Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/13/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
09/13/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
09/13/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-26358
|
09/15/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/15/21). (SC) | | 21-26704
|
09/15/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-26717
|
09/17/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Jones & LoBello. Check no. 1122. (SC) | | |
09/17/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-26971
|
09/17/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC) | | 21-27035
|
09/22/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 21-27359
|
09/23/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-27511
|
10/06/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/14/20, 02/21/20, 03/05/21/03/12/21 and 04/02/21. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. (SC) | | 21-28634
|
10/07/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's docketing statement due: October 22, 2021. (SC) | | 21-28774
|
10/21/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-30347
|
10/28/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent's Response to Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-31159
|
11/05/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/14/20, 2/21/20, 3/5/21, 3/12/21, and 4/2/21. (SC) | | 21-31894
|
12/21/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 5, 2022. (SC) | | 21-36412
|
01/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time for Appellant to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 22-00215
|
01/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until January 26, 2022, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 22-00378
|
01/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Emergency Motion For Extension Of Time For Appellant To File Opening Brief And Appendix (Second Request). (SC) | | 22-01756
|
01/18/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order to Extend Briefing Schedule. (SC) | | 22-01757
|
01/21/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant shall have until February 25, 2022, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 22-02185
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-05870
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 22-05872
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 22-05874
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 22-05878
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 22-05880
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 22-05879
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 22-05886
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8. (SC) | | 22-05890
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 9. (SC) | | 22-05892
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 10. (SC) | | 22-05893
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 11. (SC) | | 22-05895
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 12. (SC) | | 22-05896
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 13. (SC) | | 22-05897
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 14. (SC) | | 22-05899
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 15. (SC) | | 22-05900
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 16. (SC) | | 22-05901
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 17. (SC) | | 22-05902
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 18. (SC) | | 22-05903
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 19. (SC) | | 22-05904
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 20. (SC) | | 22-05905
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 21. (SC) | | 22-05906
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 22. (SC) | | 22-05908
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 23. (SC) | | 22-05910
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 24. (SC) | | 22-05914
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 25. (SC) | | 22-05915
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 26. (SC) | | 22-05920
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 27. (SC) | | 22-05925
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 28. (SC) | | 22-05929
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 29. (SC) | | 22-05930
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 30. (SC) | | 22-05932
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 31. (SC) | | 22-05931
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 32. (SC) | | 22-05934
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 33. (SC) | | 22-05935
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 34. (SC) | | 22-05936
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 35. (SC) | | 22-05937
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 36. (SC) | | 22-05938
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 37. (SC) | | 22-05939
|
02/23/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 22. (SC) | | 22-05943
|
02/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Amended Appendix Index - Chronological and Alphabetical. (SC) | | 22-06111
|
02/25/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-06241
|
02/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix Index Vol XXXVIII. (SC) | | 22-06243
|
02/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Appendix Index Vol XXXIX. (SC) | | 22-06244
|
03/21/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: April 11, 2022. (SC) | | 22-08891
|
04/11/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-11458
|
05/10/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: May 25, 2022. (SC) | | 22-14858
|
05/25/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Answering Brief.) (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 5/26/22) (SC) | | |
05/26/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 22-16710
|
05/26/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (Reply to Respondent's Answering Brief.) (SC) | | 22-16735
|
05/26/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
06/29/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-20437
|
06/29/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
06/29/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
09/22/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-29766
|
09/22/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
10/06/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Reissue Order as an Opinion. (COA) | | 22-31626
|
10/07/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Jones and LoBello. E-Payment Ref. no. 22100740160064. (COA) | | |
10/07/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing of Arguments Under Michoff, Hay and Nolm. (COA) | | 22-31715
|
12/22/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Motion to Publish and Petition for Rehearing. Having considered both motions, we conclude that neither publication nor rehearing is warranted. "Rehearing Denied." See NRAP36(f); NRAP 40(c). (COA) | | 22-40126
|
01/17/2023 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
01/17/2023 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (COA) | | |
01/17/2023 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
01/17/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-01460
|
01/17/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
01/27/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on January 18, 2022. (SC) | | 23-01460
|