Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/15/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
07/15/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED). | | |
07/15/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 14-22979
|
07/17/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kainen Law Group. Check no. 2601. | | |
07/17/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 14-23251
|
07/21/2014 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. | | 14-23526
|
07/29/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). | | |
07/29/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (SEALED). | | |
07/29/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) | | 14-24660
|
07/29/2014 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Radford J. Smith | | |
08/06/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time for Docketing Statement (Appellant/Cross-Respondent Kirk Ross Harrison). | | 14-25820
|
08/11/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel, Kirk Ross Harrison on his own behalf. | | 14-26298
|
08/14/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File the Docketing Statement. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant-Vivian Marie Harrison) | | 14-26709
|
08/14/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | | 14-26718
|
08/14/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service - Motion for Extension of Time to File the Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. | | 14-26801
|
08/25/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 14, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Nos. 66072/66157. | | 14-28033
|
09/02/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance, Gary R. Silverman of the firm of Silverman, Decaria & Kattelman, CHTD. for the Respondent/Cross-Appellant Vivian Marie Lee Harrison. | | 14-28883
|
09/02/2014 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance, Mary Anne Decaria, of the firm of Silverman, Decaria & Kattelman, CHTD., for the Respondent/Cross-Appellant Vivian Marie Lee Harrison. | | 14-28889
|
10/10/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 1/27/15 at 9:30 a.m. | | 14-33744
|
01/13/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motions. The parties' motions for extensions of time to file their docketing statements for this appeal and cross-appeal are granted. Accordingly, the docketing statements that were provisionaly received shall be filed. | | 15-01398
|
01/13/2015 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement (Appellant/Cross-Respondent). | | 15-01399
|
01/13/2015 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). | | 15-01403
|
01/26/2015 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement (Respondent/Cross-Apellant DUPLICATE -FILED ON 1/13/15). | | 15-02777
|
02/02/2015 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 15-03555
|
02/06/2015 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated For Appeal and Cross-Appeal. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant and Respondent: 15 days transcript request; Appellant: 90 days opening brief and appendix. . | | 15-04039
|
02/09/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Certificate Pursuant to NRAP 9(a)(1)(C) (Certificate of No Transcript Request). | | 15-04230
|
02/18/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/28/13, 10/30/13, 12/18/13, 01/22/14, 05/21/14. To Court Reporter: Department Q. | | 15-05176
|
05/06/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Opening Brief. | | 15-13896
|
05/06/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: June 8, 2015. | | 15-13898
|
06/05/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Opening Brief (Second Request). | | 15-17209
|
06/12/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 8, 2015. | | 15-18010
|
07/08/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. | | 15-20719
|
07/08/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | | 15-20721
|
08/07/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. | | 15-23825
|
08/07/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Motion Approved. Answering Brief due: September 8, 2015. | | 15-23834
|
09/09/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). | | 15-27286
|
10/06/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent/cross-appellant's motion requesting a second extension of time to file the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the combined brief, provisionally received in this court on September 11, 2015. Appellant/cross-respondent's combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal due: 30 days. | | 15-30310
|
10/06/2015 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief (Respondent/cross-appellant). | | 15-30313
|
10/14/2015 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lawanda Brown stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/22/15. | | 15-31221
|
11/02/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Reply Brief on Appeal, Combined with Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. | | 15-33207
|
11/02/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Motion Approved. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Brief on Appeal, Combined with Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: December 7, 2015. | | 15-33216
|
11/17/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Reply Brief on Appeal Combined with Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. | | 15-35071
|
11/20/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: January 6, 2016. | | 15-35540
|
01/07/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. | | 16-00414
|
01/08/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Amended Reply Brief. | | 16-00634
|
01/26/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent's unopposed motion to file an amended reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the amended brief, provisionally received in this court on January 8, 2016. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve the reply brief on cross-appeal, if any. | | 16-02750
|
01/26/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Amended Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. | | 16-02752
|
02/08/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent/cross-appellant's reply brief due: February 17, 2016. | | 16-04145
|
02/11/2016 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request). | | 16-04631
|
02/23/2016 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Lawanda Brown stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/26/16. | | 16-05770
|
03/01/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief due: March 17, 2016. | | 16-06643
|
03/22/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal . | | 16-09005
|
03/22/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
04/06/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting For Decision Without Oral Argument. | | 16-10685
|
10/14/2016 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP16C-MC/MC/MG. | | 16-32221
|
11/08/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 16-34814
|
11/08/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
11/29/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 16, 2016. | | 16-34814
|