Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/17/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Fennemore Craig P.C. Check No. 4782393. (SC) | | |
07/17/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed SEALED Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.). (SC) | | |
07/17/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 23-22752
|
07/18/2023 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Gabrielle Jeanne Carr. (SC) | | 23-22906
|
07/20/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Debbie Leonard. (SC) | | 23-23233
|
07/20/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. Due to a conflict with this assigned Settlement Judge - Please reassign this case to another Settlement Judge. (SC) | | 23-23299
|
07/21/2023 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC) | | 23-23334
|
07/21/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | |
07/21/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal (SEALED). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (SC) | | |
07/21/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee Cross-Appeal. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-23420
|
07/21/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pursuant to the notice of appearance filed on July 20, 2023, the clerk of this court shall add attorney Debbie Leonard of Leonard Law, PC as counsel for respondent/cross-appellant. (SC) | | 23-23453
|
07/21/2023 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Shawn B. Meador. (SC) | | |
08/02/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 23-24868
|
08/03/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 23-24901
|
08/03/2023 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 23-24974
|
08/04/2023 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant/Cross-Respondent(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant (Respondent) shall have 30 days from service of appellant's opening brief to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of respondent's combined brief to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Finally, respondent shall have 14 days from service of appellant's combined brief to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 23-25143
|
08/07/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Proof of Service on Settlement Judge for the No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 23-25233
|
08/09/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Seal Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-25762
|
08/10/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Seal Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-25906
|
08/10/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Response to Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-25909
|
08/11/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement (Lynda Hascheff) Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-26109
|
08/17/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/28/2022. To Court Reporter: Litigation Services. (SC) | | 23-26923
|
08/18/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Seal Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-27052
|
08/22/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant/cross-respondent has filed a motion to seal the docketing statement. Respondent/cross-appellant opposes the motion and appellant/cross-respondent has replied. Within the reply, appellant/cross-respondent withdraws the motion. Accordingly, this court will take no action on the motion to seal. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on August 9, 2023, on this court's public docket. (SC) | | 23-27383
|
08/22/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (FILED PER 8/22/23 ORDER) (SC) | | 23-27389
|
10/31/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/cross-respondent's opening brief and appendix due: November 16, 2023. (SC) | | 23-35359
|
11/16/2023 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Opening Brief.(STRICKEN PER 1/12/24 ORDER) (SC) | | |
11/16/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1(SC) | | 23-37344
|
11/16/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2 (SC) | | 23-37345
|
11/16/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3(SC) | | 23-37346
|
11/16/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4(SC) | | 23-37347
|
11/16/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5(SC) | | 23-37348
|
11/16/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6(SC) | | 23-37349
|
11/16/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 8(SC) | | 23-37350
|
11/16/2023 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7(SC) | | 23-37351
|
11/16/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Motion to Seal Portions of Appellant's Appendix.(SC) | | 23-37352
|
11/16/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Motion Take Judicial Notice.(SC) | | 23-37353
|
11/21/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent/cross-appellant's response to appellant/cross-respondent's motions filed on November 16, 2023 due: December 11, 2023. (SC) | | 23-37961
|
12/11/2023 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time for Respondent/Cross-Appellant to File Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal and For Appellant/Cross-Respondent to File Replies to Responses to Motions to Take Judicial Notice and to Seal Portions of Appellant's Appendix.(SC) | | 23-40063
|
12/11/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Partial Opposition to Motion to File Portions of Appellant's Appendix Under Seal.(SC) | | 23-40085
|
12/11/2023 | Motion | Filed Motion Respondent/Cross-Appellant for Excess Page Limit for Opposition to Motion to Take Judicial Notice.(SC) | | 23-40086
|
12/11/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent/ Cross-Appellant Opposition to Motion to Take Judicial Notice.(SC) | | 23-40091
|
12/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent/cross-appellant has filed a motion for leave to file an opposition to the motion for judicial notice that exceeds the permissible page limitation. The motion is granted. The opposition was filed on December 11, 2023. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve any reply. The parties have also filed a stipulation to extend the deadlines to file various documents in this matter. The stipulation is treated as a motion filed by counsel for respondent/cross-appellant. The motion for an extension of time for respondent/cross-appellant to file the answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal is granted. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until January 17, 2024, to file and serve the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. The motion for an extension of time for appellant/cross-respondent to file replies in support of his pending motions is denied because the motion is not signed by counsel for appellant/cross-respondent and respondent/cross-appellant cannot seek relief on behalf of appellant/cross-respondent. (SC) | | 23-40506
|
12/14/2023 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time for Appellant/Cross -Respondent to File Replies to Responses to Motions to Take Judicial Notice and To Seal Portions of Appellant's Appendix. (SC) | | 23-40609
|
12/20/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. The parties' December 14, 2023, stipulation for an extension of time is approved. NRAP 26(b)(2). Appellant/cross-respondent shall have until January 8, 2024, to file and serve any replies in support of his motion for judicial notice and motion to seal portions of the appendix. (SC) | | 23-41310
|
01/08/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Reply Motion to Seal Portion of Appellant's Appendix.(SC) | | 24-00673
|
01/08/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Appellant, Reply in Support of Motion to Take Judicial Notice.(SC) | | 24-00740
|
01/12/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. Appellant/cross-respondent (appellant) has filed a motion to take judicial notice of several documents which were not filed in the district court and which appellant included in the appendix prior to obtaining leave of this court. Respondent/cross-appellant (respondent) opposes the motion and moves to strike the appendix and the opening brief and impose sanctions on appellant for the improper inclusion of documents in the appendix. Appellant has replied. Initially, appellant's assertion that the documents he seeks judicial notice of were properly included in the appendix without prior leave of this court lacks merit. As appellant appears to concede, the documents were not part of the record on appeal. All documents in the appendix must bear the district court file-stamp, demonstrating that they were filed in the district court and are part of the record on appeal. Accordingly, the motion is denied. Respondent's motion to strike the opening brief and appendix is granted to the following extent. The clerk shall strike the opening brief and appendix filed on November 16, 2023. This court declines to impose sanctions on appellant at this time. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve (1) an amended appendix that does not include any documents that are not part of the record on appeal and (2) an amended opening brief that does not cite to any such documents. Appellant has also filed a motion for leave to file documents regarding billing invoices under seal. Appellant has not provided this court with copies of the documents he wishes to file under seal. Accordingly, the motion is denied without prejudice. Appellant may file a renewed motion within 7 days of the date of this order, if deemed warranted. Any renewed motion must have copies of the documents appellant wishes to file under seal attached. The motion and attached documents may be transmitted to this court via mail. The documents will be kept confidential pending resolution of the motion. This court notes that appellant's motion requests the sealing of certain documents that appear to have been filed on the public docket in the district court and are included in the appendix appellant filed on this court's public docket. Moreover, notations included in the appendix indicate that appellant seeks to seal fewer pages than requested in the motion. Appellant should ensure that any renewed motion to seal is consistent with any notations regarding sealed documents in the amended appendix. (SC) | | 24-01304
|
01/22/2024 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/cross-respondent's motion to seal due: February 2, 2024. (SC) | | 24-02329
|
01/26/2024 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Seal Portions of Appellant's Appendix.(SC) | | 24-03137
|
01/26/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Amended Opening Brief (SC) | | 24-03139
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief Volume 1.(SC) | | 24-03140
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief Volume 2 (SC) | | 24-03142
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief Volume 3 (SC) | | 24-03143
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief Volume 4 (SC) | | 24-03144
|
01/26/2024 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Appellant's Opening Brief Volume 5 (SC) | | 24-03146
|
01/26/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 7 days.(Appendices 1-5)(SC) | | 24-03253
|
01/29/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice Certificate of Service for Volumes 1 through 5(SC) | | 24-03361
|
02/12/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The parties have filed a stipulation to file certain documents in the appendix under seal. The stipulation is treated as a joint motion and granted as such. The clerk shall detach exhibits 2 and 4 from the documents received on January 31, 2024, and file them under seal. The clerk shall return unfiled the remainder of the documents, which are duplicates of the stipulation and unsealed district court orders provided as exhibits to the stipulation. (SC) | | 24-05148
|
02/12/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's (SEALED) Portions of Appendix to Opening Brief. Exhibits 2 and 4. (SC) | | |
02/14/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal (SC) | | 24-05449
|
03/15/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent Combined Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal(SC) | | 24-09321
|
03/29/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal (SC) | | 24-11265
|
03/29/2024 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening(SC) | | |
04/29/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 24-14837
|
04/29/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |