Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/04/2015 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
08/04/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 15-23533
|
08/07/2015 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Anthony L. Barney, LTD. Check No. 1170. | | |
08/07/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Confidential Civil Coversheet. | | |
10/08/2015 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for 1) Stay Pending Appeal and 2) Affirmative Relief. | | 15-30545
|
10/08/2015 | Exhibit | Filed Appellant's Exhibits to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for 1) Stay Pending Appeal and 2) Affirmative Relief - Part 1. | | 15-30548
|
10/08/2015 | Exhibit | Filed Appellant's Exhibits to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for 1) Stay Pending Appeal and 2) Affirmative Relief - Part 2. | | 15-30549
|
10/08/2015 | Exhibit | Filed Appellant's Exhibits to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for 1) Stay Pending Appeal and 2) Affirmative Relief - Part 3. | | 15-30551
|
10/08/2015 | Exhibit | Filed Appellant's Exhibits to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for 1) Stay Pending Appeal and 2) Affirmative Relief - Part 4. | | 15-30552
|
10/08/2015 | Exhibit | Filed Appellant's Exhibits to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for 1) Stay Pending Appeal and 2) Affirmative Relief - Part 5. | | 15-30553
|
10/08/2015 | Exhibit | Filed Appellant's Exhibits to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for 1) Stay Pending Appeal and 2) Affirmative Relief - Part 6. | | 15-30554
|
10/08/2015 | Exhibit | Filed Appellant's Exhibits to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for 1) Stay Pending Appeal and 2) Affirmative Relief - Part 7. | | 15-30556
|
10/16/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Document. Docketing Statement and Transcript Request Form due: 11 days. | | 15-31554
|
10/19/2015 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Christopher D. Davis' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for 1) Stay Pending Appeal and 2) Affirmative Relief. | | 15-31673
|
10/19/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested. | | 15-31675
|
10/19/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondent's Response to Christopher D. Davis' Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for 1) Stay Pending Appeal and 2) Affirmative Relief. Volume 1. | | 15-31677
|
10/19/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Remand. | | 15-31678
|
10/19/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 15-31718
|
10/19/2015 | Exhibit | Filed Respondent's Exhibits to Response to Christopher D. Davis Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for 1)Stay Pending Appeal and 2) Affirmative Belief. | | 15-31842
|
10/21/2015 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 15-32110
|
10/22/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We stay the district court proceedings pending further order of this court. Within 11 days from the date of this order, Caroline shall file a supplement to the motion for remand addressing the effect any remand would have on the writ proceeding. Within 11 days from service of such supplement, Christopher shall file a single response to the motion for remand and the supplement thereto. fn2[The certification attached to the motion for remand does not contain the file-stamp of the district court clerk; Caroline shall attach a file-stamped copy of the certification to her supplement.] Nos. 68542/68948. | | 15-32199
|
10/29/2015 | Motion | Filed Supplement to Motion for Remand to the Eighth Judicial District Court. Nos. 68542/68948. | | |
11/10/2015 | Motion | Filed Christopher D. Davis's Response to Caroline Davis's Motion to Remand and Supplement Thereto. Nos. 68542/68948. | | |
11/17/2015 | Motion | Filed Caroline D. Davis' Reply to Christopher D. Davis's Response to Caroline Davis's Motion to Remand and Supplement Thereto. | | 15-35096
|
12/02/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 15-36704
|
12/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume I. | | 15-36705
|
12/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume II. | | 15-36706
|
12/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume III. | | 15-36708
|
12/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume IV. | | 15-36709
|
12/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume V. | | 15-36710
|
12/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume VI. | | 15-36713
|
12/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume VII. | | 15-36714
|
12/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume VIII. | | 15-36715
|
12/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume IX. | | 15-36718
|
12/02/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume X. | | 15-36719
|
12/04/2015 | Brief | Filed Notice of Supplemental Authorities to Appellant's Opening Brief Pursuant to NRAP 31(e). | | 15-37039
|
12/09/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We entered a temporary stay pending our consideration of additional briefing on the motion for remand, which has now been filed. We grant the motion and remand this matter to district court pursuant to its certification for the limited purpose of allowing the district court to enter its amended order. We conclude that the appeal in Docket No. 68542 may proceed, but that these matters should be consolidated and the parties should address jurisdiction in their briefing, as set forth below. The clerk shall consolidate these matters for appellate purposes. District Court's Written Order due: 30 days. Appellant/petitioner Christopher Davis's Supplemental Opening Brief due: 60 days. Each respondent/real party in interest's answering brief due: 30 days from service of Supplemental Opening Brief and Appellant/petitioner's Reply due: 30 days from combined answering brief and answer. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 15-37627
|
12/10/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion to Stay Briefing Pending Supreme Court's Ruling on Motion for Remand. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 15-37729
|
12/21/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. In light of this court's December 9, 2015, order of limited remand and setting forth an alternate briefing schedule, we deny as moot the motion of respondent and real party in interest Caroline Davis for a stay of briefing pending a decision on the motion for remand. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 15-38992
|
01/05/2016 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of Order Granting Motion To Amend May 19, 2015 Order and Denying Petition For Reconsideration filed in district court on 12/31/15. | | 16-00116
|
01/06/2016 | Motion | Filed Emergency Motion Under NRCP 27(e) for 1)An Order to Set Aside District Court Order 2)An Order Requiring Proper Amended Order and 3)An Order to Extend Time in which to File Supplemental Opening Brief. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-00410
|
01/06/2016 | Appendix | Filed Exhibits 1-8 to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e). Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-00411
|
01/06/2016 | Appendix | Filed Exhibits 9-16 to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e). Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-00412
|
01/07/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service. | | 16-00466
|
01/07/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant/petitioner Christopher Davis has now filed an "emergency" motion asking this court to vacate, strike, or set aside the district court's amended order; direct the district court to enter a "proper" amended order; and extend the time for Christopher to file his supplemental opening brief. We deny Christopher's motion. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-00485
|
02/05/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-03945
|
02/05/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix XI. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-03946
|
03/07/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-07175
|
03/07/2016 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol 1. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-07176
|
03/07/2016 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol 2. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-07177
|
03/07/2016 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol 3. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-07178
|
03/08/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Receipt of Copy (Respondent's Answering Brief, Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Volumes 1-3). Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-07437
|
03/08/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Mailing (Respondent's Answering Brief, Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Volumes 1-3). Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-07438
|
03/29/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Counsel. (Attorney Thomas R. Grover of the law firm of Goodsell & Olsen for appellant.) Nos. 68542/68948 | | 16-09738
|
04/05/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation For Extension to File Reply Brief. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-10653
|
04/05/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: May 6, 2016. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-10656
|
05/09/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion to Permit Late Filing of Reply Brief. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-14303
|
05/17/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received on May 9, 2016. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-15500
|
05/17/2016 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-15501
|
05/17/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
09/27/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-30008
|
10/11/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, November 8, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. | | 16-31612
|
10/25/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 16-33431
|
10/27/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Reply Brief). Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-33726
|
11/01/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service (Reply Brief). Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-33924
|
11/04/2016 | Brief | Filed Notice of Supplemental Authority. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 16-34413
|
11/08/2016 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
01/26/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Appeal dismissed; petition denied." Fn1[The Honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Cherry/Douglas/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 4. EN BANC Nos. 68542/68948 | | 17-02864
|
02/09/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: February 27, 2017. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 17-04721
|
02/28/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 17-06829
|
02/28/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Thomas R. Grover | | |
03/01/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent in Docket No. 68542 and real party in interest in Docket No. 68948 shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve an answer to the petition. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 17-06922
|
03/14/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Answer to Rehearing. Nos. 68542/68948. | | 17-08592
|
05/25/2017 | Opinion/Non-Dispositional | Filed Opinion on Rehearing. "Petition for rehearing granted, appeal dismissed; writ petition denied." Fn1[The honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Cherry/Douglas/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 26. EN BANC Nos. 68542/68948 | | 17-17515
|
06/20/2017 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 17-20420
|
06/20/2017 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
07/14/2017 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 29, 2017. | | 17-20420
|