Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/12/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
05/12/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 22-15088
|
05/12/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-15090
|
05/13/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes. (SC) | | 22-15273
|
05/16/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Black & Wadhams. Check no. 1528. (SC) | | |
05/16/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 22-15498
|
05/17/2022 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC) | | 22-15560
|
06/07/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-18060
|
06/07/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 22-18102
|
06/21/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 11, 2022, at 10:00 AM. (SC) | | 22-19596
|
06/27/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 11, 2022, at 10:00 AM. (SC) | | 22-20241
|
07/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion Pursuant to NRAP 27 to Require Bond. (SC) | | 22-23308
|
08/01/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent AAL-Jay, Inc's Opposition to Appellants' Motion Pursuant to NRAP 27 to Require Bond. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 8/2/22) (SC) | | |
08/02/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-24133
|
08/10/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of No-Opposition to Motion Pursuant to NRAP 27 to Require Bond. (SC) | | 22-25099
|
08/23/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 22-26360
|
08/24/2022 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 22-26417
|
08/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent AAL-JAY, Inc.'s Opposition to Appellants' Motion Pursuant to NRAP 27 to Require Bond. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 8/25/22) (SC) | | |
08/25/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-26708
|
08/26/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent AAL-JAY, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Appellants' Motion Pursuant to NRAP 27 to Require Bond. (SC) | | 22-26913
|
08/26/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent AAL-JAY, Inc.'s Opposition to Appellants' Motion Pursuant to NRAP 27 to Require Bond. (SC) | | 22-26914
|
09/02/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent AAL-Jay, Inc.'s untimely motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to appellants' motion to require a bond is granted. NRAP 26(b)(1)(A). The opposition was filed on August 26, 2022. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply in support of the motion. (SC) | | 22-27623
|
09/07/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 22-28044
|
09/07/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent AAL-JAY, Inc.'s Notice of Appearance for Adrienne R. Brantley-Lomeli. (SC) | | 22-28104
|
09/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Require Bond. (SC) | | 22-28348
|
11/03/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Voluntary Dismissal an Order Granting Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Insufficient Service. (SC) | | 22-34564
|
11/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellants have filed a motion to require respondents to post a bond. Having considered the motion, opposition, reply, and documents before this court, this court is not convinced that a bond pending appeal is warranted. (SC) | | 22-35496
|
11/22/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: December 6, 2022. (SC) | | 22-36753
|
12/06/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to extend time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 22-38378
|
12/13/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Regarding Respondents. Appellant shall have until December 20, 2022, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondents have filed a notice informing this court that respondents Christiano de Carlo and Lail Leonard have been dismissed from the underlying district court action. The parties shall each have 7 days from the date of this order to inform this court, in writing, whether de Carlo and Leonard are proper respondents to this appeal. (SC) | | 22-39077
|
12/20/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice Regarding Whether Christiano De Carlo and Lail Leonard are Proper Parties to this Appeal. (SC) | | 22-39979
|
12/20/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-39997
|
12/21/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-39998
|
12/22/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Respondents. On December 13, 2022, this court entered an order that, among other things, directed the parties to inform this court, by December 20, 2022, whether Christiano de Carlo and Lail Leonard are proper respondents to this appeal. Respondents have filed a response, asserting that de Carlo and Leonard are not proper respondents because they were not served with process, did not appear in the district court, and did not waive service. Appellants have not filed a response. The clerk shall remove de Carlo and Leonard as respondents in this matter and modify the cation accordingly. (SC) | | 22-40250
|
12/22/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Appendix and Notice re: Respondents. (SC). | | 22-40284
|
12/22/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants Notice re: Respondents. (SC) | | 22-40285
|
12/22/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol. 2. (SC). | | 22-40286
|
01/03/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' December 22, 2022, motion for an extension of time is granted. The notice regarding respondents and volume 2 of the appendix were filed on December 22, 2022. Respondent's answering brief remains due to be filed on or before January 19, 2023. (SC) | | 23-00064
|
01/19/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent AAL-Jay, Inc.'s Answering Brief to Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-01934
|
02/21/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' reply brief due: March 7, 2023. (SC) | | 23-05126
|
03/07/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply brief. (SC) | | 23-06984
|
03/08/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
08/17/2023 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." LS/PL/LB (SC) | | 23-26906
|
09/06/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants petition for rehearing due: September 19, 2023. (SC) | | 23-29035
|
09/19/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 23-30736
|
09/19/2023 | Filing Fee | Appellants' filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Allison R. Schmidt. (SC) | | |
10/05/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Lee, J., dissenting. LS/LB/PL (SC) | | 23-32692
|
10/19/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 23-34176
|
11/08/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 23-36362
|
11/20/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 23-37659
|
11/20/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-37671
|
11/20/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Amended Certificate of Service to Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 23-37774
|
12/06/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC. (SC) | | 23-39577
|
01/02/2024 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 24-00006
|
01/02/2024 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
01/09/2024 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 1/3/24. (SC) | | 24-00006
|