Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/19/2019 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
12/19/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) (UNSEALED PER 02/27/20 ORDER). | | 19-52557
|
12/20/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Stay the Briefing Schedule. (SC) | | 19-51530
|
01/02/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC) | | 20-00057
|
01/09/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 20-01131
|
01/16/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motion. Appellant's Status Report due: 30 days. The briefing in this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. (SC). | | 20-02117
|
02/14/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Status Report. (SC) | | 20-06245
|
02/14/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Unseal. (SC) | | 20-06246
|
02/27/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's motion to unseal the record and documents in this appeal is granted. The clerk of this court shall unseal the documents filed under seal with this court. Appellant's unopposed request to continue holding this appeal in abeyance until the district court rules on appellant's motion to alter or amend the judgment is granted. Appellant's Status Report due: 30 days. Briefing shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. (SC). | | 20-07849
|
03/05/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 03/02/20 Order on Motion to Alter or Amend the Judgment Pursuant to Nev. R. Civ. P. 59(e). (SC) | | 20-08764
|
03/16/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's Status Report due: 14 days. (SC). | | 20-10271
|
03/20/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Remand (NRAP 12A) (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 03/20/20). (SC) | | |
03/20/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 20-11000
|
03/20/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Index of Exhibits in Support of Motion to Remand. (SC) | | 20-10964
|
03/20/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Remand (NRAP 12A). (SC). | | 20-11023
|
04/10/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Limited Remand. This appeal is remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of allowing the district court to hold an evidentiary hearing and to enter its order. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to enter its written decision and to transmit a certified copy of that decision to this court. The briefing schedule remains suspended pending further order of this court. (SC). | | 20-13641
|
04/15/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Regarding Order of Limited Remand dated April 10, 2020. (SC) | | 20-14178
|
08/13/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The district court shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to this court its order resolving the motion to alter or amend the judgment, or otherwise inform this court of the status of the proceedings. (SC) | | 20-29873
|
08/13/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed Evidentiary Hearing has been re-scheduled for
September 21, 2020. We will submit the requested order as soon as possible thereafter. (SC) | | 20-29963
|
08/25/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes. (SC) | | 20-31351
|
11/30/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on November 18, 2020. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. (SC) | | 20-43315
|
12/18/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Substitution of Attorney (Amelia L. Bizzaro, Assistant Federal Public Defender replacing S. Alex Spelman, Assistant Federal Public Defender for appellant). (SC) | | 20-45898
|
12/18/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice that the District Court's Prior Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order have been Rescinded. (SC) | | 20-45900
|
12/21/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed Certified copy of order filed in district court on December 21, 2020. (SC) | | 20-46089
|
12/31/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court the final order resolving the matters pending on remand. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. (SC) | | 20-47032
|
01/25/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on January 20, 2021. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order. (SC) | | 21-02241
|
02/01/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. (SC) | | 21-03032
|
02/03/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC) | | 21-03352
|
04/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-09669
|
04/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 3, 2021. (SC) | | 21-10311
|
04/12/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Emma L. Smith as Co-Counsel. (SC) | | 21-10376
|
05/03/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-12678
|
05/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix in Support of Brief - Volume 1 of 10. (SC) | | 21-12679
|
05/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix in Support of Brief - Volume 2 of 10. (SC) | | 21-12680
|
05/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix in Support of Brief - Volume 3 of 10. (SC) | | 21-12681
|
05/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix in Support of Brief - Volume 4 of 10. (SC) | | 21-12682
|
05/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix in Support of Brief - Volume 5 of 10. (SC) | | 21-12683
|
05/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix in Support of Brief - Volume 6 of 10. (SC) | | 21-12685
|
05/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix in Support of Brief - Volume 7 of 10. (SC) | | 21-12686
|
05/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix in Support of Brief - Volume 8 of 10. (SC) | | 21-12687
|
05/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix in Support of Brief - Volume 9 of 10. (SC) | | 21-12689
|
05/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix in Support of Brief - Volume 10 of 10. (SC) | | 21-12690
|
06/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Karen Mishler, Chief Deputy District Attorney as counsel for Respondent). (SC) | | 21-15676
|
06/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 21-15677
|
06/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until July 2, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-15983
|
07/02/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-19060
|
08/02/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-22356
|
08/02/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: September 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-22379
|
08/31/2021 | Brief | Filed Petitioner-Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-25357
|
08/31/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC) | | |
10/07/2021 | Other | Justice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings | | |
01/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument would be of assistance in resolving the issues presented in this matter. Accordingly, oral argument is scheduled for February 16, 2022, at 1:30 p.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-00405
|
02/01/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-03288
|
02/16/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel JH/LS/DH (SC) | | |
03/31/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP22 - JH/LS/DH. (SC) | | 22-10042
|
04/15/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing fee waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
04/15/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-12029
|
04/25/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 22-13038
|
05/09/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC) | | 22-14714
|
05/25/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." Fn1 [The Honorable Abbi Silver, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC. (SC) | | 22-16594
|
06/20/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-19364
|
06/20/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
07/14/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 28, 2022. (SC) | | 22-19364
|