Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/27/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for appeal. (SC) | | |
04/27/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 23-13117
|
04/27/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-13121
|
04/27/2023 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Joshua P. Gilmore. (SC) | | |
04/27/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 23-13165
|
04/28/2023 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 23-13328
|
05/01/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed (SEALED) Confidential Minutes from District Court Clerk. (SC) | | |
05/12/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellants' Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 23-15033
|
05/18/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-15731
|
05/18/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix of Exhibits to Docketing Statement - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 23-15732
|
05/18/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix of Exhibits to Docketing Statement - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 23-15733
|
08/24/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 23-27693
|
08/25/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (SC) | | 23-27806
|
09/27/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Redact Opening Brief and Seal Confidential Volumes of Appellants' Appendix.(SC) | | 23-31669
|
09/27/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief (Redacted)(SC) | | 23-31670
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1 (SC) | | 23-31674
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol.2(SC) | | 23-31675
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 3 (SC) | | 23-31676
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol.4 (SC) | | 23-31677
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol.5 (SC) | | 23-31678
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol.6 (SC) | | 23-31679
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol.7 (SC) | | 23-31680
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 8 (SC) | | 23-31681
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 9 (SC) | | 23-31682
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol.10 (SC) | | 23-31684
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol.12 (SC) | | 23-31685
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol.13 (SC) | | 23-31692
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 20 (SC) | | 23-31693
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 21 (SC) | | 23-31696
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 31 (SC) | | 23-31699
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 32 (SC) | | 23-31701
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 33 (SC) | | 23-31702
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 34 (SC) | | 23-31703
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 35 (SC) | | 23-31707
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 37 (SC) | | 23-31708
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 38 (SC) | | 23-31709
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol.39 (SC) | | 23-31710
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 41 (SC) | | 23-31711
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 42 (SC) | | 23-31712
|
09/27/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 43 (SC) | | 23-31714
|
10/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants have filed an unopposed motion for leave to file a redacted opening brief and to file portions of the appendix under seal. The motion is granted. The redacted opening brief was filed on September 27, 2023, and the clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and portions of the appendix received on September 29, 2023, under seal. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an answering brief. (SC) | | 23-33521
|
10/13/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Opening Brief. (SC) | | |
10/13/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 4, 5, 7, 11-20, and 22-41. (SC) | | |
11/09/2023 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief(Due date 12-13-23)(SC) | | 23-36587
|
11/13/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief.(Due date 12-13-23)(SC) | | 23-36658
|
12/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answering Brief (Second Request)(SC) | | 23-40476
|
12/18/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until December 21, 2023, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 23-40969
|
12/21/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief(SC) | | 23-41565
|
12/21/2023 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Appendix(SC) | | 23-41566
|
12/21/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Redact Respondents' Answering Brief(SC) | | 23-41567
|
01/05/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's unopposed motion for leave to file a redacted answering brief is granted. The redacted answering brief was filed on December 21, 2023. The clerk shall file the answering brief received on December 27, 2023, under seal. Appellants shall have until January 26, 2024, to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 24-00531
|
01/05/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief (SEALED). (SC) | | |
01/25/2024 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief(due date 02-26-2024)(SC) | | 24-02943
|
01/25/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved.(Reply Brief due date: 02-26-2024(SC) | | 24-02977
|
02/26/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Redact Reply Brief(SC) | | 24-06822
|
02/26/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief (Redacted)(SC) | | 24-06823
|
03/08/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' motion for leave to file a redacted reply brief is granted. SRCR 7. The redacted reply brief was filed on February 26, 2024. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on February 28, 2024, under seal. (SC) | | 24-08408
|
03/08/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief Under Seal (SEALED). (SC) | | |
03/08/2024 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |