Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/04/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for appeal. (SC) | | |
04/04/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 23-10271
|
04/04/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-10274
|
04/04/2023 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Joshua P. Gilmore. (SC) | | |
04/04/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 23-10328
|
04/05/2023 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief: (SC). | | 23-10350
|
04/10/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed SEALED District Court Minutes - 03/31/23. (SC) | | |
04/10/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed SEALED District Court Minutes - 04/03/23. (SC) | | |
04/12/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's (Gordon Ramsay) Notice of Appearance for Therese M. Shanks. (SC) | | 23-11221
|
04/19/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellants' Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 23-12114
|
04/25/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-12876
|
04/25/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix of Exhibits to Docketing Statement Vols. 1 of 3. (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL WTIH JOSHUA GILMORE) (SC) | | |
04/25/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix of Exhibits to Docketing Statement Vols. 2 of 3. (SC) | | 23-12880
|
04/25/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix of Exhibits to Docketing Statement Vols. 3 of 3. (SC) | | 23-12881
|
04/25/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix of Exhibits to Docketing Statement Vols. 1 of 3 (SC) | | 23-12941
|
08/02/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 23-24876
|
08/14/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until September 15, 2023, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 23-26308
|
09/15/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Redact Opening Brief and Seal Opening Brief with Confidential Volumes of the Appellants' Appendix for Portions of Vols. 8, 15, 19, 31, 32, 42, 51 and Whole Vols. 9-14, 16-18, 21-30, 43-46, and 51. (SC) | | 23-30193
|
09/15/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellants' (REDACTED) Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-30197
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-30200
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 23-30202
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 23-30203
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 4. (SC) | | 23-30204
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 5. (SC) | | 23-30205
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 6. (SC) | | 23-30209
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 7. (SC) | | 23-30211
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Portions of Vol. 8. (SC) | | 23-30212
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Portions of Vol. 15. (SC) | | 23-30214
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Portions of Vol. 19. (SC) | | 23-30216
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 20. (SC) | | 23-30217
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Portions of Vol. 31. (SC) | | 23-30219
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Portions of Vol. 32. (SC) | | 23-30221
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 33. (SC) | | 23-30223
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 34. (SC) | | 23-30227
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 35. (SC) | | 23-30229
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 36. (SC) | | 23-30232
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 37. (SC) | | 23-30235
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 38. (SC) | | 23-30237
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 39. (SC) | | 23-30239
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 40. (SC) | | 23-30240
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 41. (SC) | | 23-30242
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Portions of Vol. 42. (SC) | | 23-30243
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 47. (SC) | | 23-30246
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 48. (SC) | | 23-30247
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 49. (SC) | | 23-30248
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 50. (SC) | | 23-30249
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Portions of Vol. 51. (SC) | | 23-30250
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 52. (SC) | | 23-30251
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 53. (SC) | | 23-30252
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 54. (SC) | | 23-30253
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 55. (SC) | | 23-30254
|
09/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 56. (SC) | | 23-30255
|
09/29/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' unopposed motion for leave to file a redacted opening brief and to file portions of the appendix under seal is granted. Appellants' redacted opening brief was filed on September 15, 2023. The clerk shall file the unredacted opening brief received on September 18, 2023, under seal. The clerk shall file the portions of the appendix received on September 18, 2023, under seal. Respondents shall have until October 16, 2023, to file and serve their answering briefs. (SC) | | 23-31961
|
09/29/2023 | Brief | Filed Confidential Opening Brief. (SEALED). (SC) | | |
09/29/2023 | Appendix | Filed Confidential Appendix to Opening Brief - Vols. 8-19, 21-32, 42-46, and 51. (SEALED). (SC) | | |
10/06/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondents' (Gordon Ramsay and PHWLV, LLC) Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-32799
|
10/16/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Respondent's answering brief due: November 15, 2023. (SC) | | 23-33665
|
11/15/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) Redacted Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-37240
|
11/15/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) Motion to Redact Answering Brief and Seal Confidential Appendix - Volumes 4-11. (SC) | | 23-37241
|
11/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) Supplemental Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-37242
|
11/15/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's (Gordon Ramsay) Motion to Redact Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-37243
|
11/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) Supplemental Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 23-37244
|
11/15/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) Supplemental Appendix to Answering Brief - Vol. 3. (SC) | | 23-37245
|
11/15/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Gordon Ramsay) Redacted Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-37246
|
12/01/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Respondent Gordon Ramsay's motion for leave to file a redacted answering brief is granted. The redacted brief was filed on November 15, 2023. The clerk shall file the unredacted answering brief received on November 16, 2023, under seal. Respondent PHWLV, LLC's motion for leave to file a redacted answering brief and to file certain volumes of its appendix under seal is also granted. The redacted answering brief was filed on November 15, 2023. The clerk shall file the unredacted answering brief and volumes 4-11 of PHWLV's appendix, both received on November 27, 2023, under seal. Appellants shall have until December 15, 2023, to file and serve any reply brief. (SC) | | 23-39024
|
12/01/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Gordon Ramsay) SEALED Confidential Answering Brief. (SC) | | |
12/01/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) (SEALED) Answering Brief. (SC) | | |
12/01/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's (PHWLV, LLC) (SEALED) Appendix to the Answering Brief - Vols. 4-11. (SC) | | |
12/11/2023 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-40058
|
12/11/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-40100
|
01/16/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Redact Reply Brief. (SC) | | 24-01590
|
01/16/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief - Redacted. (SC) | | 24-01628
|
01/26/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' unopposed motion for leave to file a redacted reply brief is granted. The redacted reply brief was filed on January 16, 2024. The clerk shall file the unredacted reply brief received on January 19, 2024, under seal. (SC) | | 24-03135
|
01/26/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellants' (SEALED) Reply Brief. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER 1/26/24 ORDER) (SC) | | |
01/26/2024 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |