Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83847
Short Caption:TAYLOR VS. BRILL, M.D., FACOG, FACSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):84421, 84492, 84881
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A773472Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeeCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Stiglich for Justice LeePanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/03/2021 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/13/2023 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:09/13/2023How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/01/2021Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Breeden & Associates. Check no. 001081. (SC)
12/01/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)21-34276
12/01/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC)21-34279
12/03/2021Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC).21-34472
12/06/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Minutes. (SC)21-34733
12/13/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)21-35419
12/15/2021Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC)21-35801
12/21/2021Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC)21-36403
01/03/2022Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/28/21; 10/7/21; and 10/8/21. To Court Reporter: Dept. 3 of the Eighth Judicial. (SC)22-00072
01/27/2022Transcript RequestFiled Supplemental Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/26/21. To Court Reporter: Court Reporter for Dept. 3, 8th JD. (SC)22-02757
02/07/2022TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Rebeca Gomez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/28/21, 10/26/21, 10/7/21, and 10/8/21. (SC)22-04150
03/10/2022BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)22-07676
03/10/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. I. (SC)22-07688
03/10/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. II. (SC)22-07689
03/10/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. III. (SC)22-07690
03/10/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. IV. (SC)22-07691
03/10/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. V. (SC)22-07693
03/10/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. VI. (SC)22-07694
03/10/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. VII. (SC)22-07701
03/10/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. VIII. (SC)22-07702
03/10/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. IX. (SC)22-07695
03/10/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. X. (SC)22-07696
03/10/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. XI. (SC)22-07697
03/10/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. XII. (SC)22-07698
03/10/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Vol. XIII. (SC)22-07699
04/05/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents' Answering Brief due: April 25, 2022. (SC)22-10533
04/11/2022Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/11/22) (SC)
04/11/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)22-11440
04/25/2022BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)22-13085
04/25/2022AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC)22-13086
05/22/2022BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)22-16175
05/23/2022Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
10/18/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Disclosure for Justice Herndon. (SC)22-32812
10/24/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Disqualify Justice Douglas Herndon. (SC)22-33438
10/26/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address - Adam Breenden. (SC)22-33666
11/04/2022MotionFiled Response to Motion to Disqualify from Justice Herdon. (SC)22-34727
11/04/2022MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition To Appellant's Motion To Disqualify Justice Douglas Herndon. (REJECTED PER 11/7/22 NOTICE) (SC)22-34833
11/07/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Due: 5 Days. (SC)22-34908
11/07/2022MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Appellant's Motion To Disqualify Justice Douglas Herndon. (SC)22-34945
12/15/2022Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Motion denied." NCJC 2.11(A)(6)(d) requires disqualification where a judge's "impartiality might reasonably be questioned" because the judge "previously presided as a judge over the matter in another court." As he did not "preside" over this matter in the district court within the meaning of the disqualification rule, the rule does not require Justice Herndon's disqualification. We therefore deny Taylor's motion. Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Stiglich/Cadish/Pickering. fn1 [The Honorable Douglas W. Herndon, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this motion. And, the Honorable Abbi Silver having retired, this matter was decided by a five-justice court.] 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 81. En Banc. (SC).22-39361
01/04/2023OtherJustice Patricia Lee disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties
02/17/2023Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Change of Address for Adam Breeden. (SC)23-05104
03/09/2023Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for April 17, 2023, at 1:30 p.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)23-07241
03/22/2023MotionFiled Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument. (SC)23-08878
03/24/2023Order/ProceduralFiled Order Continuing Oral Argument. The clerk of this court shall vacate the oral argument scheduled for April 17, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. As part of their stipulation, the parties have requested to reschedule the oral argument sometime between July 3 and July 18, 2023. However, the Southern Nevada Panel's first available date to reschedule oral argument is in September. Accordingly, the parties' request to reschedule oral argument sometime between July 3 and July 18, 2023, is disapproved. The clerk of this court shall reschedule this appeal for oral argument in September. (SC)23-09106
08/04/2023Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Unavailability of Counsel for Oral Argument. (SC)23-25049
08/10/2023Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for September 13, 2023, at 10:00 am, in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)23-25856
08/29/2023Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)23-28172
09/13/2023Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before SNP panel. DH/RP/PL. (SC)
12/21/2023Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before Stiglich/Herndon/Parraguirre. Author: Herndon, J. Majority: Stiglich/Herndon/Parraguirre. 139 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 56. Nos. 83847/84492/84881. SNP23-LS/DH/RP. (SC).23-41426
12/29/2023Order/ProceduralFiled Order Correcting Opinion. This court recently issued an opinion in these appeals: Taylor v. Brill, M.D., 139 Nev., Adv. Op. 56, ___ P.3d ___ (December 21, 2023). The opinion contains errors in the counsel listings on page 2. Accordingly, the clerk of this court is directed to replace, in the advance opinion, those listings with the following: Breeden & Associates, PLLC, and Adam J. Breeden, Las Vegas, for Kimberly D. Taylor. McBride Hall and Heather S. Hall and Robert C. McBride, Las Vegas, for Keith Brill, M.D., FACOG, FACS, and Women's Health Associates of Southern Nevada-Martin PLLC. (SC)23-42262
12/29/2023MotionFiled Stipulation to Amend and Correct Written Decision Regarding Party Designations of Counsel Only. (SC)23-42330
01/12/2024Order/ProceduralFiled Order Disapproving Stipulation. The parties have filed a stipulation to correct the counsel listings in the opinion issued in this matter on December 21, 2023. On December 29, 2023, this court entered an order correcting the counsel listings in the opinion as suggested in the stipulation. Accordingly, the stipulation is disapproved as moot. (SC)24-01347
01/16/2024RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)24-01464
01/16/2024Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC)
01/26/2024RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 01/17/24. (SC)24-01464