 29, 2022. Nos. 83412/84077 (SC) | | 22-36979
|