Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/18/2020 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC) | | |
11/18/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-42201
|
11/18/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA) (SC) | | 20-42202
|
11/18/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC) | | 20-42204
|
11/30/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC) | | 20-43285
|
12/01/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested:1/27/20 To Court Reporter: Unknown. (SC) | | 20-43438
|
12/07/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-44328
|
12/07/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant, who is proceeding in forma pauperis, has filed a transcript request form pursuant to NRAP 9(b). At this stage of the proceedings, this court is unable to determine which transcripts, if any, are necessary for review on appeal, and therefore, declines to order the preparation of the requested transcript at this time. However, as this appeal proceeds, this court will consider the necessity of transcripts and may order their preparation at a later date. (SC) | | 20-44340
|
12/08/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 20-44589
|
12/28/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-46638
|
01/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. The clerk of this court shall transmit a copy of this order and the attached district court order and case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Notice of Appearance for Appellant or LACSN's Notice due: 60 days. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 21-00669
|
03/03/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance from the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for Eric R. Olsen. (SC) | | 21-06229
|
03/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Attorney Eric R. Olsen has now filed a statement of legal aid representation in which he indicates that he is appellant's pro bono counsel. Accordingly, this court sets forth the following schedule for the requesting of transcripts and briefing in this appeal. Appellant's transcript request form due: 14 days. Appellant's opening brief due: 90 days. (SC) | | 21-06700
|
03/22/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/27/20 and 8/6/20. To Court Reporter: Department 2. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/23/21)(SC) | | |
03/23/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-08263
|
03/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Transcript Request Form. (SC) | | 21-09177
|
03/31/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's transcript request form due: April 9, 2021. (SC) | | 21-09322
|
04/02/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-09546
|
04/06/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/27/20 and 08/06/20. To Court Reporter: First Judicial District Court Dept. 2, Clerk of District Court. (SC) | | 21-09878
|
06/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-15505
|
06/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief due: July 7, 2021. (SC) | | 21-15643
|
07/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-18955
|
07/06/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-19295
|
07/08/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-19572
|
07/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Disapproving Stipulation. The parties have filed a stipulation for a second extension of time to file the opening brief. The stipulation is disapproved. Opening brief due: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-19596
|
07/09/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-19830
|
07/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 7/16/21)(SC) | | |
07/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-20532
|
07/16/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-20584
|
07/16/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-20586
|
07/16/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-20587
|
07/16/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-20588
|
08/16/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent shall have until August 30, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-23878
|
08/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-25222
|
09/05/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-25798
|
09/05/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-25799
|
09/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time filed on August 30, 2021, is granted. NRAP 31(b)(3). The answering brief and appendix were filed on September 5, 2021. Appellant shall have until October 5, 2021, to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 21-25984
|
09/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Amended Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-26252
|
10/05/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-28547
|
10/05/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
12/29/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. I (Abbi Silver) believe that I can be fair and impartial in this case, but I wish to disclose that Erika Pike Turner, Esq. recently filed a motion to quash a subpoena on behalf of my father, Dr. Frank Silver, in an unrelated action which my father was not a party. However, any party who believes disqualification is appropriate shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file a motion for disqualification based on my disclosure. (SC) | | 21-36938
|
01/11/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, oral argument is scheduled for March 16, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-01068
|
01/14/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 22-01483
|
02/08/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 22-04240
|
02/14/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 22-04895
|
02/23/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Change of Address. (SC) | | 22-05861
|
02/25/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 22-06228
|
02/25/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 22-06242
|
03/02/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-06684
|
03/16/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. AS/EC/KP. (SC). | | |
03/30/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP22-AS/EC/KP (SC) | | 22-09920
|
04/25/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-12983
|
04/25/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/29/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 27, 2022. (SC) | | 22-12983
|