Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/17/2016 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. In Forma Pauperis. | | |
03/17/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 16-08563
|
03/17/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines. | | 16-08565
|
03/22/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED.) | | |
04/06/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | | 16-10811
|
04/12/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Proper Person Docketing Statement. | | 16-11270
|
04/12/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant, who is proceeding in forma pauperis, has filed a transcript request form pursuant to NRAP 9(b). At this stage of the proceedings, we are unable to determine which transcripts, if any, are necessary for this court's review on appeal, see NRAP 9(b)(1)(C), and therefore, we decline to order the preparation of the requested transcripts at this time. However, as this appeal proceeds, we will consider the necessity of transcripts and may order their preparation at a later date. | | 16-11296
|
04/25/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days. | | 16-12882
|
05/11/2016 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - VOL 1. | | 16-14742
|
05/11/2016 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - VOL 2. | | 16-14747
|
05/16/2016 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 122-146 and 151-152 (SEALED). | | |
07/19/2016 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. | | 16-22400
|
09/06/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
09/16/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. Having considered the documents transmitted by the district court and appellant's informal brief, this court has determined that the appointment of pro bono counsel to represent the parties would assist this court in reviewing this appeal. Accordingly, we direct the clerk of this court to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Notice of Appearance due: 60 days. Alternatively, if either appellant or respondent is not financially eligible or objects to pro bono representation, or if a volunteer attorney cannot be located, the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada shall notify this court in writing within 60 days from the date of this order. | | 16-28787
|
11/15/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Determination of Ineligibility for Pro Bono Representation. | | 16-35569
|
11/15/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Daniel Polsenberg and Abraham Smith as counsel for the Appellant). | | 16-35608
|
12/12/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Robert Gardner as counsel for District Attorney Family Support Division). | | 16-38329
|
12/21/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Transcript Request Form due: 14 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. | | 16-39605
|
01/04/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/24/12, 08/28/12, 10/30/13, 02/19/14, 08/08/14, 08/11/14, 12/09/14, 01/28/15, 04/15/15, 06/17/15, 11/16/15, 01/15/16, 01/20/16, 05/17/16, 07/13/16, 08/31/16. To Court Reporter: None listed. | | 17-00243
|
01/18/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Statement of Legal Aid Representation. | | 17-01837
|
02/14/2017 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/24/12, 08/28/12, 10/30/13, 02/19/14, 08/08/14, 08/11/14, 12/09/14, 01/28/15, 04/15/15, 06/17/15, 11/16/15, 01/15/16, 01/20/16, 05/17/16, 07/13/16, 08/31/16. | | 17-05272
|
03/21/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 17-09291
|
03/21/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 20, 2017. | | 17-09294
|
04/21/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension - Second Request (Opening Brief). | | 17-13287
|
05/22/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 17-17096
|
05/24/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 21, 2017. | | 17-17382
|
06/22/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Judicial Notice of Related Proceedings. | | 17-20721
|
06/22/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to File Appendix Under Seal. | | 17-20722
|
06/22/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Replacement Opening Brief. | | 17-20752
|
06/22/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 1. | | 17-20753
|
06/22/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 2. | | 17-20754
|
06/30/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Amicus Brief. | | 17-21860
|
06/30/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's NRAP 44 Notice of Constitutional Issues. | | 17-21861
|
07/07/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Certification. The clerk of Nevada Supreme Court certifies to the Honorable Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, that on June 30, 2017, appellant filed with the Supreme Court a notice that this appeal draws into question the constitutionality of NRS 425.3844. | | 17-22502
|
07/10/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion Requesting That The District Attorney, Family Support Division Be Allowed to File An Answering Brief Pursuant to NRS 125B.150(3). | | 17-22733
|
07/12/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. Appellant's motion requesting that this court take judicial notice of documents filed in related proceedings is granted. The clerk shall file volume 3, received on June 27, 2017, under seal. Appellant has also filed a motion for an extension of time for The American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada (ACLUNV) and the National Coalition for a Civil Right to Counsel (NCCRC) to file briefs of amicus curiae in this matter. Appellant's motion is denied. | | 17-23063
|
07/12/2017 | Appendix | Filed SEALED Appellant's Appendix - Volume 3. | | |
07/13/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Amicus Brief. | | 17-23392
|
07/17/2017 | Motion | Filed Amended Motion to Extend Time to File Amicus Brief. | | 17-23748
|
07/24/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The Clark County District Attorney's Office (CCDA) has filed a motion seeking leave to file an answering brief in this appeal. The motion is denied. | | 17-24352
|
07/25/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. ACLUN shall have until August 2, 2017, to file and serve a motion for leave to file an amicus brief in compliance with NRAP 29(c). | | 17-24560
|
08/02/2017 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae Elizabeth Patterson's Motion Pursuant to NRAP 29 for Leave to File Amicus Brief, and to File Such Amicus Brief Out Of Time. (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 8/9/17). | | 17-25802
|
08/02/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Service (Amicus Curiae Elizabeth Patterson's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief). Due date: 5 days. | | 17-25806
|
08/03/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amicus Curiae Elizabeth Patterson's Amended Certificate of Service for Motion Pursuant to NRAP 29 for Leave to File Amicus Brief, and to File Such Amicus Brief Out of Time | | 17-25824
|
08/03/2017 | Motion | Filed Amicus Curiae ACLUN's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada in Support of Appellant. (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER 8/9/17). | | 17-25827
|
08/09/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall detach the brief from the motion filed on August 3, 2017, and file it separately. The clerk shall detach the brief from the motion filed on August 2, 2017, and file it separately. Answering Brief due: 30 days. | | 17-26522
|
08/09/2017 | Brief | Filed Elizabeth Patterson's Amicus Brief. | | 17-26525
|
08/09/2017 | Brief | Filed Amicus Curiae Brief of American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada. | | 17-26526
|
10/30/2017 | Motion | Filed Motion Pursuant to NRAP 29 For Leave to File Amicus Brief from Clark County District Attorney/Family Support Division, and To File Such Amicus Brief Out of Time. (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 11/7/17). | | 17-37135
|
11/07/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the appendix received on November 6, 2017. We are unable to file the amended amicus brief received on November 6, 2017. DAFS shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file a certificate that complies with NRAP 32(a)(9). fn1[Given the submission of an amended brief, the clerk shall detach the amicus brief from the motion filed on October 30, 2017, and return it unfiled.] | | 17-38236
|
11/08/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. | | 17-38434
|
11/08/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Amended Amicus Brief of Clark County District Attorney, Family Support Division. (FILED PER ORDER 11/7/17). | | 17-38549
|
11/09/2017 | Brief | Filed Amended Amicus Brief of Clark County District Attorney, Family Support Division. | | 17-38588
|
11/13/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. DAFS has now filed an amended certificate of compliance along with another copy of the amicus brief. Accordingly, the clerk shall reject the amended amicus brief received on November 6, 2017. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 30 days. | | 17-39030
|
12/14/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 17-43089
|
12/18/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: January 16, 2018. | | 17-43698
|
01/19/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 18-02718
|
02/01/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: February 20, 2018. | | 18-04370
|
02/22/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Further Judicial Notice. | | 18-06866
|
02/22/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 18-06867
|
02/22/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. | | 18-06868
|
02/22/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to File Appendix Volume Under Seal. | | 18-06869
|
02/22/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
02/22/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Erratum to Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 18-07012
|
04/05/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant's motion to take judicial notice of the documents included in pages 502-12 of appellant's appendix is granted to the following extent. We will permit the documents to be filed, but disregard any documents that are later determined to be inappropriate for consideration in this appeal. The clerk shall file volume 5, received on February 26, 2018, under seal. | | 18-12932
|
04/05/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix Volume 5 (SEALED). | | |
08/02/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Oral Argument and En Banc Review in the First Instance. | | 18-29677
|
09/21/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. | | 18-37088
|
12/21/2018 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Vacating in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the February 22, 2016, order AFFIRMED IN PART AND VACATED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." EN BANC (SC) | | 18-909926
|
01/08/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-01154
|
01/14/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until February 7, 2019, to file and serve any petition for rehearing. If no petition for rehearing is filed by that date, the clerk shall issue the remittitur forthwith. (SC) | | 19-01939
|
02/08/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Limited Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-06031
|
02/13/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: March 11, 2019. (SC). | | 19-06840
|
03/12/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Limited Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-10776
|
03/18/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: March 27, 2019. (SC) | | 19-11758
|
03/27/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Limited Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-13654
|
03/27/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Daniel F. Polsenberg | | |
04/05/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amicus American Civil Liberties Union of Nevada Joinder in Support of Appellant's Motion for Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-14970
|
05/10/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying in Part Petition for Rehearing and Inviting Participation by Amicus Curiae. We deny rehearing in part as to the issue regarding NRS 425.3844. We invite the Clark County District Attorney's Office, Family Support Division to file an amicus brief. If CCDA agrees, it shall have 28 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amicus brief that complies with NRAP 40(b). Appellant shall have 14 days from service of CCDA's answer to file and serve any reply. We defer ruling on appellant's request for oral argument. (SC) | | 19-20559
|
05/24/2019 | Brief | Filed By Request of the Court Order Dated 5/10/2019, this Additional Amicus Brief is Provided by the Clark County District Attorney, Family Support Division. (SC) | | 19-22829
|
06/07/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-24917
|
06/17/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a reply in support of the petition for rehearing is granted. Appellant shall have until July 11, 2019, to file and serve any reply. (SC) | | 19-26153
|
07/11/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief on Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-29642
|
07/25/2019 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief on Petition for Limited Rehearing. (SC) | | 19-31595
|
07/25/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Refund of Filing Fee. (SC) | | 19-31596
|
08/16/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Theclerk of this court is directed to refund the $150 rehearing fee. (SC) | | 19-34498
|
08/19/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief on rehearing was filed on July 25, 2019. (SC). | | 19-34735
|
09/20/2019 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "We deny the remaining issues in the petition for rehearing." (SC). | | 19-39321
|
10/15/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 19-42547
|
10/15/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
11/01/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 18, 2019. (SC) | | 19-42547
|