Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83723
Short Caption:SEIBEL VS. DIST. CT. (DESERT PALACE, INC.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):76118, 82448, 83071, 84934
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A751759, A760537Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/14/2022 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Courtroom
Submission Date:09/14/2022How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/05/2021Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Dennis L. Kennedy. (SC)
11/05/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief (Redacted). (SC)21-31820
11/05/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)21-31827
11/05/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)21-31822
11/05/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3. (SC)21-31823
11/05/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4. (SC)21-31824
11/05/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5. (SC)21-31825
11/05/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6. (SC)21-31826
11/05/2021MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion to Redact Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief and to Seal Volumes 7 to 17 of the Appendix Thereto. (SC)21-31821
11/05/2021MotionFiled Petitioners' Emergency Motion for a Stay of District Court Proceedings. (SC)21-31828
11/09/2021MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest's Response to Petitioners' Emergency Motion for a Stay of District Court Proceedings. (SC)21-32267
11/10/2021MotionFiled Petitioners' Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings. (SC)21-32376
11/10/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer and Granting Stay. Real party in interest's answer due: 28 days. Petitioners shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. We grant the motion in part and stay the district court's order compelling disclosure pending further order of this court. fn1 [Petitioners' motion for leave to file a redacted petition and to file the unredacted petition under seal, along with several of the appendix volumes, based on district court protection orders in the underlying case, is granted. SRCR 3(4)(b) & 7. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the unredacted petition and volumes 7 through 17 of the appendix, all of which were provisionally received in this court on November 5, 2021.] NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC)21-32408
11/10/2021Petition/WritFiled Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief (SEALED).
11/10/2021AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ, Vols. 7-17 (SEALED).
11/23/2021MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion Regarding the District Court's August 19, 2021, Minute Order. (SC)21-33728
11/30/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real parties in interests' response to petitioners' motion regarding the district court's August 19, 2021, minute order due: December 14, 2021. (SC)21-34174
12/08/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real party in interest's answer to writ petition due: December 22, 2021. (SC)21-34965
12/14/2021MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest's Response to Petitioners' Motion Regarding the District Court's August 19, 2021 Minute Order. (SC)21-35669
12/20/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. (SC)21-36251
12/20/2021MotionFiled Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (SC)21-36259
12/21/2021MotionFiled Petitioners' Reply in Support of Their Motion Regarding the District Court's August 19, 2021, Minute Order. (SC)21-36375
12/28/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Answer and Denying Motion Regarding District Court Minutes. Real parties in interest shall have until January 5, 2022, to file and serve the answer. Petitioners have moved to preclude, pending a decision on the writ petition, real parties in interest from using the district court's August 19, 2021, minutes, Having considered the parties' arguments, we deny the motion; real parties in interest may use the August minutes for purposes of responding to this petition, as petitioners placed the minutes at issue in the petition.21-36768
01/05/2022Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. (Redacted) (SC)22-00483
01/05/2022AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief Real Parties in Interest's Supplemental Appendix Volume 1 of 8. (SC)22-00484
01/05/2022AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief Real Parties in Interest's Supplemental Appendix Volume 2 of 8. (SC)22-00485
01/05/2022AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief Real Parties in Interest's Supplemental Appendix Volume 3 of 8. (SC)22-00486
01/05/2022MotionFiled Motion to Redact Real Parties in Interests' Answer and Seal Appendix Volumes IV-VIII Thereto. (SC)22-00487
01/19/2022MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Petitioners' Reply Brief (First Request). (SC)22-01873
01/21/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to File Redacted Answer and to Seal Appendix Volumes IV-VIII, and Approving Stipulation of Time. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the unredacted answer and volumes IV through VIII of the appendix to the answer, all of which were provisionally received in this court on January 10, 2022. Petitioners shall have until February 16, 2022, to file and serve the reply. (SC)22-02158
01/21/2022Petition/WritFiled SEALED Unredacted Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. (SC)
01/21/2022AppendixFiled SEALED Appendix to the Answer, Volumes IV through VIII . (SC)
02/16/2022MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion to Submit Privileged Documents Under Seal for an In Camera Review By This Court. (SC)22-05192
02/16/2022MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion to Redact Reply in Support of Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. (SC)22-05193
02/16/2022Petition/WritFiled Reply to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. (Redacted) (SC)22-05196
02/23/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Real parties in interest shall have until March 9, 2022, to file and serve oppositions to petitioners' motion to submit privileged documents under seal for an in camera review by this court, and petitioners' motion to redact reply in support of petition for extraordinary writ relief. (SC)22-05859
03/09/2022MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest's Response to Petitioners' Motion to Submit Privileged Documents under Seal for an In Camera Review by This Court and Countermotion to Strike Footnote 2 and Pages 20 to 22 of Petitioners' Reply Brief. (Redacted) (SC)22-07608
03/09/2022MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to Redact Response to Petitioners' Motion to Submit Privileged Documents under Seal for an In Camera Review by This Court and Countermotion to Strike Fn. 2 and Pages 20 to 22 of Petitioners' Reply Brief. (SC)22-07613
03/16/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Petitioners shall have until March 30, 2022, to file and serve the reply to real parties in interest's response to petitioners' motion filed on February 16, 2022. Petitioners shall also have until March 30, 2022, to file and serve the opposition to real parties in interest's countermotion filed on March 9, 2022. (SC)22-08321
03/30/2022MotionFiled Petitioners' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Submit Privileged Documents Under Seal for an In Camera Review by this Court; and Opposition to Real Parties in Interest's Countermotion to Strike. (SC)22-09923
04/05/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to File Redacted Reply and Redacted Response/Countermotion and Denying Countermotion to Strike Portions of Reply. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the unredacted reply and response/countermotion, which were provisionally received in this court on February 16 and March 14, 2022, respectively. Real parties in interest's countermotion to strike footnote 2 and pages 20-22 of the reply is denied. This court defers ruling on the motion to submit privileged documents under seal for in camera review. (SC)22-10551
04/05/2022Petition/WritFiled Unredacted Reply to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief (Sealed). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 4/5/22). (SC)
04/05/2022MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest's Response to Petitioners' Motion to Submit Privileged Documents under Seal for an In Camera Review by This Court and Countermotion to Strike Footnote 2 and Pages 20 to 22 of Petitioners' Reply Brief. (Un-Redacted). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 4/5/22). (SC)
05/11/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petitioners filed a motion to submit privileged documents under seal for in camera review by this court. The motion is granted. Petitioners shall have 7 days from the date of this order to submit the privileged documents to the clerk of this court. (SC)22-14999
05/19/2022MotionFiled Petitioners' Motion to Extend Time to Submit Privileged Documents for In Camera Review. (SC)22-15914
05/23/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion filed by petitioners for an extension of time to file the documents for in camera review is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the documents received on May 20, 2022, under seal. (SC)22-16288
05/23/2022ExhibitFiled Privileged Documents Under Seal for In Camera Review. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER FILED 5/23/22). (SC)
07/12/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for September 14, 2022, at 11:30 a.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)22-21812
08/31/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)22-27380
09/07/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument. (SC)22-28001
09/14/2022Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/DH. (SC).
11/23/2022Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 73. SNP22-JH/LS/DH. (SC).22-36842
12/19/2022Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
12/19/2022RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. (SC)22-39653