Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/24/2020 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
01/24/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 20-03451
|
01/24/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-03453
|
02/24/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (SC) | | 20-07297
|
03/03/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing the Filing of Required Documents. Appellant's Case Appeal Statement, Transcript Request Form and Docketing Statement due: 7 days. (SC). | | 20-08554
|
03/09/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/20/19, 05/17/19, 06/24/19, 07/08/19, 07/09/19, 07/10/19, 07/22/19, 07/23/19, 07/24/19, 07/25/19, 07/26/19, 09/16/19, 10/07/19, 11/04/19, 12/09/19 and 12/18/19. To Court Reporter: Lara Corcoran. (SC) | | 20-09319
|
03/09/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 20-09320
|
03/09/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 20-09321
|
04/29/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/20/19, 05/17/19, 06/24/19, 07/08/19-07/10/19, 07/22/19-07/26/19, 09/16/19, 10/07/19, 11/04/19, 12/09/19 and 12/18/19. (SC) | | 20-16234
|
05/27/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request). (SC). | | 20-20064
|
06/05/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 24, 2020. (SC). | | 20-21154
|
08/24/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC) | | 20-31124
|
08/27/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion requesting a second extension of time (60 days) to file the opening brief is granted. Opening brief and appendix due: October 23, 2020. | | 20-31651
|
10/23/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Third Request). (SC) | | 20-39024
|
11/06/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-40733
|
11/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1 of 9. (SC) | | 20-40736
|
11/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2 of 9. (SC) | | 20-40735
|
11/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 3 of 9. (SC) | | 20-40737
|
11/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 4 of 9. (SC) | | 20-40738
|
11/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 5 of 9. (SC) | | 20-40739
|
11/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 6 of 9. (SC) | | 20-40740
|
11/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 7 of 9. (SC) | | 20-40741
|
11/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 8 of 9. (SC) | | 20-40742
|
11/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol. 9 of 9. (SC) | | 20-40743
|
11/09/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a motion for a third extension of time to file the opening brief. The motion is granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on November 6, 2020. Respondent shall have until December 7, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 20-40918
|
12/03/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Taleen Pandukht, Chief Deputy District Attorney as counsel for respondent). (SC) | | 20-43714
|
12/03/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-43715
|
12/03/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-43716
|
01/21/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
01/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Dismiss and Substitute Appellate Counsel. (SC) | | 21-02876
|
01/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | 21-02879
|
02/01/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Notice Regarding Case. (SC) | | 21-02999
|
02/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Counsel and Remanding to Secure Appellate Counsel. The clerk shall remove Jess Y. Matsuda as counsel of record for appellant. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to appoint new appellate counsel. As no fees or costs are due in this matter, appellant's pro se motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. (SC) | | 21-03692
|
02/18/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on February 17, 2021 appointing Mario Valencia as counsel for appellant. (SC) | | 21-04746
|
02/22/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order, The clerk shall add attorney Mario D. Valencia as counsel of record for appellant. Mr. Valencia shall have 30 days from the date of this order to inform this court, in writing, whether he will be filing an amended opening brief or will be relying on the opening brief filed by appellant's previous counsel. (SC) | | 21-05173
|
03/02/2021 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document - Proper Person Appellant's Letter. (SC) | | 21-06159
|
03/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to the Court's February 22, 2021 Order. (SC) | | 21-08379
|
03/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Establishing Briefing Schedule. If appellant requires the production of transcripts not previously requested, appellant shall serve and file, in this court, a file-stamped transcript request form within 7 days of the date of this order. Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the amended opening brief. (SC) | | 21-08754
|
03/26/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/03/19 and 09/18/19. To Court Reporter: Christine Erickson. (SC) | | 21-08760
|
05/10/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Christine Erickson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:07/03/19 and 09/18/19. (SC) | | 21-13309
|
06/22/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-17956
|
06/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 10. (SC) | | 21-17957
|
06/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Regarding Appellant's Appendix. (SC) | | 21-17968
|
07/21/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-20922
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-20923
|
08/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-24055
|
08/18/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
03/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn4 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] RP/LS/MG. (SC) | | 22-08499
|
03/26/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File a Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-09463
|
03/30/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing due: May 4, 2022. (SC) | | 22-09820
|
04/04/2022 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document to Appellant Devohn Marks. (SC) | | 22-10416
|
04/21/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-12723
|
04/21/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing fee waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
05/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-14129
|
05/16/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-15480
|
07/19/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC) | | 22-22681
|
08/01/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Petition for En Banc Reconsideration, and to Stay the Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-24001
|
08/02/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time and Regarding Remittitur. Appellant shall have until September 1, 2022, to file and serve any petition for en banc reconsideration. If no petition for en banc reconsideration is timely filed, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. Appellant also moves to stay issuance of the remittitur pending disposition of his petition for en banc reconsideration. The motion is denied as unnecessary. (SC) | | 22-24202
|
08/22/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (SC) | | 22-26109
|
08/26/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's counsel has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. The motion to withdraw is denied. (SC) | | 22-26890
|
09/07/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a pro se petition for en banc reconsideration. Appellant may not file a pro se petition for en banc reconsideration. The clerk shall return the pro se petition for en banc reconsideration received on September 2, 2022, unfiled. Counsel for appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve a petition for en banc reconsideration, if deemed warranted. If no petition for en banc reconsideration is timely filed, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-28006
|
11/25/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Regarding Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-36919
|
11/28/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 22-39323
|
11/28/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
12/15/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 29, 2022. (SC) | | 22-39323
|