Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/24/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kainen Law Group. Check no. 4429. | | |
04/24/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SEALED) | | |
04/24/2017 | Other | Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms-Kemp Jones & Coulthard. | | |
04/24/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 17-13570
|
04/27/2017 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. | | 17-13966
|
05/12/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 17-15938
|
05/30/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 8, 2017, at 10:00 am. | | 17-17999
|
08/11/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 17-26917
|
08/14/2017 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated Pursuant to NRAP3E. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 10 days transcript request; 40 days fast track statement and appendix. | | 17-27035
|
08/24/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/07/16, 01/18/17, 02/01/17. To Court Reporter: Verbatim Reporting & Transcription. | | 17-28470
|
08/31/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal; Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs Pursuant to NRAP 38. | | 17-29255
|
08/31/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SEALED) | | |
08/31/2017 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 4678 returned to Kainen Law Group. | | |
09/11/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. | | 17-30428
|
09/22/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. We deny without prejudice the motion to dismiss and the request for attorney fees and costs. | | 17-32088
|
09/22/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Statement. | | 17-32134
|
10/04/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 25, 2017. | | 17-33580
|
10/12/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Expand Fast Track Statement. | | 17-34877
|
10/24/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volumes 1-5. | | 17-36596
|
10/24/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volumes 6-9. | | 17-36597
|
10/24/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volumes 10-12. | | 17-36598
|
10/24/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement Volumes 13-17. | | 17-36599
|
10/25/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Seal Selected Portions of Appendix. | | 17-36614
|
11/02/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix received on October 24, 2017. The clerk shall file the portions of the appendix received on October 26, 2017, under seal. Fast Track Response due: 20 days. | | 17-37607
|
11/02/2017 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | | 17-37610
|
11/02/2017 | Appendix | Filed Portions of Appendix to Fast Track Statement (Pages 3316-3375 and 3385-3387) (SEALED). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 11/02/17). | | |
11/21/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Fast Track Statement and Appendix, Motion for Expanded Fast Track Response. | | 17-40251
|
11/28/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Motion for Expanded Fast Track Response. | | 17-40882
|
12/06/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Fast Track Statment and Appendix (Second). | | 17-42023
|
12/12/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We grant respondent's motion's for extensions of time to file the fast track response and we grant the opposed motion for leave to file a response in excess of the type-volume limitation to the following extent. Fast Track Response consisting of no more than 6,686 words due: December 15, 2017. | | 17-42788
|
01/18/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $250 (Gary Silverman and Radford Smith each) due: 15 days or Fast Track Response due: 11 days. | | 18-02545
|
02/01/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Proof of Payment of Sanction. Check No. 13839 in the amount of $500 from Radford J. Smith, Chartered. | | 18-04538
|
02/08/2018 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/7/16, 1/18/17, 2/1/17. | | 18-05326
|
02/27/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Confession of Error and for Oral Argument. | | 18-07785
|
03/06/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Confession of Error; Opposition to Motion for Oral Argument and Countermotion for Acceptance of Respondent's Fast Track Response Brief. (DETACHED FAST TRACK RESPONSE AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 3/23/18). | | 18-08745
|
03/07/2018 | Motion | Filed Reply in Support of Motion for Confession of Error and Oral Argument. | | 18-09054
|
03/20/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply In Support Of Her Opposition And Countermotion. | | 18-10917
|
03/23/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Radford Smith and Gary Silverman shall each have 15 days from the date of this order to file a response to this order explaining the reasons for their failure to file the fast track response, and demonstrating cause as to why they should not be required to pay additional monetary sanctions, and why they should not be referred to the State Bar for investigation. | | 18-11455
|
03/23/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We deny the motion to treat the failure to file the fast track response as a confession of error. Appellant's request that this appeal be decided without a fast track response from respondent is denied, and respondent's countermotion to allow the late filing of the fast track response is granted. The clerk of this court shall detach the proposed fast track response from the opposition and countermotion filed on March 6, 2018, and file it separately. This appeal shall be submitted for decision on the fast track statement, fast track response, and the documents on file in this appeal, including the fully-briefed motion to dismiss appeal that was previously denied without prejudice. fn1[Appellant's request to strike respondents opposition and countermotion is denied. ] fn2[Appellant's motion requesting oral argument is denied.] | | 18-11463
|
03/23/2018 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | | 18-11465
|
03/23/2018 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. | | |
04/09/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 18-13290
|
04/16/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. No sanction is imposed on attorney Gary Silverman. Based on attorney Radford Smith's response to this court's order, we are persuaded that further sanction beyond $500 is inappropriate. Mr. Smith shall have 15 days from the date of this order to pay the sum of $500 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. | | 18-14352
|
04/17/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Fast Track Reply in Excess of Standard Word Count. | | 18-14709
|
04/18/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the fast track reply brief received on April 17, 2018. | | 18-14894
|
04/18/2018 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Child Custody Fast Track Reply. | | 18-14895
|
04/25/2018 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's orders entered on March 15, 2017, and July 24, 2017." NNP18-MD/KP/JH | | 18-15718
|
04/26/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Payment of Sanction. Copy of Check no. 13883 from Radford Smith in the amount of $500 for sanction payment per order filed 4/16/18. | | 18-16019
|
05/22/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-19626
|
05/22/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
06/06/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 25, 2018. | | 18-19626
|