Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/26/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
01/26/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 16-02717
|
01/26/2016 | Other | Chief Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms - Maupin Naylor Braster. | | |
01/26/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 16-02719
|
01/27/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from GTG LLP. Check No. 1526. | | |
01/28/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. | | 16-02952
|
01/28/2016 | Order/Incoming | Filed Addendum to the Notice of Appeal. Filed District court notice of entry of order. Certified copy order filed in district court on 1/27/16. | | 16-03051
|
02/03/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Second Amended NOA) | | 16-03650
|
02/09/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 7, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. | | 16-04313
|
02/17/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-04990
|
02/17/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | | 16-05043
|
02/19/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Mailing. (Docketing Statement Civil Appeals) | | 16-05441
|
04/20/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys, Jennifer Goldstein, Esq. in place and stead of Garman Turner Gordon, LLP. | | 16-12326
|
06/17/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: The Arbitrator recommends that the due date for filing of the Final Status in this matter be extended (2) months. | | 16-19069
|
06/22/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to September 29, 2016. | | 16-19477
|
09/16/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 16-28880
|
09/19/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 16-28993
|
10/19/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | | 16-32686
|
10/20/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (First Amended NOA). | | 16-32911
|
10/26/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Joint Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. | | 16-33611
|
12/13/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief & Appendix due: January 3, 2017. | | 16-38472
|
01/04/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant Jennifer M. Goldstein's Opening Brief. | | 17-00187
|
01/04/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 17-00188
|
01/04/2017 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 1. | | 17-00189
|
01/04/2017 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 2. | | 17-00190
|
01/04/2017 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 3. | | 17-00191
|
01/04/2017 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 4. | | 17-00192
|
01/04/2017 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 5. | | 17-00193
|
01/04/2017 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 6. | | 17-00194
|
01/04/2017 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 7. | | 17-00195
|
01/04/2017 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 8. | | 17-00196
|
01/04/2017 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 9. | | 17-00197
|
01/04/2017 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix Volume 10. | | 17-00198
|
02/01/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address (Maupin, Naylor, Braster). | | 17-03680
|
02/01/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Extending Time for Filing Respondent's Answer Brief (First Request). | | 17-03789
|
02/01/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: March 6, 2017. | | 17-03793
|
02/28/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation Extending Time for Filing Respondents' Answering Brief (Second Request). | | 17-06718
|
03/06/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: April 5, 2017. | | 17-07490
|
03/21/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Status and Firm Name. (Respondent counsel, A. William Maupin is no longer with the firm Naylor & Braster f/k/a Maupin Naylor Braster) | | 17-09415
|
04/05/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. | | 17-11330
|
04/05/2017 | Appendix | Filed Supplemental Joint Appendix. | | 17-11331
|
05/05/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (Jennifer Goldstein). | | 17-14995
|
05/05/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant Jennifer Goldstein's Reply Brief. | | 17-15008
|
05/05/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 17-15054
|
05/05/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
08/17/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. | | 17-27585
|
10/13/2017 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP17-MC/JH/LS. | | 17-35048
|
11/09/2017 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 17-38662
|
11/09/2017 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
11/22/2017 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 16, 2017. | | 17-38662
|