Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/15/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Kent Law P.L.L.C. Check no. 6481. (SC) | | |
03/15/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SEALED) (SC) | | |
03/15/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 21-07451
|
03/16/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Debbie Leonard in the Place and Stead of Shawn B. Meador for Respondent. (SC) | | 21-07616
|
03/16/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Debbie Leonard for Respondent. (SC) | | 21-07628
|
03/16/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Constance Eisenberg stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/21/20. (SC) | | 21-07636
|
03/17/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Respondent has filed a substitution of counsel. The clerk of this court shall add attorney Debbie A. Leonard, Esq. of Leonard Law, PC in place and stead of attorney Shawn B. Meador, Esq. of Woodburn & Wedge as counsel for respondent. (SC) | | 21-07703
|
03/17/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Melissa Mangiaracina. (SC) | | 21-07732
|
03/24/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | |
03/24/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
03/24/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant) (SC) | | 21-08465
|
03/24/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Debbie A. Leonard. (SC) | | |
04/05/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeal. (SC) | | 21-09788
|
04/07/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-10026
|
04/08/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Response to Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-10180
|
04/08/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-10183
|
04/15/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 4, 2021, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 21-10875
|
06/10/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | |
06/10/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-16674
|
06/15/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-17153
|
06/16/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-17412
|
07/27/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Substitution of Attorney Law Firm. (SC) | | 21-21732
|
09/10/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/cross-respondent's opening brief and appendix due: September 27, 2021. (SC) | | 21-26299
|
09/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/18/2021). (SC) | | |
09/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/18/2021). (SC) | | |
09/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/18/2021). (SC) | | |
09/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/18/2021). (SC) | | |
09/27/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/18/2021). (SC) | | |
09/30/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Appendix for Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/18/2021). (SC) | | |
09/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Seal Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-28131
|
09/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Seal Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-28093
|
09/30/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Appendix for Opening Brief. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 10/18/2021). (SC) | | |
10/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent has filed an unopposed motion to seal the opening brief and appendix under SRCR 3(4)(e) and (h). The motion is denied without prejudice. The clerk shall strike the opening brief and appendix filed on September 27, 2021, and the erratas filed on September 30, 2021. Appellant/cross-respondent may file a renewed motion to seal, or a motion to file certain documents subject to redaction, within 7 days of the date of this order. If appellant/cross-respondent will not be filing a motion to seal or redact, he shall file the opening brief and appendix within 7 days of the date of this order. (SC) | | 21-29821
|
10/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Seal Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-30757
|
11/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Seal Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-31272
|
11/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Seal. (SC) | | 21-32113
|
11/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall reject the opening brief and appendix received on October 26, 2021. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve any second renewed motion to seal or redact the opening brief and appendix. If appellant will not be filing a motion to seal or redact, he shall file the opening brief and appendix within 7 days of the date of this order. (SC) | | 21-32729
|
11/19/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-33380
|
11/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol 1. (SC) | | 21-33384
|
11/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol 2. (SC) | | 21-33386
|
11/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol 3. (SC) | | 21-33387
|
11/19/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief, Vol 4. (SC) | | 21-33388
|
12/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-35781
|
12/15/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-35784
|
01/12/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 22-01244
|
01/12/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief. Due date February 14, 2022. (SC) | | 22-01247
|
02/14/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 22-04975
|
02/24/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal due: March 14, 2022. (SC) | | 22-06044
|
03/07/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 22-07234
|
03/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
04/08/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-10970
|
04/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
06/29/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
07/25/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals {SC} | | |
07/25/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. {SC} | | 22-23279
|
07/25/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed {SC} | | |
08/16/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 28, 2022. (SC) | | 22-23279
|