Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/03/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 09-18873
|
08/03/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
08/03/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/1/05; 7/11/05; 7/12/05; 7/15/05; 8/3/05; 8/9/05; 8/15/05; 8/19/05; 9/22/05; 10/19/05; 1/19/06; 2/2/06; 3/21/06; 8/31/06; 9/1/06; 9/11/06; 6/25/07; 8/20/07; 8/28/07; 8/30/07; 1/1/08; 1/8/08; 1/11/08; 2/4/08; 2/11/08; 2/7/08; 3/27/08; 4/1/08; 4/17/08; 5/1/08; 5/5/08; 6/17/08; 7/3/08; 7/22/08; 10/30/08; 12/19/08; 12/29/08; 1/16/09; 1/22/09; 1/27/09; 2/2/09; 2/9/09; 2/17/09; 5/1/09; 6/29/09; and 6/23/09 To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. Filed in District Court on July 31, 2009. | | 09-18874
|
08/06/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 09-19237
|
08/28/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 09-21068
|
12/14/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | | 09-30192
|
12/16/2009 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. with attachments from John L. Arrascada in response to notice filed 12/14/09. | | 09-30555
|
12/17/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 29, 2010. | | 09-30656
|
12/24/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (90 days). | | 09-31256
|
12/29/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 29, 2010. | | 09-31417
|
01/06/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Janie Olsen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/26/07, 2/05/08, 2/11/08, 7/22/08, 1/16/09, 1/17/09, 1/22/09, 1/27/09, 1/28/09, 1/29/09, 1/30/09, 2/02/09, 2/03/09, 2/04/09, 2/05/09, 2/06/09, 2/09/09, 2/10/09, 2/11/09, 2/12/09, and 5/01/09. | | 10-00303
|
04/21/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s and Luis Hildalgo, III's Joint Motion for a Second Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. Nos. 54209/54272. | | 10-10443
|
05/03/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motions. Opening Briefs and Appendices due: June 28, 2010. Nos. 54209/54272. | | 10-11209
|
06/24/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s and Luis Hidalgo, III's Joint Motion for a Third Extension of Time to File Opening Brief | | 10-16582
|
07/02/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening brief and appendix due August 27, 2010. | | 10-17330
|
08/27/2010 | Motion | Filed Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s and Luis Hidalgo, III's Joint Motion for a Fourth Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. Nos. 54209/54272. | | 10-22110
|
10/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Briefs and Appendix due: November 29, 2010. Nos. 54209/54272. | | 10-25544
|
11/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s and Luis Hidalgo III's Joint Motion for a Fifth Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 10-30778
|
12/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Opening Briefs and Appendices due: January 13, 2011. Nos. 54209/54272. | | 10-33082
|
01/12/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s and Luis Hidalgo, III's Joint Motion for a Sxith Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 11-01229
|
01/14/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellants' Opening Briefs and Appendices due: February 3, 2011. Nos. 54209/54272. | | 11-01484
|
02/03/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. (50) pages. | | 11-03516
|
02/03/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief. 50 pages granted. | | 11-03519
|
02/03/2011 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 11-03520
|
02/03/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1. | | 11-03540
|
02/03/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2. | | 11-03543
|
02/03/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 3. | | 11-03546
|
02/03/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 4. | | 11-03550
|
02/04/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 5. | | 11-03558
|
02/04/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 6. | | 11-03562
|
02/04/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 7. | | 11-03563
|
02/04/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 8. | | 11-03564
|
02/04/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 9. | | 11-03565
|
02/04/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 10. | | 11-03566
|
02/04/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 11. | | 11-03567
|
03/07/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extnesion of Time to file the Answering Brief. (60) days. | | 11-06866
|
03/07/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: May 6, 2011. | | 11-07028
|
05/06/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extnesion of Time Second Request to file the Answering Brief. (30) days. | | 11-13421
|
05/13/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: June 6, 2011. | | 11-14272
|
06/06/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Third Request) - Answering Brief. | | 11-16452
|
06/10/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answering brief due: July 6, 2011. | | 11-17239
|
06/28/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6. | | 11-19260
|
07/06/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Fourth Request - Answering Brief). | | 11-20085
|
07/07/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: July 12, 2011. | | 11-20316
|
07/12/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File 46 Page Answering Brief. | | 11-20815
|
07/12/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Motion Approved. Answering Brief - 46 pages granted. | | 11-20817
|
07/12/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 11-20821
|
07/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Vol. 1. | | 11-20822
|
07/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Vol. 2. | | 11-20827
|
07/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Vol. 3. | | 11-20828
|
07/12/2011 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix Vol. 4. | | 11-20829
|
08/08/2011 | Motion | Filed Luis Hidalgo III Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief, First Request. | | 11-23909
|
08/09/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Reply Brief due: October 10, 2011. | | 11-24074
|
10/10/2011 | Motion | Filed Luis A. Hidalgo, III's Motion for Permission to File a Reply Brief in Excess of 15 pages. | | 11-31011
|
10/13/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief recevied via E-Flex on October 11, 2011. | | 11-31602
|
10/13/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 11-31604
|
10/13/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
03/01/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, April 11, 2012 @ 10:00 a.m. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 12-06600
|
03/26/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 12-09504
|
04/11/2012 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP12-MD/JG/RP | | |
06/21/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP12-MD/MG/RP | | 12-19537
|
07/10/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | | 12-21576
|
07/27/2012 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 12-23762
|
08/13/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to File Petition for En Banc Review in excess of 10 pages. | | 12-25313
|
08/20/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Luis A. Hidalgo, III's Motion for Permission to File a Petition for En Banc Reconsideration in Excess of 10 Pages. | | 12-26088
|
08/23/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the petition for en banc reconsideration received via E-Flex on August 13, 2012. | | 12-26543
|
08/23/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 12-26547
|
09/19/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent shall 15 days to file an answer to the petition. | | 12-29631
|
10/02/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 12-31094
|
10/11/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File A Reply to Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 12-32224
|
10/12/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply received via E-Flex on October 11, 2012. | | 12-32475
|
10/12/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Reply to Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration Pursuant to NRAP 40. | | 12-32476
|
11/13/2012 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." Cherry, C.J., with whom, Saitta, J., agrees, dissenting. EN BANC | | 12-35761
|
12/03/2012 | Motion | Filed Emergency Motion to Stay Remittur. | | 12-38076
|
12/07/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Staying Remittitur. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until April 9, 2013. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by April 9, 2013, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by April 9, 2013, the remittitur shall issue on April 10, 2013. | | 12-38598
|
04/10/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 13-10641
|
04/10/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | | |
04/19/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to Recall Remititur. | | 13-11653
|
04/23/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 17, 2013. | | 13-10641
|
05/15/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. | | 13-14419
|
09/16/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. In light of the notice denying petition for certiorari, appellant's motion to recall the remittitur is denied as moot. | | 13-27329
|