Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/22/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
07/22/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 09-17951
|
07/31/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/27/08, 4/1/08, 4/17/08, 5/1/08, 6/17/08, 7/22/08, 12/19/08, 1/16/09, 1/22/09, 1/27/09 through 1/30/09, 2/2/09 through 2/6/09, 2/9/09 through 2/13/09, 2/17/09, 5/1/09, 6/29/09, 6/23/09. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. | | 09-18728
|
08/06/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | | 09-19240
|
08/10/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 09-19405
|
08/18/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Copy of order filed in district court on August 17, 2009. Notice of Entry of Order. (State to pay for district court transcripts of proceedings). | | 09-20056
|
10/20/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Court Reporter Janie Olsen. | | 09-25630
|
10/22/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion and Revising Briefing Schedule. Court Reporter Janie Olsen's Certificate of Delivery due: December 9, 2009. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 29, 2010. | | 09-25828
|
01/04/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Luis A. Hildgo, Jr.'s Motion to Join In and Adopt Luis A. Hidalgo, III's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief in Case No. 54272. | | 10-00190
|
01/06/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Janie Olsen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/26/07, 2/05/08, 2/11/08, 7/22/08, 1/16/09, 1/17/09, 1/22/09, 1/27/09, 1/28/09, 1/29/09, 1/30/09, 2/02/09, 2/03/09, 2/04/09, 2/05/09, 2/06/09, 2/09/09, 2/10/09, 2/11/09, 2/12/09, and 5/01/09. | | 10-00307
|
01/07/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: 4/29/10. | | 10-00356
|
04/21/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s and Luis Hildalgo, III's Joint Motion for a Second Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. Nos. 54209/54272. | | 10-10442
|
05/03/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motions. Opening Briefs and Appendices due: June 28, 2010. Nos. 54209/54272. | | 10-11207
|
06/24/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s and Luis Hidalgo, III's Joint Motion for a Third Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (60) days. | | 10-16570
|
07/02/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening brief and appendix due 8/27/10. Nos. 54209/54272. | | 10-17327
|
08/25/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing appellant: Paola M. Armeni, Esq. of Gordon & Silver. | | 10-21865
|
08/27/2010 | Motion | Filed Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s and Luis Hidalgo, III's Joint Motion for a Fourth Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. Nos. 54209/54272. | | 10-22074
|
10/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Briefs and Appendix due: November 29, 2010. Nos. 54209/54272. | | 10-25543
|
11/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s and Luis Hidalgo, III's Joint Motion for a Fifth Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (45) days. | | 10-30777
|
12/20/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Opening Briefs and Appendices due: January 13, 2011. Nos. 54209/54272. | | 10-33081
|
01/12/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s and Luis Hidalgo, III's Joint Motion for a Sixth Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 11-01227
|
01/14/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellants' Opening Briefs and Appendices due: February 3, 2011. Nos. 54209/54272. | | 11-01483
|
02/02/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to File Appellant's Opening Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. (58) pages. | | 11-03293
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1. | | 11-03295
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2. | | 11-03296
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 3. | | 11-03297
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 4. | | 11-03298
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 5. | | 11-03301
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 6. | | 11-03314
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 7. | | 11-03302
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 8. | | 11-03303
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 9. | | 11-03304
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 10. | | 11-03305
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 11. | | 11-03306
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 12. | | 11-03308
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 13. | | 11-03309
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 14. | | 11-03310
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 15. | | 11-03311
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 16. | | 11-03312
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 17. | | 11-03313
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 18. | | 11-03315
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 19. | | 11-03316
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 20. | | 11-03317
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 21. | | 11-03318
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 22. | | 11-03319
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 23. | | 11-03320
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 24. | | 11-03321
|
02/02/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 25. | | 11-03322
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2. | | 11-03809
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1. | | 11-03828
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. CORRECTED Volume 2. | | 11-03833
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 3. | | 11-03834
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 4. | | 11-03844
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 5. | | 11-03887
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 6. | | 11-03897
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 7. | | 11-03899
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 8. | | 11-03900
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 9. | | 11-03903
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 10. | | 11-03904
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 11. | | 11-03905
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 12. | | 11-03906
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 13. | | 11-03907
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 14. | | 11-03924
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 15. | | 11-03925
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 16. | | 11-03928
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 17. | | 11-03930
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 18. | | 11-03931
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 19. | | 11-03932
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 20. | | 11-03933
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 21. | | 11-03934
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 22. | | 11-03935
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 23. | | 11-03936
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 24. | | 11-03937
|
02/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Amended Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 25. | | 11-03938
|
02/09/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to file an opening brief in excess of 30 pages. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received via E-Flex on February 2, 2011. | | 11-04151
|
02/09/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s Opening Brief. | | 11-04152
|
02/11/2011 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Sealed Agreement to Tesitfy (Espindola). (Part of Appellant's Amended Appendix, Volume 3 - pages 557 - 557C). | | |
02/11/2011 | Other Incoming Document | Filed three CDs containing copies of the State's Exhibit 191, 192A, and 192B. (Part of Appellant's Amended Appendix, Volume 15 - pages 2749, 2750, and 2751). | | 11-04590
|
03/11/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time First Request (Answering Brief -60 days). | | 11-07599
|
03/15/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: May 10, 2011. | | 11-07856
|
05/10/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief - Second Request. | | 11-13786
|
05/13/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: June 9, 2011. | | 11-14271
|
06/09/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File 51 Page Answering Brief. | | 11-17027
|
06/10/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the answering brief received via E-Flex on June 9, 2011. Appellant: 30 days to file reply brief, if deemed necessary. | | 11-17357
|
06/10/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 11-17359
|
07/06/2011 | Motion | Filed Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (First Request - 60 days). | | 11-20096
|
07/11/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: September 6, 2011. | | 11-20688
|
07/14/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. | | 11-21236
|
09/06/2011 | Motion | Filed Luis A. Hidalgo Jr.'s Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (Second Request) | | 11-27049
|
09/13/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Reply Brief due: 15 days. | | 11-27770
|
09/29/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to File Appellant's Reply Brief in Excess of Fifteen Pages. | | 11-29640
|
09/30/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received via E-Flex on September 29, 2011. | | 11-29832
|
09/30/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s Reply Brief. | | 11-29835
|
09/30/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
03/09/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument. | | 12-07755
|
03/09/2012 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
03/30/2012 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Reconsider Submission for Decision Without Oral Argument. | | 12-10146
|
04/17/2012 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Emergency Supplemental Motion to Reconsider Submission for Decision Without Oral Argument. | | 12-12198
|
04/26/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Wednesday, June 13, 2012, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas for 30 minutes before the SNP12 Panel. | | 12-13367
|
06/01/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 12-17212
|
06/05/2012 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities [NRAP 31(e)]. | | 12-17513
|
06/13/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Joyce Kotnik-Klevins from Ch-3 NBC would like to Cover via Video Tape the Nevada Supreme Court Oral Argument in Las Vegas this Afternoon (06/13/12-1:30pm), Regarding Hidalgo, Jr. (Luis) vs State. (via fax). | | 12-18496
|
06/13/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Joyce Kotnik-Klevins of KSNV is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. | | 12-18517
|
06/13/2012 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP12-MD/MG/RP | | |
06/21/2012 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP12-MD/MG/RP | | 12-19536
|
07/09/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing Pursuant to Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure 40. | | 12-21538
|
07/27/2012 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 12-23761
|
08/10/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 12-25288
|
09/19/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent shall have 15 days to file an answer to the petition. | | 12-29633
|
10/02/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 12-31092
|
10/09/2012 | Motion | Filed Luis A. Hidalgo, Jr.'s Motion for Permission to File a Reply to Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 12-31954
|
10/12/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply received via E-Flex on October 9, 2012. | | 12-32478
|
10/12/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Reply to Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration Pursuant to NRAP 40A. | | 12-32479
|
11/13/2012 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." Cherry, C.J., with whom, Saitta, J., agrees, dissenting. EN BANC | | 12-35764
|
11/16/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Stay Remittur. | | 12-36515
|
11/30/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Staying Remittitur. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until April 9, 2013. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by April 9, 2013, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by April 9, 2013, the remittitur shall issue on April 10, 2013. | | 12-37867
|
04/10/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 13-10637
|
04/10/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | | |
04/18/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion to Recall Remittitur. | | 13-11518
|
04/23/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 17, 2013. | | 13-10637
|
05/15/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. | | 13-14420
|
09/16/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. In light of the notice denying the petition for certiorari, appellant's motion to recall the remittitur is denied as moot. | | 13-27265
|