Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/15/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
05/15/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 18-18511
|
05/15/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 18-18513
|
05/15/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. | | 18-18516
|
05/17/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Willick Law Group. Check no. 32154. | | |
05/17/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. | | 18-18954
|
05/17/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 18-18996
|
05/18/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | | 18-19032
|
05/21/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. | | 18-19298
|
05/29/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 18-20263
|
05/29/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.) | | 18-20265
|
05/31/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement). | | 18-20720
|
06/07/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 26, 2018, at 10:00 am. | | 18-21800
|
07/31/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 18-29431
|
08/01/2018 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 18-29568
|
08/07/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 18-30279
|
08/09/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 73838/75834. | | 18-30690
|
08/20/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions to Consolidate. Appellants Single Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 28, 2018. Nos. 73838/75834. | | 18-32222
|
09/26/2018 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 73838/75834. | | 18-37708
|
09/27/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 73838/75834. | | 18-37829
|
10/01/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 12, 2018. Nos. 73838/75834. | | 18-38343
|
10/15/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave of Court to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation of Opening Brief. Nos. 73838/75837. | | 18-40276
|
10/15/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to File Appendix IV Under Seal. Nos. 73838/75837. | | 18-40277
|
10/15/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume I. Nos. 73838/75837. | | 18-40278
|
10/15/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume II. Nos. 73838/75837. | | 18-40279
|
10/15/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume III. Nos. 73838/75837. | | 18-40280
|
10/15/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume V. Nos. 73838/75837. | | 18-40281
|
10/15/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VI, Part 1. Nos. 73838/75837. | | 18-40282
|
10/15/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VI, part 2. Nos. 73838/75837. | | 18-40285
|
10/15/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VII, Part 1. Nos. 73838/75837. | | 18-40286
|
10/15/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VII, Part 2. Nos. 73838/75837. | | 18-40287
|
10/15/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VIII. Nos. 73838/75837. | | 18-40288
|
10/15/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IX. Nos. 73838/75837. | | 18-40289
|
10/15/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm Name. (McLetchie Law, f/k/a McLetchie Shell) | | 18-40333
|
10/18/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Appellants' Motion for Leave of Court to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation of Opening Brief and Countermotion for Dismissal of Appeal. Nos. 73838/75834. | | 18-40956
|
10/24/2018 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Appellants' Motion to File Appendix IV Under Seal. Nos. 73838/75834. | | 18-41954
|
10/25/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Reply to Opposition to Motion for Leave of Court to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation of Opening Brief and Opposition to Countermotion to Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 73838/75834. | | 18-42197
|
11/01/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Motion to File Appendix Under Seal. Nos. 73838/75834. | | 18-42857
|
12/06/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. Appellants have filed a motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the type-volume limitation. We grant the motion to exceed the type-volume limitation and deny the motion to dismiss. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on October 15, 2018. Appellants have also filed a motion to file the portion of the appendix containing a transcript of a closed hearing in a related family court case under seal. We grant the motion. the clerk shall file volume IV of the appendix, received on October 19, 2018, under seal. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | 18-907231
|
12/06/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | 18-907233
|
12/06/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IV. (SEALED). Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | |
01/03/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent Louis C. Schneider's Motion to Extend Time for Filing of Answering Brief. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-00311
|
01/03/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondents Steve W. Sanson and Veterans In Politics International, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Appellees' Answering Brief [First Request]. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | 19-00433
|
01/11/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Respondents shall have until February 22, 2019, to file and serve their answering briefs. Appellants shall have 30 days from service of last-filed answering brief to file and serve any reply brief. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-01775
|
02/13/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Schneider Parties) Answering Brief in Docket No. 75834. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-06947
|
02/13/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (Schneider Parties) Appendix to Answering Brief in Docket No. 75834. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-06948
|
02/25/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief (73838). Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-08451
|
02/25/2019 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix Volume 1 (73838). Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-08452
|
03/25/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: April 10, 2019. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | 19-13145
|
04/02/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Granting Bailey Kennedy Leve to Withdraw as Co-Counsel for Appellants. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-14434
|
04/09/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall remove Joshua P. Gilmore and Dennis L. Kennedy of Baily Kennedy as counsel for appellants. Appellants remain represented by The Abrams and Mayo Law Firm and Willick Law Group. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | 19-15306
|
04/10/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-15653
|
04/10/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | |
09/17/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, October 15, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 19-38785
|
09/19/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Continue Oral Argument. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-39208
|
09/19/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Continue Oral Argument (REJECTED-DUPLICATE). Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | |
09/23/2019 | Other | Justice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties | | |
09/24/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-39694
|
09/24/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument (REJECTED-DUPLICATE). Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | |
09/25/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The oral argument presently scheduled for October 15, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. is vacated. This matter will be rescheduled for oral argument on December 12, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | 19-39904
|
10/29/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on Thursday, December 12, 2019 at 1:30 pm. Nos 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-44434
|
10/29/2019 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Our Nevada Judges Letter Requesting to Broadcast and Record Oral Argument. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | 19-44456
|
10/31/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Media Request. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings. Alexander Falconi of Our Nevada Judges is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 1:30 p.m. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-44735
|
11/27/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-48504
|
12/03/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument - Margaret A. McLetchie of the law firm McLetchie Law Group PLLC will appear at oral argument scheduled for December 12, 2019 on behalf of respondents, Steve W. Sanson and Veterans in Politics International, Inc. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 19-48960
|
12/12/2019 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/AS. (SC) | | |
03/05/2020 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Gibbons/Hardesty/Stiglich. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Gibbons/Hardesty. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 9. SNP19-MG/JH/LS Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-08769
|
03/20/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Petition for Rehearing due: April 6, 2020. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-10926
|
04/06/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Mitchell Langberg as counsel for the Appellants'). Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | 20-12997
|
04/06/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | 20-13002
|
04/06/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Marshal S. Willick. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | |
04/24/2020 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | 20-15667
|
05/04/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration due: May 22, 2020. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | 20-16813
|
05/22/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-19702
|
05/26/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Recusal of Chief Justice Pickering and For the Appointment of Senior Justices and/or District Court Judges to Participate in Appellants' En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 73838/75834.(SC) | | 20-19794
|
05/29/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Notice of Volunary Disclosure. Justice Cadish has voluntarily recused herself this matter. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-20289
|
05/29/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Volunary Disclosure. Chief Justice Pickering has voluntarily recused herself from these consolidated appeals. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-20292
|
06/22/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Appointment. The Honorable Nancy M. Saitta, Senior Justice, and the Honorable Michael A. Cherry, Senior Justice, are assigned to participate in the determination of this matter. fn1[To the extent appellants' motion filed on May 26, 2020, requests this court to designate a sufficient number of senior justices and/or district judges to ensure a seven-member court review of the petition for en banc reconsideration, the motion is denied.] Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-23114
|
07/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-25108
|
07/16/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents Steve W. Sanson and Veterans In Politics International, Inc. in docket no. 73838 shall have until August 5, 2020, to file and serve the answer to petition for en banc reconsideration. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC). | | 20-26218
|
07/22/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents in docket no. 75834 shall have until August 5, 2020, to file and serve the answer to petition for en banc reconsideration. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-26746
|
08/05/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents Law Offices of Louis C. Schneider, LLC and Louis C. Schneider's Joinder to Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-28856
|
08/05/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondents Steven W. Sanson and Veterans in Politics International, Inc.'s Answer to Appellants' Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-28893
|
08/07/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Leave To File Reply In Support of Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-29216
|
08/13/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents Steve W. Sanson and Veterans in Politics International, Inc.'s Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Petition for En Banc Reconsideration and Motion to Strike. Nos. 73838/75834 (SC) | | 20-29904
|
08/14/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellants have filed a motion for leave to file a reply to the petition for en banc reconsideration. Appellants' motion is denied. This court declines respondents' request to sanction appellants or strike the motion. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-30072
|
09/14/2020 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [Chief Justice Kristina Pickering, Justice Elissa Cadish, and Justice Abbie Silver did not participate in the decision of this matter. Senior Justice Nancy Saitta and Senior Justice Michael A. Cherry were appointed to participate in this matter.] EN BANC Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-33727
|
10/09/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-37073
|
10/09/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
11/05/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 10/12/2020. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC) | | 20-37073
|