Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/22/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | | |
02/22/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 16-05610
|
02/22/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 16-05612
|
02/22/2016 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Jacob L. Hafter | | |
02/22/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 16-05616
|
02/23/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Request for Order Allowing the Filing of an Overlength Motion. | | 16-05685
|
02/23/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. | | 16-05765
|
02/26/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program. | | 16-06284
|
02/29/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. | | 16-06395
|
03/08/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/08/15. To Court Reporter: Carrie Hansen. | | 16-07448
|
03/09/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the motion received via E-Flex on February 23, 2016. Respondents shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a response of no more than 34 pages. | | 16-07493
|
03/09/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Injunctive Relief Pursuant to NRAP 8. | | 16-07494
|
03/10/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-07713
|
03/21/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Response to motion for injunctive relief due: April 1, 2016. | | 16-08769
|
04/05/2016 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response in Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Injunctive Relief. | | 16-10579
|
04/21/2016 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/08/15. | | 16-12440
|
04/29/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The motion for injunctive relief is denied at this time. The denial of this motion is without prejudice, however, to appellant's right to raise this issue in the opening brief. | | 16-13452
|
05/24/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Rule 26.1 Disclosures Under Seal. | | 16-16307
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 1. | | 16-16765
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 2. | | 16-16766
|
05/27/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 16-16778
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 3. | | 16-16779
|
05/27/2016 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 4. | | 16-16780
|
06/10/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the NRAP 26.1 disclosure, received on May 27, 2016, under seal. | | 16-18156
|
06/10/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Rule 26.1 Disclosure (SEALED). | | |
06/20/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: July 11, 2016. | | 16-19252
|
07/12/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Joint Answering Brief. | | 16-21695
|
08/25/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. | | |
09/15/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Joint Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 16-28615
|
11/28/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 16-36685
|
02/23/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, April 4, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 17-06268
|
03/20/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument (Jordan Smith to argue on behalf of the Respondents). | | 17-09169
|
03/20/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 17-09213
|
04/03/2017 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Wesley Juhl's Letter on Behalf of the Las Vegas Review-Journal asking for Camera Access for the Oral Argument. | | 17-10971
|
04/03/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Media Request. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings. Wesley Juhl of the Las Vegas Review Journal is designated as the pool coordinator. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 10:00 a.m. | | 17-11057
|
04/04/2017 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
07/25/2017 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC | | 17-24596
|
07/27/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-25049
|
07/27/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Jacob L. Hafter | | |
08/08/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Joint Motion under NRAP 36 to Reissue Unpublished Order of Affirmance as Opinion to be Published in Nevada Reports. | | 17-26378
|
09/21/2017 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 17-31961
|
11/29/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Publish. A published opinion affirming the district court's order will be forthcoming. Issuance of the remittitur is stayed pending publication of the opinion. | | 17-40961
|
12/07/2017 | Opinion/Non-Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 93. EN BANC | | 17-42095
|
01/02/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-00051
|
01/02/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
01/19/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 8, 2018. | | 18-00051
|