Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 84623
Short Caption:CLARK NMSD, LLC VS. GOLDSTEINCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):69648, 79806
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A728510Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/28/2022 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/27/2022Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
04/27/2022Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)22-13277
04/27/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 7 days. (SC)22-13279
04/27/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC)22-13282
04/27/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Case Appeal Statement. (SC)22-13299
04/27/2022Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Mitchell D. Stipp. (SC)
04/27/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC)22-13327
04/27/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 7 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. (SC)22-13397
04/28/2022Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (SC)22-13501
05/12/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)22-15156
05/13/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion requesting this court to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. The motion is denied. (SC)22-15226
05/18/2022Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 5/19/22) (SC)
05/19/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC)22-15861
05/19/2022Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)22-15871
06/17/2022Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 9, 2022, at 2:00 PM. (SC)22-19331
07/19/2022Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 1, 2022, at 1:30 PM. (SC)22-22656
08/08/2022Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)22-24793
08/09/2022Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)22-24827
08/26/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)22-26828
09/06/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Renewed Motion to Dismiss. (SC)22-27733
10/26/2022Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcripts Requested. (SC)22-33768
11/03/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants opening brief and appendix due: November 21, 2022. (SC)22-34596
11/21/2022BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)22-36636
11/21/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. (SC)22-36637
11/21/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. (SC)22-36638
11/21/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. (SC)22-36639
11/21/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. (SC)22-36640
11/23/2022Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Motion denied." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 75. SNP22-JH/LS/DH. (SC).22-36847
12/05/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay or Injunction [Action Requested Before 5PM on December 9, 2022.] (SC).22-38207
12/05/2022AppendixFiled Appendix (VOLUME 1) In Support of Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay or Injunction. (SC).22-38208
12/05/2022AppendixFiled Appendix (VOLUME 2) In Support of Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay or Injunction. (SC).22-38209
12/05/2022AppendixFiled Appendix (VOLUME 3) In Support of Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay or Injunction. (SC).22-38210
12/05/2022AppendixFiled Appendix (VOLUME 4) In Support of Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay or Injunction. (SC).22-38211
12/08/2022MotionFiled Supplement to Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay. (SC)22-38631
12/15/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of NuVeda, LLC. (SC). (STRICKEN PER 12/29/22 ORDER).
12/15/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder to Relief Requested by Appellant. (SC). (STRICKEN PER 12/29/22 ORDER).
12/16/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Status Report. (relief requested by Jan. 6th) (SC).22-39525
12/16/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Status Report (Volume I). (SC).22-39531
12/16/2022AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Status Report (Volume II). (SC).22-39532
12/16/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay or Injunction and to Exceed Page Limits. (SC).22-39589
12/16/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay or Injunction. (SC).22-39590
12/16/2022AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Opposition to Motion for Injunction or Stay Pending Appeal. (SC)22-39591
12/19/2022MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay or Injunction. (SC)22-39799
12/21/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC).22-40090
12/22/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Status Report Filed December 16, 2022. (SC).22-40270
12/23/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay or Injunction and to Exceed Page Limits. (SC)22-40360
12/23/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay or Injunction. (SC)22-40367
12/29/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Stay and Injunction and Granting in Part Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. Appellant has filed an emergency motion to stay the district court post-judgment proceedings or to enjoin respondent from pursuing any collection activities against anyone besides the judgment debtor, NuVeda, LLC, including by seeking a receivership over NuVeda's former subsidiaries and affiliates. We deny the motion for a stay or injunction pending appeal. Respondent's Answering Brief due: 30 days. fn1 [Appellant appropriately filed a supplement to its motion and, later, a status report informing this court of ongoing proceedings in the district court that affect its request for relief from this court; however, we note that the documents inappropriately contain further argument on the merits of the motion. Nevertheless, we have considered them, as well as respondent's response to the status report. On December 15, 2022, NuVeda filed a notice of appearance in this appeal and a joinder to appellant's emergency motion. As NuVeda has not filed a notice of appeal and is not otherwise a party to this appeal, however, we direct the clerk of this court to strike the notice of appearance and joinder.] fn2 [Although respondent incorrectly asserts that the NRAP 27(a)(3) response deadlines do not apply to emergency motions, we grant her opposed and untimely motion for an extension of time to file the response; her opposed request to exceed the page limit is also granted, as the proposed extra pages promote understanding of the issues presented in the motion. Thus, the response and accompanying appendix filed on December 16, 2022, are permitted, and we decline appellant's request to strike them.] (SC).22-40900
01/09/2023MotionFiled Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal. (SC).23-00631
01/09/2023Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Stipulated Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, this appeal is dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. (SC)23-00698