Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
17-33889: This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 68053
Short Caption:MENDENHALL VS. TASSINARICourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A708281Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/26/2015 / England, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/14/2017 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:06/14/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/22/2015Filing FeeFiling fee to be forwarded by district court clerk.
05/22/2015Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)15-15800
05/22/2015Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.15-15803
05/26/2015Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC. Check No. 6173.
05/26/2015Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge:Kathleen J. England.15-16054
06/05/2015Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.15-17216
06/25/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled for sometime in July, 2015.15-19505
10/19/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 12/02/15 & 12/03/15 at 9:30 a.m. to 11:45 a.m. Settlement Judge Requests an Extension until December 23, 2015 to File Final Report.15-31819
10/26/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to December 23, 2015.15-32520
12/16/2015Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties are continuing with settlement negotiations. The settlement judge requests an additional 33 days, to and including January 25, 2016, to file the final report.15-38494
12/18/2015Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to January 25, 2016.15-38842
02/09/2016Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.16-04239
02/09/2016Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.16-04274
02/11/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance, Avece M. Higbee, Esq. and Micah S. Echols, Esq. of Marquis Aurbach Coffing, hereby appearing for the Appellants, Robert L. Mendenhall and Sunridge Corporation.16-04603
02/12/2016Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/17/15. To Court Reporter: Carrie Hansen.16-04640
03/11/2016TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/17/15.16-07806
03/31/2016Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Nicholas J. Santoro, Esq. and Oliver J. Pancheri, Esq. of Santoro Whitmire appearing on behalf of Respondents Ronald Tassinari and American Vantage Brownstone LLC.)16-10152
05/04/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 23, 2016.16-13927
05/24/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix.16-16260
05/31/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 7, 2016.16-16975
06/07/2016BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.16-17701
06/07/2016AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Volume 1.16-17702
06/07/2016AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Volume 2.16-17703
07/01/2016Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: July 21, 2016.16-20599
07/21/2016BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.16-22789
08/18/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (First Request).16-25690
08/18/2016Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: September 21, 2016.16-25725
09/22/2016MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.16-29416
09/27/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: October 5, 2016.16-29951
10/06/2016BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.16-31167
10/06/2016Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/02/2016MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Appellants' Reply Brief. (DETACHED SUR-REPLY AND RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 11/10/16).16-34119
11/10/2016Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondents have filed a motion for leave to file a sur-reply to appellants' reply brief. We discern no good cause to depart from this court's procedural rules; accordingly, the motion is denied. The clerk shall detach the proposed sur-reply from the motion and return it unfiled.16-35140
01/20/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-02298
01/24/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Unavailability (Oral Argument).17-02643
02/01/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, March 8, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.17-03673
02/23/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-06290
02/28/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e) (Continuance of oral argument).17-06817
03/01/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Vacating Oral Argument. Cause Appearing, appellants' motion to continue the oral argument of this matter is granted. The oral argument presently scheduled for March 8, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. is vacated, and argument shall be rescheduled on the net available calendar. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.17-06913
03/01/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Unavailability (Oral Argument).17-07091
04/26/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, June 14, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.17-13939
05/30/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-17942
06/14/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Panel. SNP MD/MG/KP.
10/05/2017Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 78. SNP17-MD/MG/KP17-33889
10/30/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-37011
10/30/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/13/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 2, 2017.17-37011